GWR Churchward "4300" Class 2-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sat 19/02/1938 | 6307, 6327, 6341, 7310, 8332, 8332, 8332, 8334, 8334, 8334, 8393, 8393, 8393 |
BAN, 44, CHEL, BAN, 114, 114, 114, 24, 24, 24, STAFF, STAFF, STAFF |
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the yard. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the yard. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the yard. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the yard. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - Weighbridge Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - Weighbridge Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - Weighbridge |
RO 3/1938 | ||
Tue 17/08/1954 | 5316, 5316, 6316, 7309 |
W18, 6C, 84J, 84G |
Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 5332, 5332, 5332, 6309, 6329, 6338, 6345, 6357, 6392, 7322, 7322 |
Wdn, Wdn, Wdn, 82C, Wdn, 86E, 88A, 89B, Wdn, Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Dump. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Dump. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Dump. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Outside stock shed. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "C" shop - intact Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - being cut up. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop - being cut up. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 6348, 7306, 7320, 7337, 7337 |
Wdn, 87G, 87G, 83B, 83B |
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Triangle. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. |
|||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 6326 | 88A | Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. | |||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 7327, 7327 |
Wdn, Wdn |
Swindon Works visit: Dump | RO 1/1965 |