4300 |
4303
|
|
|
06/1911 |
07/11/1952 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1934 |
4300 |
4306
|
|
|
07/1911 |
06/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1933 |
4300 |
4310
|
|
|
08/1911 |
08/1936 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1932 |
4300 |
4311
|
|
|
08/1911 |
12/1936 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1934 |
4300 |
4316
|
|
|
09/1911 |
09/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1934 |
4300 |
4321
|
|
|
06/1913 |
09/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1933 |
4300 |
4325
|
|
|
08/1913 |
04/1938 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1929 |
4300 |
4326
|
|
|
08/1913 |
27/03/1957 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1930 |
4300 |
4327
|
|
|
08/1913 |
01/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1928 |
4300 |
4337
|
|
|
10/1913 |
05/11/1951 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1932 |
4300 |
4338
|
|
|
10/1913 |
02/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1934 |
4300 |
4339
|
|
|
10/1913 |
01/1939 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1935 |
4300 |
4342
|
|
|
12/1913 |
05/1938 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1933 |
4300 |
4358
|
|
|
04/1914 |
11/08/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1944 |
4300 |
4372
|
|
|
10/1915 |
09/1936 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1931 |
4300 |
4373
|
|
|
10/1915 |
08/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1930 |
4300 |
4375
|
|
|
11/1915 |
06/01/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1941 |
4300 |
4376
|
|
|
12/1915 |
11/1936 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1929 |
4300 |
4377
|
|
|
12/1915 |
26/01/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1945 |
4300 |
4379
|
|
|
12/1915 |
02/1938 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1930 |
4300 |
4381
|
|
|
05/1916 |
28/05/1953 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1941 |
4300 |
4383
|
|
|
06/1916 |
03/1936 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1931 |
4300 |
4393
|
|
|
09/1916 |
08/1937 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1933 |
4300 |
5300
|
8300
|
5300
|
11/1916 |
15/01/1953 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1949 |
4300 |
5306
|
|
|
01/1917 |
06/07/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1937 |
4300 |
5307
|
8307
|
5307
|
01/1917 |
26/11/1956 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1946 |
4300 |
5310
|
|
|
06/1917 |
31/07/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1944 |
4300 |
5311
|
|
|
06/1917 |
24/10/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1949 |
4300 |
5313
|
8313
|
5313
|
06/1917 |
13/05/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1944 |
4300 |
5317
|
|
|
07/1917 |
05/11/1956 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1944 |
4300 |
5319
|
|
|
08/1917 |
16/11/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1945 |
4300 |
5321
|
|
|
08/1917 |
14/09/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1939 |
4300 |
5322
|
8322
|
5322
|
08/1917 |
24/04/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1949 |
4300 |
5323
|
|
|
09/1917 |
09/06/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1946 |
4300 |
5324
|
|
|
09/1917 |
16/09/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1948 |
4300 |
5326
|
8326
|
5326
|
09/1917 |
15/03/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1950 |
4300 |
5327
|
8327
|
5327
|
09/1917 |
02/07/1956 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1936 |
4300 |
5328
|
8328
|
5328
|
09/1917 |
29/07/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1935 |
4300 |
5330
|
|
|
09/1917 |
15/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1939 |
4300 |
5331
|
8331
|
5331
|
09/1917 |
10/11/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1946 |
4300 |
5333
|
8333
|
5333
|
11/1917 |
16/05/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1949 |
4300 |
5335
|
8335
|
5335
|
12/1917 |
16/10/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1947 |
4300 |
5336
|
|
|
12/1917 |
07/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1945 |
4300 |
5337
|
8337
|
5337
|
12/1917 |
24/10/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1954 |
4300 |
5338
|
8338
|
5338
|
01/1918 |
11/08/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1950 |
4300 |
5339
|
|
|
01/1918 |
29/11/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1932 |
4300 |
5341
|
8341
|
5341
|
02/1918 |
28/07/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1947 |
4300 |
5344
|
8344
|
5344
|
03/1918 |
22/09/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1949 |
4300 |
5345
|
|
|
03/1918 |
08/06/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1958 |
4300 |
5350
|
8350
|
5350
|
07/1918 |
07/12/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1945 |
4300 |
5351
|
8351
|
5351
|
08/1918 |
13/06/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1949 |
4300 |
5353
|
8353
|
5353
|
08/1918 |
02/05/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1951 |
4300 |
5355
|
|
|
08/1918 |
23/04/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1953 |
4300 |
5356
|
|
|
08/1918 |
12/10/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1945 |
4300 |
5357
|
8357
|
5357
|
09/1918 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1937 |
4300 |
5360
|
8360
|
5360
|
01/1919 |
26/09/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1949 |
4300 |
5362
|
8362
|
5362
|
02/1919 |
22/07/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1944 |
4300 |
5367
|
|
|
05/1919 |
29/09/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1947 |
4300 |
5368
|
8368
|
5368
|
06/1919 |
25/09/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1946 |
4300 |
5369
|
8369
|
5369
|
06/1919 |
20/11/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1956 |
4300 |
5370
|
|
|
06/1919 |
16/09/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1945 |
4300 |
5375
|
|
|
08/1919 |
19/10/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1945 |
4300 |
5376
|
8376
|
5376
|
08/1919 |
08/06/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1944 |
4300 |
5377
|
|
|
08/1919 |
22/09/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1945 |
4300 |
5379
|
8379
|
5379
|
08/1919 |
13/05/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1944 |
4300 |
5380
|
|
|
04/1920 |
23/09/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1953 |
4300 |
5382
|
8382
|
5382
|
06/1920 |
23/04/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1953 |
4300 |
5385
|
|
|
08/1920 |
13/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1945 |
4300 |
5390
|
8390
|
5390
|
10/1920 |
13/08/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1941 |
4300 |
5391
|
8391
|
5391
|
10/1920 |
18/03/1957 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1947 |
4300 |
5393
|
8393
|
5393
|
10/1920 |
05/10/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1935 |
4300 |
5395
|
|
|
10/1920 |
10/10/1955 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1931 |
4300 |
5396
|
|
|
11/1920 |
09/05/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1933 |
4300 |
5397
|
|
|
11/1920 |
24/07/1958 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1938 |
4300 |
5398
|
|
|
11/1920 |
23/02/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1950 |
4300 |
5399
|
|
|
11/1920 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1957 |
4300 |
6301
|
|
|
12/1920 |
15/10/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1958 |
4300 |
6303
|
|
|
12/1920 |
01/04/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1957 |
4300 |
6304
|
|
|
12/1920 |
15/01/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1952 |
4300 |
6305
|
|
|
12/1920 |
01/09/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1948 |
4300 |
6306
|
|
|
12/1920 |
21/11/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1945 |
4300 |
6307
|
|
|
01/1921 |
25/07/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1944 |
4300 |
6309
|
|
|
01/1921 |
07/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1947 |
4300 |
6310
|
|
|
01/1921 |
05/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1958 |
4300 |
6311
|
|
|
01/1921 |
18/01/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1948 |
4300 |
6312
|
|
|
01/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1945 |
4300 |
6313
|
|
|
01/1921 |
21/11/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1943 |
4300 |
6316
|
|
|
01/1921 |
25/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1944 |
4300 |
6317
|
|
|
01/1921 |
20/11/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1944 |
4300 |
6318
|
|
|
02/1921 |
05/01/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1948 |
4300 |
6319
|
|
|
02/1921 |
26/08/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1953 |
4300 |
6322
|
|
|
02/1921 |
05/01/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1945 |
4300 |
6323
|
|
|
03/1921 |
11/07/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1948 |
4300 |
6324
|
|
|
03/1921 |
02/04/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1948 |
4300 |
6325
|
|
|
03/1921 |
23/11/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1950 |
4300 |
6326
|
|
|
03/1921 |
07/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1957 |
4300 |
6327
|
|
|
03/1921 |
23/09/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1950 |
4300 |
6329
|
|
|
04/1921 |
19/10/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1953 |
4300 |
6330
|
|
|
04/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1947 |
4300 |
6331
|
|
|
04/1921 |
20/04/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1944 |
4300 |
6332
|
|
|
04/1921 |
16/09/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1949 |
4300 |
6333
|
|
|
05/1921 |
24/10/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1950 |
4300 |
6335
|
|
|
05/1921 |
02/07/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1952 |
4300 |
6336
|
|
|
05/1921 |
05/04/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1953 |
4300 |
6337
|
|
|
06/1921 |
06/07/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1951 |
4300 |
6338
|
|
|
06/1921 |
15/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1951 |
4300 |
6339
|
|
|
06/1921 |
31/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1946 |
4300 |
6340
|
|
|
06/1921 |
13/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1950 |
4300 |
6341
|
|
|
07/1921 |
13/11/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1946 |
4300 |
6342
|
|
|
03/1923 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1947 |
4300 |
6343
|
|
|
03/1923 |
21/09/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1951 |
4300 |
6345
|
|
|
04/1923 |
07/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1954 |
4300 |
6348
|
|
|
04/1923 |
19/02/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1953 |
4300 |
6349
|
|
|
05/1923 |
10/08/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1957 |
4300 |
6350
|
|
|
05/1923 |
06/01/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1948 |
4300 |
6352
|
|
|
09/1923 |
21/11/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1946 |
4300 |
6354
|
|
|
10/1923 |
23/02/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1949 |
4300 |
6355
|
|
|
10/1923 |
02/03/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1952 |
4300 |
6357
|
|
|
11/1923 |
13/07/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1953 |
4300 |
6358
|
|
|
11/1923 |
12/10/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
03/1951 |
4300 |
6360
|
|
|
11/1923 |
21/11/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1956 |
4300 |
6370
|
|
|
04/1921 |
14/01/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1944 |
4300 |
6371
|
|
|
05/1921 |
21/09/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1945 |
4300 |
6373
|
|
|
06/1921 |
28/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1946 |
4300 |
6374
|
|
|
05/1921 |
03/08/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1947 |
4300 |
6375
|
|
|
06/1921 |
17/09/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1948 |
4300 |
6376
|
|
|
06/1921 |
14/05/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1938 |
4300 |
6377
|
|
|
06/1921 |
24/10/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1949 |
4300 |
6380
|
|
|
07/1921 |
28/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1944 |
4300 |
6381
|
|
|
07/1921 |
20/11/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1933 |
4300 |
6382
|
|
|
08/1921 |
21/11/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1948 |
4300 |
6384
|
|
|
08/1921 |
24/06/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1947 |
4300 |
6385
|
|
|
08/1921 |
02/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1932 |
4300 |
6386
|
|
|
09/1921 |
05/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1952 |
4300 |
6387
|
|
|
09/1921 |
22/06/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1951 |
4300 |
6388
|
|
|
10/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1951 |
4300 |
6390
|
|
|
10/1921 |
14/05/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1951 |
4300 |
6391
|
|
|
11/1921 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1946 |
4300 |
6392
|
|
|
11/1921 |
19/10/1961 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1959 |
4300 |
6393
|
|
|
11/1921 |
11/01/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1951 |
4300 |
6394
|
|
|
11/1921 |
15/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1950 |
4300 |
6395
|
|
|
12/1921 |
21/11/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1950 |
4300 |
6398
|
|
|
12/1921 |
24/10/1960 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1945 |
4300 |
6399
|
|
|
12/1921 |
16/11/1959 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1947 |
4300 |
7300
|
|
|
12/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
01/1957 |
4300 |
7301
|
|
|
12/1921 |
21/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
04/1951 |
4300 |
7302
|
|
|
12/1921 |
24/08/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1949 |
4300 |
7303
|
|
|
01/1922 |
07/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
10/1949 |
4300 |
7304
|
|
|
01/1922 |
02/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1947 |
4300 |
7305
|
|
|
11/1921 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1950 |
4300 |
7306
|
|
|
11/1921 |
01/09/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1956 |
4300 |
7307
|
|
|
11/1921 |
01/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1954 |
4300 |
7308
|
|
|
11/1921 |
15/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1961 |
4300 |
7309
|
|
|
11/1921 |
27/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1957 |
4300 |
7310
|
|
|
12/1921 |
15/06/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
09/1949 |
4300 |
7311
|
|
|
12/1921 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
12/1947 |
4300 |
7312
|
|
|
12/1921 |
28/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1958 |
4300 |
7313
|
|
|
12/1921 |
03/07/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
08/1958 |
4300 |
7314
|
|
|
12/1921 |
26/02/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
07/1947 |
4300 |
7315
|
|
|
12/1921 |
16/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
06/1948 |
4300 |
7316
|
|
|
12/1921 |
17/09/1962 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
11/1947 |
4300 |
7317
|
|
|
12/1921 |
28/12/1963 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
02/1951 |
4300 |
7318
|
|
|
12/1921 |
06/11/1964 |
Outside Steam Pipes fitted |
05/1954 |