Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 245 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 5417 Week
» 16988 Month
» 265281 Year
» 1149662 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "3100/5100" Class 2-6-2T


Class GWR (Orig.) GWR GWR (51xx) GWR (81xx) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
3100 99 3100 5100 8100 09/1903 W Withdrawn 04/10/1962 04/10/1962
3100   3111 5111   01/1905 W Withdrawn 10/1948 10/1948
3100   3112 5112   01/1905 GLO
84G
84E
84A
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Shrewsbury
Tyseley
Stafford Road
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
27/12/1952
21/02/1953
08/08/1953
10/1955
10/1955
3100   3113 5113   01/1905 W Withdrawn 10/1955 10/1955
3100   3114 5114   02/1905 W Withdrawn 09/1950 09/1950
5100   3115 5115 8109 02/1905 84E
W
Tyseley
Withdrawn
03/12/1960
06/1965
06/1965
5100   3116 5116 8107 02/1905 85B
85A
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
08/10/1960
12/08/1961
05/1962
05/1962
5100   3117 5117   02/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1949 05/1949
5100   3118 5118 8102 02/1905 217
87G
87A
82E
83C
85A
W
Whitland
Carmarthen
Neath (Court Sart)
Bristol Barrow Road
Westbury
Worcester
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
05/10/1957
31/12/1960
06/04/1963
02/11/1963
25/01/1964
05/1964
05/1964
5100   3119 5119   02/1905 W Withdrawn 06/1948 06/1948
5100   3120 5120 8106 03/1905 W Withdrawn 12/1963 12/1963
5100   3121 5121   02/1905 W Withdrawn 10/1948 10/1948
5100   3122 5122   02/1905 W Withdrawn 09/1950 09/1950
5100   3123 5123 8101 05/1905 W Withdrawn 03/1961 03/1961
3100   3124 5124 8104 05/1905 83F
87A
85A
85A
W
Truro
Neath (Court Sart)
Worcester
Worcester
Withdrawn
16/06/1956
14/07/1956
06/10/1962
02/11/1963
12/1964
12/1964
3100   3125 5125   02/1905 144
WLN
W
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR)
Wellington
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
30/10/1948
07/1952
07/1952
3100   3126 5126 8105 06/1905 BRD
85A
W
Bristol Bath Road
Worcester
Withdrawn
05/11/1949
31/12/1951
06/1957
06/1957
3100   3127 5127   06/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1948 05/1948
3100   3128 5128   06/1905 BRY
W
Barry
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
11/1948
11/1948
3100   3129 5129   06/1905 W Withdrawn 07/1951 07/1951
3100   3130 5130   06/1905 W Withdrawn 08/1948 08/1948
5100   3131 5131   01/1906 W Withdrawn 10/1948 10/1948
5100   3132 5132   01/1906 W Withdrawn 08/1951 08/1951
5100   3133 5133 8108 01/1906 W Withdrawn 29/11/1960 29/11/1960
5100   3134 5134   02/1906 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
5100   3135 5135   02/1906 W Withdrawn 08/1949 08/1949
5100   3136 5136   02/1906 W Withdrawn 10/1951 10/1951
5100   3137 5137   02/1906 94
84C
W
Leamington
Banbury
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
30/06/1951
10/1951
10/1951
5100   3138 5138   02/1906 W Withdrawn 11/1952 11/1952
5100   3139 5139   03/1906 W Withdrawn 11/1952 11/1952
3100   3140 5140   03/1906 W Withdrawn 07/1953 07/1953
3100   3141 5141   03/1906 84C
W
Banbury
Withdrawn
31/08/1951
10/1952
10/1952
3100   3142 5142   03/1906 W Withdrawn 05/1952 05/1952
3100   3143 5143   03/1906 W Withdrawn 12/1951 12/1951
3100   3144 5144   03/1906 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
3100   3145 5145 8103 03/1906 87G
87H
87G
87F
88G
88B
W
Carmarthen
Neyland
Carmarthen
Llanelly
Llantrisant
Radyr
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
31/10/1959
28/11/1959
14/07/1962
28/09/1963
02/11/1963
28/11/1963
28/11/1963
3100   3146 5146   03/1906 W Withdrawn 05/1948 05/1948
5100   3147 5147   03/1906 83F
W
Truro
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
01/1953
01/1953
5100   3148 5148   03/1906 W Withdrawn 12/1959 12/1959
5100   3149 5149   03/1906       04/1947