Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 29 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1701 Week
» 20022 Month
» 108214 Year
» 992595 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "3100/5100" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
01/12/1945 Reallocation 5137     94 Leamington  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 5125     STR Stratford  
04/1947 Condemned 5149       COND  
05/1948 Condemned 5127       COND  
05/1948 Condemned 5146       COND  
06/1948 Condemned 5119       COND  
08/1948 Condemned 5130       COND  
10/1948 Condemned 5111       COND  
10/1948 Condemned 5121       COND  
10/1948 Condemned 5131       COND  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 5125 STR Stratford WLN Wellington  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 5128     BRY Barry  
11/1948 Condemned 5128 BRY Barry   COND  
05/1949 Condemned 5117       COND  
08/1949 Condemned 5135       COND  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 5112     GLO Gloucester Horton Road  
09/1950 Condemned 5114       COND  
09/1950 Condemned 5122       COND  
04/1951 Condemned 5134       COND  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 5137 94 Leamington 84C Banbury  
07/1951 Condemned 5129       COND  
08/1951 Condemned 5132       COND  
31/08/1951 Reallocation 5141     84C Banbury  
10/1951 Condemned 5136       COND  
10/1951 Condemned 5137 84C Banbury   COND  
12/1951 Condemned 5143       COND  
01/1952 Condemned 5144       COND  
05/1952 Condemned 5142       COND  
07/1952 Condemned 5125 WLN Wellington   COND  
10/1952 Condemned 5141 84C Banbury   COND  
11/1952 Condemned 5138       COND  
11/1952 Condemned 5139       COND  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 5147     83F Truro  
27/12/1952 Reallocation 5112 GLO Gloucester Horton Road 84G Shrewsbury  
01/1953 Condemned 5147 83F Truro   COND  
21/02/1953 Reallocation 5112 84G Shrewsbury 84E Tyseley  
07/1953 Condemned 5140       COND  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 5112 84E Tyseley 84A Stafford Road  
10/1955 Condemned 5112 84A Stafford Road   COND  
10/1955 Condemned 5113       COND  
12/1959 Condemned 5148       COND