GWR Churchward "3100/5100" Class 2-6-2T
Pre Grouping | Big 4 | BR | Build Date | Rebuild | Rebuild Date | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
99 3100 5100 8100 99 3100 5100 8100 |
09/1903 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 26/09/1938 | |||
3115 5115 8109 3115 5115 8109 |
02/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 30/11/1939 | |||
3116 5116 8107 3116 5116 8107 |
02/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 28/07/1939 | |||
3118 5118 8102 3118 5118 8102 |
02/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 15/06/1938 | |||
3120 5120 8106 3120 5120 8106 |
03/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 17/06/1939 | |||
3123 5123 8101 3123 5123 8101 |
05/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 25/03/1938 | |||
3124 5124 8104 3124 5124 8104 |
05/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 13/01/1939 | |||
3126 5126 8105 3126 5126 8105 |
06/1905 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 01/04/1939 | |||
3133 5133 8108 3133 5133 8108 |
01/1906 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 26/09/1939 | |||
3145 5145 8103 3145 5145 8103 |
03/1906 | Rebuilt from 3100/5100 to 81xx | 01/11/1938 |