Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 574 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 574 Week
» 18895 Month
» 107087 Year
» 991468 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "44xx" Class 2-6-2T


Class GWR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
4400 4400 10/1904 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
4400 4401 07/1905 83C
83A
83D
83A
W
Exeter
Newton Abbot
Laira
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
29/02/1952
24/01/1953
05/09/1953
31/10/1953
10/1954
10/1954
4400 4402 07/1905 W Withdrawn 12/1949 12/1949
4400 4403 10/1905 83D
W
Laira
Withdrawn
19/05/1951
01/1953
01/1953
4400 4404 12/1905 W Withdrawn 03/1952 03/1952
4400 4405 01/1906 NA
W
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
07/09/1946
09/1955
09/1955
4400 4406 02/1906 86F
83D
83A
W
Tondu
Laira
Newton Abbot
Withdrawn
17/05/1952
04/12/1954
29/01/1955
09/1955
09/1955
4400 4407 04/1906 W Withdrawn 03/1953 03/1953
4400 4408 05/1906 W Withdrawn 01/1953 01/1953
4400 4409 06/1906 LA
W
Laira
Withdrawn
31/12/1949
02/1951
02/1951
4400 4410 06/1906 83D
W
Laira
Withdrawn
18/04/1953
09/1955
09/1955