Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 232 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 232 Week
» 18553 Month
» 106745 Year
» 991126 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "44xx" Class 2-6-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
07/09/1946 Reallocation 4405     NA Newton Abbot  
12/1949 Condemned 4402       COND  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 4409     LA Laira  
02/1951 Condemned 4409 LA Laira   COND  
04/1951 Condemned 4400       COND  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 4403     83D Laira  
29/02/1952 Reallocation 4401     83C Exeter  
03/1952 Condemned 4404       COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 4406     86F Tondu  
01/1953 Condemned 4403 83D Laira   COND  
01/1953 Condemned 4408       COND  
24/01/1953 Reallocation 4401 83C Exeter 83A Newton Abbot  
03/1953 Condemned 4407       COND  
18/04/1953 Reallocation 4410     83D Laira  
05/09/1953 Reallocation 4401 83A Newton Abbot 83D Laira  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 4401 83D Laira 83A Newton Abbot  
10/1954 Condemned 4401 83A Newton Abbot   COND  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 4406 86F Tondu 83D Laira  
29/01/1955 Reallocation 4406 83D Laira 83A Newton Abbot  
09/1955 Condemned 4405 NA Newton Abbot   COND  
09/1955 Condemned 4406 83A Newton Abbot   COND  
09/1955 Condemned 4410 83D Laira   COND