Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 30 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1702 Week
» 20023 Month
» 108215 Year
» 992596 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "3150" Class 2-6-2T


Class GWR GWR (31xx) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
3150 3150   04/1906 W Withdrawn 09/1957 09/1957
3150 3151   04/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1952 03/1952
3150 3152   04/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
3150 3153   04/1907 W Withdrawn 02/1953 02/1953
3150 3154   04/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1950 10/1950
3150 3155 3103 04/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1960 01/1960
3150 3156 3101 04/1907 85B
84E
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Tyseley
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
29/11/1952
09/1957
09/1957
3150 3157   04/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1952 10/1952
3150 3158   04/1907 W Withdrawn 04/1948 04/1948
3150 3159   05/1907 W Withdrawn 11/1949 11/1949
3150 3160   05/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1953 07/1953
3150 3161   05/1907 W Withdrawn 12/1952 12/1952
3150 3162   05/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1947 01/1947
3150 3163   06/1907 W Withdrawn 06/1957 06/1957
3150 3164   06/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1956 03/1956
3150 3165   06/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1948 07/1948
3150 3166   06/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1947 01/1947
3150 3167   06/1907 W Withdrawn 08/1952 08/1952
3150 3168   06/1907 W Withdrawn 09/1950 09/1950
3150 3169   06/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1950 07/1950
3150 3170   06/1907 86A
W
Ebbw Junction (Newport)
Withdrawn
04/12/1954
08/1958
08/1958
3150 3171   10/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1957 07/1957
3150 3172   10/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1957 10/1957
3150 3173 3100 10/1907 W Withdrawn 05/1957 05/1957
3150 3174   10/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1958 03/1958
3150 3175   10/1907 W Withdrawn 03/1949 03/1949
3150 3176   11/1907 W Withdrawn 11/1957 11/1957
3150 3177   11/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1957 10/1957
3150 3178   11/1907 W Withdrawn 01/1951 01/1951
3150 3179 3104 11/1907 W Withdrawn 06/1957 06/1957
3150 3180   11/1907 TYS
85B
W
Tyseley
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
21/03/1953
10/1957
10/1957
3150 3181 3102 12/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1958 10/1958
3150 3182   12/1907 W Withdrawn 08/1949 08/1949
3150 3183   12/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1957 10/1957
3150 3184   12/1907 W Withdrawn 07/1948 07/1948
3150 3185   01/1908 W Withdrawn 02/1956 02/1956
3150 3186   01/1908 83
18A
W
Laira
Toton
Withdrawn
01/12/1945
17/06/1950
06/1957
06/1957
3150 3187   01/1908 W Withdrawn 11/1957 11/1957
3150 3188   01/1908 W Withdrawn 11/1952 11/1952
3150 3189   01/1908 W Withdrawn 09/1949 09/1949
3150 3190   01/1908 W Withdrawn 03/1958 03/1958