Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1405 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19208 Week
» 72224 Month
» 191751 Year
» 3218604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Churchward "2800" Class 2-8-0
GWR (Orig) |
GWR |
GWR (Oil) |
GWR (Coal) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Mileage |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
97
|
2800
|
|
|
06/1903 |
|
28/04/1958 |
|
54.83 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
14/06/1958 |
55.04 |
|
2801
|
|
|
09/1905 |
|
16/12/1958 |
Pontypool Road |
53.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
16/05/1959 |
53.70 |
|
2802
|
|
|
09/1905 |
|
08/12/1958 |
Didcot |
53.25 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
21/03/1959 |
53.55 |
|
2803
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
20/04/1959 |
|
53.5 |
|
|
|
|
53.53 |
|
2804
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
31/07/1959 |
|
53.75 |
|
|
|
|
53.87 |
|
2805
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
30/05/1960 |
|
54.58 |
|
|
|
|
54.94 |
|
2806
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
07/03/1960 |
|
54.42 |
|
|
|
|
54.54 |
|
2807
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
07/03/1963 |
|
57.42 |
1,472,687 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2808
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
21/09/1959 |
|
53.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1959 |
54.20 |
|
2809
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
15/01/1960 |
|
54.25 |
|
|
|
|
54.45 |
|
2810
|
|
|
10/1905 |
|
11/09/1959 |
|
53.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1959 |
54.20 |
|
2811
|
|
|
11/1905 |
|
20/10/1959 |
|
53.92 |
|
|
|
|
54.37 |
|
2812
|
|
|
11/1905 |
|
01/01/1959 |
|
53.17 |
|
|
|
|
53.87 |
|
2813
|
|
|
11/1905 |
|
30/11/1960 |
|
55 |
|
|
|
|
55.45 |
|
2814
|
|
|
11/1905 |
|
11/08/1958 |
|
52.75 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
06/09/1958 |
52.84 |
|
2815
|
|
|
11/1905 |
|
14/12/1959 |
|
54.08 |
|
|
|
|
54.12 |
|
2816
|
|
|
12/1905 |
|
20/10/1959 |
|
53.83 |
|
|
|
|
54.04 |
|
2817
|
|
|
12/1905 |
|
04/03/1959 |
|
53.25 |
|
|
|
|
53.70 |
|
2818
|
|
|
12/1905 |
|
25/10/1963 |
|
57.83 |
1,584,890 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2819
|
|
|
12/1905 |
|
14/01/1961 |
|
55.08 |
|
|
|
|
55.37 |
|
2820
|
|
|
12/1905 |
|
17/11/1958 |
|
52.92 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
24/01/1959 |
53.15 |
|
2821
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
21/09/1960 |
|
53.67 |
|
|
|
|
54.28 |
|
2822
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
27/11/1964 |
|
57.83 |
|
|
|
|
58.13 |
|
2823
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
24/04/1959 |
|
52.25 |
|
|
|
|
52.62 |
|
2824
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
20/08/1959 |
|
52.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1959 |
52.95 |
|
2825
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
31/03/1959 |
|
52.17 |
|
|
|
|
52.62 |
|
2826
|
|
|
01/1907 |
|
22/09/1959 |
|
52.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1959 |
52.95 |
|
2827
|
|
|
02/1907 |
|
11/08/1958 |
|
51.5 |
|
Cut |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
13/06/1959 |
52.36 |
|
2828
|
|
|
02/1907 |
|
26/01/1959 |
|
51.92 |
|
|
|
|
52.53 |
|
2829
|
|
|
02/1907 |
|
13/02/1959 |
|
52 |
|
|
|
|
52.04 |
|
2830
|
|
|
02/1907 |
|
30/01/1959 |
|
51.92 |
|
|
|
|
52.53 |
|
2831
|
|
|
03/1911 |
|
12/01/1960 |
|
48.83 |
|
|
|
|
48.99 |
|
2832
|
4806
|
2832
|
04/1911 |
|
16/11/1959 |
|
48.58 |
|
|
|
|
50.04 |
|
2833
|
|
|
04/1911 |
|
06/03/1959 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
|
48.37 |
|
2834
|
4808
|
2834
|
05/1911 |
|
05/11/1962 |
|
51.5 |
|
|
|
|
52.04 |
|
2835
|
|
|
05/1911 |
|
17/05/1960 |
|
49 |
|
|
|
|
49.04 |
|
2836
|
|
|
09/1912 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
51.75 |
|
|
|
|
52.45 |
|
2837
|
|
|
09/1912 |
|
30/05/1960 |
|
47.67 |
|
|
|
|
47.95 |
|
2838
|
|
|
09/1912 |
|
06/08/1959 |
|
46.92 |
|
|
|
|
47.11 |
|
2839
|
4804
|
2839
|
10/1912 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
51.67 |
|
|
|
|
52.37 |
|
2840
|
|
|
10/1912 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
46.67 |
|
|
|
|
47.61 |
|
2841
|
|
|
10/1912 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
51.17 |
1,421,319 |
|
|
|
52.20 |
|
2842
|
|
|
10/1912 |
|
17/09/1963 |
|
50.92 |
1,321,926 |
|
|
|
51.78 |
|
2843
|
|
|
11/1912 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
46.58 |
|
|
|
|
47.32 |
|
2844
|
|
|
11/1912 |
|
04/03/1960 |
|
47.33 |
|
|
|
|
47.45 |
|
2845
|
4809
|
2845
|
11/1912 |
|
24/05/1963 |
|
50.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
09/1963 |
50.87 |
|
2846
|
|
|
12/1912 |
|
25/11/1960 |
|
47.92 |
|
|
|
|
48.20 |
|
2847
|
4811
|
2847
|
12/1912 |
|
09/03/1960 |
|
47.25 |
|
|
|
|
47.36 |
|
2848
|
4807
|
2848
|
12/1912 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
46.5 |
|
|
|
|
47.24 |
|
2849
|
4803
|
2849
|
12/1912 |
|
03/08/1962 |
|
49.67 |
|
|
|
|
50.53 |
|
2850
|
|
|
01/1913 |
|
17/02/1960 |
|
47.08 |
|
|
|
|
47.19 |
|
2851
|
|
|
02/1913 |
|
24/06/1963 |
|
50.33 |
1,449,692 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1964 |
51.28 |
|
2852
|
|
|
02/1913 |
|
10/10/1963 |
|
50.67 |
1,404,252 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1965 |
52.36 |
|
2853
|
4810
|
2853
|
02/1913 |
|
07/05/1962 |
|
49.25 |
|
|
|
|
49.56 |
|
2854
|
4801
|
2854
|
02/1913 |
|
03/10/1963 |
|
50.67 |
1,428,351 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
07/1964 |
51.45 |
|
2855
|
|
|
02/1913 |
|
12/12/1962 |
|
49.83 |
|
|
|
|
50.03 |
|
2856
|
|
|
04/1918 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
46 |
|
|
|
|
46.20 |
|
2857
|
|
|
05/1918 |
|
25/04/1963 |
|
44.92 |
1,276,713 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2858
|
|
|
05/1918 |
|
09/01/1963 |
|
44.67 |
1,221,394 |
|
|
|
44.86 |
|
2859
|
|
|
05/1918 |
|
26/12/1964 |
|
46.58 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2860
|
|
|
05/1918 |
|
27/04/1962 |
|
43.92 |
|
|
|
|
44.20 |
|
2861
|
|
|
06/1918 |
|
01/03/1963 |
|
44.75 |
1,311,479 |
|
|
|
|
|
2862
|
4802
|
2862
|
06/1918 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
45.83 |
|
|
|
|
46.70 |
|
2863
|
4805
|
2863
|
06/1918 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
41 |
|
|
|
|
41.86 |
|
2864
|
|
|
07/1918 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.92 |
|
|
|
|
41.78 |
|
2865
|
|
|
07/1918 |
|
09/01/1963 |
|
44.5 |
1,303,445 |
|
|
|
44.62 |
|
2866
|
|
|
09/1918 |
|
28/03/1963 |
|
44.5 |
1,282,090 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1964 |
45.36 |
|
2867
|
|
|
10/1918 |
|
29/07/1963 |
|
44.75 |
1,312,416 |
|
|
|
45.61 |
|
2868
|
|
|
10/1918 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.67 |
|
|
|
|
41.61 |
|
2869
|
|
|
10/1918 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.67 |
|
|
|
|
41.70 |
|
2870
|
|
|
10/1918 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.67 |
|
|
|
|
41.53 |
|
2871
|
|
|
11/1918 |
|
24/05/1963 |
|
44.5 |
1,255,943 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
06/1964 |
45.61 |
|
2872
|
4800
|
2872
|
11/1918 |
|
26/08/1963 |
|
44.75 |
1,180,904 |
|
|
|
45.36 |
|
2873
|
|
|
11/1918 |
|
26/12/1964 |
|
46.08 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2874
|
|
|
11/1918 |
|
24/05/1963 |
|
44.5 |
1,258,517 |
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
2875
|
|
|
12/1918 |
|
01/04/1964 |
|
45.33 |
|
|
|
|
46.20 |
|
2876
|
|
|
01/1919 |
|
15/01/1965 |
|
46 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
02/1965 |
46.12 |
|
2877
|
|
|
01/1919 |
|
11/01/1960 |
|
41 |
|
|
|
|
41.19 |
|
2878
|
|
|
02/1919 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.33 |
|
|
|
|
41.27 |
|
2879
|
|
|
03/1919 |
|
10/08/1964 |
|
45.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
45.79 |
|
2880
|
|
|
03/1919 |
|
15/06/1959 |
|
40.25 |
|
|
|
|
41.20 |
|
2881
|
|
|
03/1919 |
|
11/01/1960 |
|
40.83 |
|
|
|
|
40.99 |
|
2882
|
|
|
04/1919 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
44.67 |
1,171,302 |
|
|
|
45.28 |
|
2883
|
|
|
04/1919 |
|
19/11/1962 |
|
43.58 |
|
|
|
|
44.03 |
|
2884
|
|
|
03/03/1938 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
26.08 |
|
|
|
|
26.47 |
|
2885
|
|
|
04/03/1938 |
|
22/01/1964 |
|
25.83 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
2886
|
|
|
08/03/1938 |
|
25/06/1964 |
|
26.25 |
|
|
|
|
26.79 |
|
2887
|
|
|
12/03/1938 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
26.25 |
|
|
|
|
26.95 |
|
2888
|
4850
|
2888
|
17/03/1938 |
|
18/02/1963 |
|
24.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1963 |
25.26 |
|
2889
|
|
|
31/03/1938 |
|
25/04/1963 |
|
25.08 |
742,846 |
|
|
|
25.22 |
|
2890
|
|
|
08/04/1938 |
|
21/04/1965 |
|
27 |
|
|
|
|
27.37 |
|
2891
|
|
|
11/04/1938 |
|
23/10/1964 |
|
26.5 |
|
|
|
|
26.87 |
|
2892
|
|
|
20/04/1938 |
|
13/05/1963 |
|
25.08 |
766,818 |
|
|
|
25.32 |
|
2893
|
|
|
28/04/1938 |
|
06/11/1964 |
|
26.58 |
|
|
|
|
26.98 |
|
2894
|
|
|
15/11/1938 |
|
01/08/1963 |
|
24.75 |
665,634 |
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
04/1964 |
25.43 |
|
2895
|
|
|
17/11/1938 |
|
30/04/1965 |
|
26.42 |
|
|
|
|
26.76 |
|
2896
|
|
|
16/11/1938 |
|
15/06/1964 |
|
25.58 |
|
|
|
|
26.02 |
|
2897
|
|
|
18/11/1938 |
|
01/03/1963 |
|
24.33 |
690,325 |
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1964 |
25.18 |
|
2898
|
|
|
19/11/1938 |
|
09/10/1964 |
|
25.92 |
|
|
|
|
26.26 |
|
2899
|
|
|
01/12/1938 |
|
19/03/1965 |
|
26.25 |
|
|
|
|
26.64 |
|
3800
|
|
|
03/12/1938 |
|
10/08/1964 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
26.05 |
|
3801
|
|
|
06/12/1938 |
|
10/08/1964 |
|
25.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
26.04 |
|
3802
|
|
|
29/12/1938 |
|
06/08/1965 |
|
26.67 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3803
|
|
|
07/01/1939 |
|
04/07/1963 |
|
24.5 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3804
|
|
|
05/08/1939 |
|
13/07/1964 |
|
24.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
25.38 |
|
3805
|
|
|
09/08/1939 |
|
28/09/1964 |
|
25.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
12/1964 |
25.37 |
|
3806
|
|
|
18/08/1939 |
|
02/12/1963 |
|
24.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1964 |
24.84 |
|
3807
|
|
|
23/08/1939 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
25.5 |
|
|
|
|
25.58 |
|
3808
|
|
|
04/09/1939 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
25.83 |
|
|
|
|
26.13 |
|
3809
|
|
|
12/09/1939 |
|
24/10/1964 |
|
25.08 |
|
|
|
|
25.36 |
|
3810
|
|
|
15/09/1939 |
|
13/11/1964 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.52 |
|
3811
|
|
|
19/09/1939 |
|
17/09/1963 |
|
24 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
03/1964 |
24.50 |
|
3812
|
|
|
23/09/1939 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
25.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
10/1965 |
26.08 |
|
3813
|
4855
|
3813
|
29/09/1939 |
|
10/07/1965 |
|
25.83 |
|
|
|
|
26.23 |
|
3814
|
|
|
11/03/1940 |
|
26/12/1964 |
|
24.75 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3815
|
|
|
15/03/1940 |
|
30/05/1964 |
|
24.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
08/1964 |
24.44 |
|
3816
|
|
|
21/03/1940 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
25.33 |
|
|
|
|
25.67 |
|
3817
|
|
|
28/03/1940 |
|
21/08/1965 |
|
25.42 |
|
|
|
|
33.15 |
|
3818
|
4852
|
3818
|
01/04/1940 |
|
21/05/1965 |
|
25.08 |
|
|
|
|
25.39 |
|
3819
|
|
|
12/04/1940 |
|
14/12/1964 |
|
24.67 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
04/1965 |
25.02 |
|
3820
|
4856
|
3820
|
17/04/1940 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
25.25 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1965 |
25.43 |
|
3821
|
|
|
22/04/1940 |
|
03/10/1964 |
|
24.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1964 |
24.67 |
|
3822
|
|
|
25/04/1940 |
|
15/01/1964 |
|
23.75 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3823
|
|
|
06/05/1940 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
25.17 |
|
|
|
|
25.46 |
|
3824
|
|
|
10/09/1940 |
|
08/06/1964 |
|
23.75 |
|
|
|
|
24.45 |
|
3825
|
|
|
16/09/1940 |
|
19/09/1964 |
|
24 |
|
|
|
|
24.35 |
|
3826
|
|
|
24/09/1940 |
|
15/01/1965 |
|
24.33 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
03/1965 |
24.49 |
|
3827
|
|
|
30/10/1940 |
|
13/11/1962 |
|
22.08 |
|
|
|
|
22.14 |
|
3828
|
|
|
06/11/1940 |
|
03/10/1964 |
|
23.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
12/1964 |
24.12 |
|
3829
|
|
|
21/11/1940 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
23.33 |
|
|
|
|
23.66 |
|
3830
|
|
|
30/11/1940 |
|
03/06/1965 |
|
24.58 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
10/1965 |
24.89 |
|
3831
|
4857
|
3831
|
13/12/1940 |
|
17/09/1963 |
|
22.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
04/1964 |
23.35 |
|
3832
|
|
|
07/01/1941 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
23.25 |
|
|
|
|
23.62 |
|
3833
|
|
|
09/01/1941 |
|
04/07/1963 |
|
22.5 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
09/1963 |
22.70 |
|
3834
|
|
|
20/12/1941 |
|
20/04/1964 |
|
22.33 |
|
|
|
|
22.92 |
|
3835
|
|
|
01/01/1942 |
|
15/01/1965 |
|
23 |
|
|
|
|
23.30 |
|
3836
|
|
|
08/01/1942 |
|
18/11/1965 |
|
23.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
01/1966 |
24.04 |
|
3837
|
4854
|
3837
|
13/01/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.5 |
|
|
|
|
23.77 |
|
3838
|
|
|
20/01/1942 |
|
27/11/1964 |
|
22.83 |
|
|
|
|
23.00 |
|
3839
|
4853
|
3839
|
26/01/1942 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
21.92 |
|
|
|
|
22.57 |
|
3840
|
|
|
31/01/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.5 |
|
|
|
|
23.72 |
|
3841
|
|
|
02/02/1942 |
|
10/03/1964 |
|
22.08 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
08/1964 |
22.55 |
|
3842
|
|
|
05/02/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
23.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
23.71 |
|
3843
|
|
|
13/02/1942 |
|
03/10/1963 |
|
21.67 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
03/1964 |
22.10 |
|
3844
|
|
|
20/04/1942 |
|
01/10/1965 |
|
23.5 |
|
|
|
|
23.76 |
|
3845
|
|
|
25/04/1942 |
|
27/06/1964 |
|
22.17 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3846
|
|
|
04/05/1942 |
|
01/11/1963 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
21.96 |
|
3847
|
|
|
08/05/1942 |
|
17/03/1964 |
|
21.83 |
|
|
|
|
22.20 |
|
3848
|
|
|
11/05/1942 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
23.17 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
23.45 |
|
3849
|
|
|
09/06/1942 |
|
08/05/1965 |
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
|
23.20 |
|
3850
|
|
|
11/06/1942 |
|
21/08/1965 |
|
23.17 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3851
|
|
|
18/06/1942 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
23.08 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
23.34 |
|
3852
|
|
|
20/06/1942 |
|
25/04/1964 |
|
21.83 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Kettering) |
07/1964 |
22.08 |
|
3853
|
|
|
24/06/1942 |
|
16/12/1963 |
|
21.5 |
|
|
|
|
22.49 |
|
3854
|
|
|
25/09/1942 |
|
16/06/1965 |
|
22.75 |
|
Cut |
Cohens (Morriston) |
08/1965 |
22.90 |
|
3855
|
|
|
01/10/1942 |
|
21/08/1965 |
|
22.83 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3856
|
|
|
08/10/1942 |
|
19/10/1964 |
|
22 |
|
|
|
|
22.29 |
|
3857
|
|
|
08/10/1942 |
|
07/03/1964 |
|
21.42 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Great Bridge) |
06/1964 |
21.70 |
|
3858
|
|
|
13/10/1942 |
|
10/09/1963 |
|
20.92 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
05/1964 |
21.60 |
|
3859
|
|
|
29/10/1942 |
|
21/05/1965 |
|
22.58 |
|
|
|
|
22.90 |
|
3860
|
|
|
31/10/1942 |
|
10/08/1964 |
|
21.83 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
11/1964 |
22.06 |
|
3861
|
|
|
01/11/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
22.67 |
|
|
|
|
22.97 |
|
3862
|
|
|
04/11/1942 |
|
06/02/1965 |
|
22.25 |
|
Prs |
Preserved |
|
|
|
3863
|
|
|
12/11/1942 |
|
26/10/1965 |
|
22.92 |
|
|
|
|
23.19 |
|
3864
|
|
|
17/11/1942 |
|
21/07/1965 |
|
22.67 |
|
|
|
|
22.93 |
|
3865
|
4851
|
3865
|
26/11/1942 |
|
27/03/1965 |
|
22.33 |
|
|
|
|
22.65 |
|
3866
|
|
|
01/12/1942 |
|
02/07/1965 |
|
22.58 |
|
Cut |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
10/1965 |
22.89 |