GWR Churchward "4200" Class 2-8-0T
GWR | GWR (Rblds) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4200 | 02/1923 | 09/03/1959 | 36.08 | 36.77 | |||||||
4201 | 12/1910 | 22/10/1959 | 48.83 | 49.28 | |||||||
4202 | 7242 | 02/1912 | 08/06/1964 | 28/09/1937 to 7200 |
52.33 | 52.87 | |||||
4203 | 02/1912 | 12/01/1961 | 48.92 | 49.62 | |||||||
4204 | 7243 | 02/1912 | 24/07/1964 | 14/01/1938 to 7200 |
52.42 | 52.87 | |||||
4205 | 7245 | 02/1912 | 07/09/1964 | 11/05/1938 to 7200 |
52.58 | 52.79 | |||||
4206 | 02/1912 | 31/12/1959 | 47.83 | 48.07 | |||||||
4207 | 02/1912 | 03/10/1961 | 49.67 | 50.28 | |||||||
4208 | 02/1912 | 16/11/1959 | 47.75 | 47.95 | |||||||
4209 | 7249 | 02/1912 | 16/06/1965 | 25/11/1938 to 7200 |
53.33 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1966 | 54.28 | ||
4210 | 7252 | 03/1912 | 16/06/1965 | 26/04/1939 to 7200 |
53.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1966 | 54.20 | ||
4211 | 03/1912 | 12/08/1959 | 47.42 | 47.78 | |||||||
4212 | 08/1912 | 15/06/1959 | 46.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 28/02/1960 | 47.57 | ||||
4213 | 09/1912 | 22/01/1964 | 51.33 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1964 | 51.78 | ||||
4214 | 09/1912 | 14/05/1964 | 51.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1964 | 51.95 | ||||
4215 | 09/1912 | 01/10/1959 | 47.08 | 47.48 | |||||||
4216 | 7244 | 11/1912 | 06/02/1965 | 04/03/1938 to 7200 |
52.25 | 52.36 | |||||
4217 | 11/1912 | 28/07/1959 | 46.67 | 47.36 | |||||||
4218 | 11/1912 | 05/10/1962 | 49.92 | 51.03 | |||||||
4219 | 7250 | 12/1912 | 28/09/1964 | 28/02/1939 to 7200 |
51.75 | 51.95 | |||||
4220 | 7241 | 12/1912 | 26/11/1962 | 14/09/1937 to 7200 |
49.92 | 50.03 | |||||
4221 | 12/1912 | 10/09/1959 | 46.75 | 47.24 | |||||||
4222 | 11/1913 | 09/10/1964 | 50.92 | 51.29 | |||||||
4223 | 11/1913 | 14/08/1959 | 45.75 | 46.03 | |||||||
4224 | 11/1913 | 02/02/1959 | 45.25 | 45.44 | |||||||
4225 | 11/1913 | 14/01/1963 | 49.17 | 49.87 | |||||||
4226 | 11/1913 | 09/03/1959 | 45.33 | 46.03 | |||||||
4227 | 11/1913 | 20/02/1965 | 51.25 | 51.70 | |||||||
4228 | 11/1913 | 16/12/1963 | 50.08 | 50.36 | |||||||
4229 | 11/1913 | 22/03/1961 | 47.33 | 47.45 | |||||||
4230 | 11/1913 | 27/09/1962 | 48.83 | 49.87 | |||||||
4231 | 11/1913 | 10/12/1959 | 46.08 | 46.20 | |||||||
4232 | 08/1914 | 21/10/1963 | 49.17 | 49.54 | |||||||
4233 | 08/1914 | 09/10/1964 | 50.17 | 50.54 | |||||||
4234 | 7246 | 09/1914 | 30/09/1963 | 29/07/1938 to 7200 |
49 | 49.70 | |||||
4235 | 09/1914 | 27/08/1962 | 47.92 | 48.12 | |||||||
4236 | 10/1914 | 17/09/1962 | 47.92 | 49.28 | |||||||
4237 | 10/1914 | 08/04/1964 | 49.5 | 49.78 | |||||||
4238 | 10/1914 | 16/12/1963 | 49.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 50.20 | ||||
4239 | 7240 | 10/1914 | 07/09/1964 | 08/1937 to 7200 |
49.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1965 | 50.29 | ||
4240 | 7251 | 10/1914 | 06/01/1964 | 21/03/1939 to 7200 |
49.25 | 49.53 | |||||
4241 | 10/1914 | 24/04/1964 | 49.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 50.20 | ||||
4242 | 02/1916 | 17/03/1964 | 48.08 | 48.53 | |||||||
4243 | 02/1916 | 14/05/1964 | 48.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1964 | 48.53 | ||||
4244 | 7247 | 02/1916 | 22/03/1963 | 08/09/1938 to 7200 |
47.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1964 | 48.87 | ||
4245 | 7253 | 03/1916 | 30/04/1965 | 08/12/1939 to 7200 |
49.08 | 49.45 | |||||
4246 | 03/1916 | 13/11/1962 | 46.67 | 47.78 | |||||||
4247 | 03/1916 | 24/04/1964 | 48.08 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
4248 | 04/1916 | 24/05/1963 | 47.08 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
4249 | 7248 | 04/1916 | 16/06/1965 | 12/10/1938 to 7200 |
49.17 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1966 | 50.12 | ||
4250 | 04/1916 | 05/09/1962 | 46.42 | 47.45 | |||||||
4251 | 05/1916 | 24/06/1963 | 47.08 | 47.79 | |||||||
4252 | 03/1917 | 30/09/1963 | 46.5 | 47.28 | |||||||
4253 | 03/1917 | 11/04/1963 | 46.08 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
4254 | 03/1917 | 30/04/1965 | 48.08 | 48.45 | |||||||
4255 | 04/1917 | 20/04/1964 | 47 | 47.79 | |||||||
4256 | 04/1917 | 22/01/1964 | 46.75 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 07/1964 | 47.28 | ||||
4257 | 04/1917 | 22/10/1963 | 46.5 | 47.12 | |||||||
4258 | 05/1917 | 21/04/1965 | 47.92 | 48.37 | |||||||
4259 | 05/1917 | 10/03/1964 | 46.83 | 47.87 | |||||||
4260 | 05/1917 | 15/06/1959 | 42.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 28/02/1960 | 42.82 | ||||
4261 | 05/1917 | 09/03/1959 | 41.83 | 42.53 | |||||||
4262 | 09/1919 | 20/04/1964 | 44.58 | 44.95 | |||||||
4263 | 10/1919 | 14/02/1964 | 44.33 | 44.70 | |||||||
4264 | 10/1919 | 29/07/1963 | 43.75 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1964 | 44.28 | ||||
4265 | 11/1919 | 24/06/1963 | 43.58 | 43.95 | |||||||
4266 | 11/1919 | 29/08/1962 | 42.75 | 43.28 | |||||||
4267 | 11/1919 | 23/10/1962 | 42.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1963 | 43.61 | ||||
4268 | 11/1919 | 25/08/1965 | 45.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1965 | 46.12 | ||||
4269 | 12/1919 | 19/11/1962 | 42.92 | 44.53 | |||||||
4270 | 12/1919 | 27/09/1962 | 42.75 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
4271 | 02/1920 | 16/12/1963 | 43.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 44.19 | ||||
4272 | 28/02/1920 | 15/10/1963 | 43.67 | 44.41 | |||||||
4273 | 03/1920 | 09/10/1964 | 44.58 | 44.95 | |||||||
4274 | 03/1920 | 22/06/1962 | 42.25 | 42.61 | |||||||
4275 | 03/1920 | 06/01/1964 | 43.83 | 44.28 | |||||||
4276 | 04/1920 | 13/11/1962 | 42.58 | 44.45 | |||||||
4277 | 04/1920 | 08/06/1964 | 44.17 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
4278 | 04/1920 | 06/07/1964 | 44.25 | 44.70 | |||||||
4279 | 05/1920 | 15/01/1964 | 43.67 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 05/1964 | 44.03 | ||||
4280 | 05/1920 | 22/01/1963 | 42.67 | 43.45 | |||||||
4281 | 05/1920 | 13/12/1960 | 40.58 | 40.78 | |||||||
4282 | 06/1920 | 10/09/1963 | 43.25 | 44.11 | |||||||
4283 | 06/1920 | 09/10/1964 | 44.33 | 44.78 | |||||||
4284 | 08/1920 | 07/09/1964 | 44.08 | 44.20 | |||||||
4285 | 08/1920 | 21/04/1965 | 44.67 | 45.12 | |||||||
4286 | 08/1921 | 21/09/1964 | 43.08 | 43.20 | |||||||
4287 | 08/1921 | 12/01/1961 | 39.42 | 39.69 | |||||||
4288 | 09/1921 | 29/11/1960 | 39.17 | 39.28 | |||||||
4289 | 09/1921 | 05/10/1962 | 41.08 | 42.36 | |||||||
4290 | 09/1921 | 11/02/1963 | 41.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1963 | 41.86 | ||||
4291 | 09/1921 | 17/09/1962 | 41 | 41.19 | |||||||
4292 | 10/1921 | 09/10/1964 | 43 | 43.20 | |||||||
4293 | 10/1921 | 24/08/1962 | 40.83 | 41.03 | |||||||
4294 | 11/1921 | 01/09/1964 | 42.83 | 42.95 | |||||||
4295 | 11/1921 | 14/12/1964 | 43.08 | 43.36 | |||||||
4296 | 08/1922 | 16/12/1963 | 41.33 | 41.86 | |||||||
4297 | 08/1922 | 06/02/1965 | 42.5 | 42.61 | |||||||
4298 | 10/1922 | 24/06/1963 | 40.67 | 41.03 | |||||||
4299 | 10/1922 | 16/12/1963 | 41.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1964 | 41.53 | ||||
5200 | 12/1922 | 26/03/1965 | 42.25 | 42.61 | |||||||
5201 | 12/1922 | 24/06/1963 | 40.5 | 41.03 | |||||||
5202 | 12/1922 | 16/06/1965 | 42.5 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 06/1966 | 43.53 | ||||
5203 | 02/1923 | 02/12/1963 | 40.83 | 41.53 | |||||||
5204 | 02/1923 | 19/11/1962 | 39.75 | 40.78 |