Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 4197 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17603 Week
» 70619 Month
» 190146 Year
» 3216999 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Churchward "4200" Class 2-8-0T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
GWR |
5275 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7200 |
Rblds |
on |
25/08/1934 |
|
GWR |
5276 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7201 |
Rblds |
on |
31/08/1934 |
|
GWR |
5277 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7202 |
Rblds |
on |
05/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5278 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7203 |
Rblds |
on |
11/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5279 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7204 |
Rblds |
on |
14/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5287 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7212 |
Rblds |
on |
18/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5288 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7213 |
Rblds |
on |
24/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5292 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7217 |
Rblds |
on |
28/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5289 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7214 |
Rblds |
on |
29/09/1934 |
|
GWR |
5294 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7219 |
Rblds |
on |
10/10/1934 |
|
GWR |
5280 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7205 |
Rblds |
on |
17/10/1934 |
|
GWR |
5281 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7206 |
Rblds |
on |
18/10/1934 |
|
GWR |
5282 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7207 |
Rblds |
on |
24/10/1934 |
|
GWR |
5283 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7208 |
Rblds |
on |
29/10/1934 |
|
GWR |
5285 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7210 |
Rblds |
on |
01/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5284 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7209 |
Rblds |
on |
06/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5286 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7211 |
Rblds |
on |
16/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5290 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7215 |
Rblds |
on |
16/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5291 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7216 |
Rblds |
on |
23/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5293 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7218 |
Rblds |
on |
30/11/1934 |
|
GWR |
5264 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7229 |
Rblds |
on |
24/08/1935 |
|
GWR |
5267 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7232 |
Rblds |
on |
28/08/1935 |
|
GWR |
5268 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7233 |
Rblds |
on |
05/09/1935 |
|
GWR |
5269 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7234 |
Rblds |
on |
07/09/1935 |
|
GWR |
5255 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7220 |
Rblds |
on |
17/09/1935 |
|
GWR |
5256 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7221 |
Rblds |
on |
25/09/1935 |
|
GWR |
5258 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7223 |
Rblds |
on |
10/10/1935 |
|
GWR |
5257 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7222 |
Rblds |
on |
15/10/1935 |
|
GWR |
5260 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7225 |
Rblds |
on |
28/10/1935 |
|
GWR |
5261 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7226 |
Rblds |
on |
23/11/1935 |
|
GWR |
5262 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7227 |
Rblds |
on |
27/11/1935 |
|
GWR |
5265 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7230 |
Rblds |
on |
13/12/1935 |
|
GWR |
5263 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7228 |
Rblds |
on |
14/12/1935 |
|
GWR |
5266 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7231 |
Rblds |
on |
23/12/1935 |
|
GWR |
5270 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7235 |
Rblds |
on |
03/01/1936 |
|
GWR |
5271 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7236 |
Rblds |
on |
18/01/1936 |
|
GWR |
5272 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7237 |
Rblds |
on |
28/01/1936 |
|
GWR |
5273 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7238 |
Rblds |
on |
04/02/1936 |
|
GWR |
5274 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7239 |
Rblds |
on |
17/02/1936 |
|
GWR |
5259 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7224 |
Rblds |
on |
02/11/1936 |
|
GWR |
4239 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7240 |
Rblds |
m/e |
08/1937 |
|
GWR |
4220 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7241 |
Rblds |
on |
14/09/1937 |
|
GWR |
4202 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7242 |
Rblds |
on |
28/09/1937 |
|
GWR |
4204 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7243 |
Rblds |
on |
14/01/1938 |
|
GWR |
4216 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7244 |
Rblds |
on |
04/03/1938 |
|
GWR |
4205 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7245 |
Rblds |
on |
11/05/1938 |
|
GWR |
4234 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7246 |
Rblds |
on |
29/07/1938 |
|
GWR |
4244 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7247 |
Rblds |
on |
08/09/1938 |
|
GWR |
4249 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7248 |
Rblds |
on |
12/10/1938 |
|
GWR |
4209 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7249 |
Rblds |
on |
25/11/1938 |
|
GWR |
4219 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7250 |
Rblds |
m/e |
02/1939 |
|
GWR |
4240 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7251 |
Rblds |
m/e |
03/1939 |
|
GWR |
4210 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7252 |
Rblds |
m/e |
04/1939 |
|
GWR |
4245 |
renumbered to |
GWR |
7253 |
Rblds |
m/e |
12/1939 |
|