Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 961 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4560 Week
» 10694 Month
» 238578 Year
» 1460143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

13 0-6-0+0-6-0


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Class 13) BR (TOPS) Date To Service Bld Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
D3697 D4502 13002 01/05/1959 DA 08/1965
from 08
Sheffield Darnall 61.21
D3698 D4500 13003 07/05/1959 DA 06/1965
from 08
Sheffield Darnall 61.19
D4187 D4502 13002 06/07/1962 DA 08/1965
from 08
Stratford 58.02
D4188 D4500 13003 11/07/1962 DA 06/1965
from 08
Stratford 58.01
D4189 D4501 13001 31/07/1962 DA 26/06/1965
from 08
Stratford 57.96
D4190 D4501 13001 02/08/1962 DA 26/06/1965
from 08
Stratford 57.95