112
BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
51681 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51682 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51683 | 07/11/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath (New) | 07/11/1959 | 02/11/1969 |
51684 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51685 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51686 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51687 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51688 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51689 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51690 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51691 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51692 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51693 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51694 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51695 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51696 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51697 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51698 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51699 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51700 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51701 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51702 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51703 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51704 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51705 | 21/11/1959 | 24A W |
Accrington (New) Withdrawn |
21/11/1959 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 |
51706 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51707 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51708 | 07/11/1959 | 26A W |
Newton Heath (New) Withdrawn |
07/11/1959 30/11/1968 |
30/11/1968 |
51709 | W | Withdrawn | 22/03/1969 | 22/03/1969 | |
51710 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51711 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51712 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51713 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51714 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51715 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51716 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51717 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51718 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51719 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51720 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51721 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51722 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51723 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51724 | W | Withdrawn | 30/12/1967 | 30/12/1967 | |
51725 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51726 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51727 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51728 | 02/11/1969 | ||||
51729 | W | Withdrawn | 30/11/1968 | 30/11/1968 | |
51730 | 21/11/1959 | 24A W |
Accrington (New) Withdrawn |
21/11/1959 30/11/1968 |
30/11/1968 |