Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 112 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 7296 Month
» 315277 Year
» 1199658 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

113


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
51731 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51732 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51733 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
22/02/1969
22/02/1969
51734 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51735 05/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
05/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51736 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51737 19/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
19/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51738 26/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
26/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51739 26/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
26/12/1959
17/05/1969
17/05/1969
51740 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51741 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51742 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51743 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51744 23/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
23/01/1960
17/05/1969
17/05/1969
51745 30/01/1960 26A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Withdrawn
30/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51746 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51747 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51748 27/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51749 27/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51750 12/03/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51751 12/03/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51752 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
51753 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
51754 W Withdrawn 19/04/1969 19/04/1969
51755 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
51756 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51757 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51758 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51759 28/11/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
28/11/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51760 05/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
05/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51761 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
17/05/1969
17/05/1969
51762 19/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
19/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51763 26/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
26/12/1959
10/12/1966
10/12/1966
51764 26/12/1959 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
26/12/1959
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51765 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51766 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51767 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51768 16/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
16/01/1960
22/02/1969
22/02/1969
51769 23/01/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
23/01/1960
17/05/1969
17/05/1969
51770 30/01/1960 26A
W
Newton Heath (New)
Withdrawn
30/01/1960
27/06/1964
27/06/1964
51771 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51772 13/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
13/02/1960
19/04/1969
19/04/1969
51773 27/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51774 27/02/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
27/02/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51775 12/03/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51776 12/03/1960 24A
W
Accrington (New)
Withdrawn
12/03/1960
12/07/1969
12/07/1969
51777 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
51778 W Withdrawn 19/04/1969 19/04/1969
51779 W Withdrawn 12/07/1969 12/07/1969
51780 W Withdrawn 24/02/1962 24/02/1962