113
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
51756 | 28/11/1959 | Accrington | 19/04/1969 | Accrington | 9.42 | 64.45 | ||||
51757 | 28/11/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.67 | 64.45 | ||||
51758 | 28/11/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.67 | 64.45 | ||||
51759 | 28/11/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.67 | 64.45 | ||||
51760 | 05/12/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.58 | 64.44 | ||||
51761 | 13/02/1960 | Accrington | 17/05/1969 | Accrington | 9.25 | 64.24 | ||||
51762 | 19/12/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.58 | 64.40 | ||||
51763 | 26/12/1959 | Accrington | 10/12/1966 | 7 | 64.38 | |||||
51764 | 26/12/1959 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.58 | 64.38 | ||||
51765 | 16/01/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.5 | 64.32 | ||||
51766 | 16/01/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.5 | 64.32 | ||||
51767 | 16/01/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.5 | 64.32 | ||||
51768 | 16/01/1960 | Accrington | 22/02/1969 | Accrington | 9.08 | 64.32 | ||||
51769 | 23/01/1960 | Accrington | 17/05/1969 | Accrington | 9.33 | 64.30 | ||||
51770 | 30/01/1960 | Newton Heath | 27/06/1964 | 4.42 | 64.28 | |||||
51771 | 13/02/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.42 | 64.24 | ||||
51772 | 13/02/1960 | Accrington | 19/04/1969 | Accrington | 9.17 | 64.24 | ||||
51773 | 27/02/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.42 | 64.21 | ||||
51774 | 27/02/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.42 | 64.21 | ||||
51775 | 12/03/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.33 | 64.17 | ||||
51776 | 12/03/1960 | Accrington | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | 9.33 | 64.17 | ||||
51777 | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | ||||||||
51778 | 19/04/1969 | Accrington | ||||||||
51779 | 12/07/1969 | Accrington | ||||||||
51780 | 24/02/1962 |