Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 175 Today
» 835 Yesterday
» 1876 Week
» 26538 Month
» 285397 Year
» 796499 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

113


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
51731 28/11/1959 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.67 58.87
51732 28/11/1959 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.67 58.87
51733 28/11/1959 Accrington 22/02/1969 Accrington 9.25 58.87
51734 28/11/1959 Accrington 19/04/1969 Accrington 9.42 58.87
51735 05/12/1959 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.58 58.85
51736 13/02/1960 Accrington 19/04/1969 Accrington 9.17 58.66
51737 19/12/1959 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.58 58.81
51738 26/12/1959 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.58 58.79
51739 26/12/1959 Accrington 17/05/1969 Accrington 9.42 58.79
51740 16/01/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.5 58.73
51741 16/01/1960 Accrington 19/04/1969 Accrington 9.25 58.73
51742 16/01/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.5 58.73
51743 16/01/1960 Accrington 19/04/1969 Accrington 9.25 58.73
51744 23/01/1960 Accrington 17/05/1969 Accrington 9.33 58.72
51745 30/01/1960 Newton Heath 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.5 58.70
51746 13/02/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.42 58.66
51747 13/02/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.42 58.66
51748 27/02/1960 Accrington 19/04/1969 Accrington 9.17 58.62
51749 27/02/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.42 58.62
51750 12/03/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.33 58.58
51751 12/03/1960 Accrington 12/07/1969 Accrington 9.33 58.58
51752 12/07/1969 Accrington
51753 12/07/1969 Accrington
51754 19/04/1969 Accrington
51755 12/07/1969 Accrington