GWR Dean "3031" Class 4-2-2
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Achilles | 3001 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
Achilles | 3002 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
Achilles | 3003 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1909 | 02/1909 |
Achilles | 3004 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1911 | 10/1911 |
Achilles | 3005 | 02/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1908 | 02/1908 |
Achilles | 3006 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
Achilles | 3007 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1912 | 03/1912 |
Achilles | 3008 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1912 | 08/1912 |
Achilles | 3009 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
Achilles | 3010 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
Achilles | 3011 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1911 | 09/1911 |
Achilles | 3012 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
Achilles | 3013 | 03/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
Achilles | 3014 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
Achilles | 3015 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1908 | 06/1908 |
Achilles | 3016 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1911 | 03/1911 |
Achilles | 3017 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
Achilles | 3018 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1913 | 06/1913 |
Achilles | 3019 | 04/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1908 | 09/1908 |
Achilles | 3020 | 04/1892 | W BAN |
Withdrawn Banbury |
02/1908 31/12/1949 |
02/1908 |
Achilles | 3021 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
Achilles | 3022 | 05/1891 | W WEY WOS |
Withdrawn Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Worcester |
02/1909 30/06/1948 08/10/1949 |
02/1909 |
Achilles | 3023 | 07/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1912 | 09/1912 |
Achilles | 3024 | 07/1891 | W DID 84C |
Withdrawn Didcot Banbury |
02/1909 08/10/1949 29/11/1952 |
02/1909 |
Achilles | 3025 | 08/1891 | W 86B 86G 87G |
Withdrawn Newport Pill Pontypool Road Carmarthen |
09/1908 30/04/1951 03/11/1951 01/11/1952 |
09/1908 |
Achilles | 3026 | 08/1891 | W 84C |
Withdrawn Banbury |
02/1909 16/06/1951 |
02/1909 |
Achilles | 3027 | 08/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1914 | 07/1914 |
Achilles | 3028 | 08/1891 | W 84B 84F |
Withdrawn Oxley Stourbridge Junction |
02/1909 16/06/1951 31/10/1951 |
02/1909 |
Achilles | 3029 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
Achilles | 3030 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
Achilles | 3031 | 03/1894 | W 85A |
Withdrawn Worcester |
07/1912 01/11/1952 |
07/1912 |
Achilles | 3032 | 07/1894 | W WEY SPM |
Withdrawn Weymouth Radipole (GWR) St Philips Marsh |
10/1913 14/10/1948 29/01/1949 |
10/1913 |
Achilles | 3033 | 07/1894 | W 84J |
Withdrawn Croes Newydd |
07/1911 08/09/1951 |
07/1911 |
Achilles | 3034 | 07/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1908 | 10/1908 |
Achilles | 3035 | 07/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1909 | 05/1909 |
Achilles | 3036 | 09/1894 | W CDF 86G |
Withdrawn Cardiff Canton Pontypool Road |
03/1911 08/10/1949 17/05/1952 |
03/1911 |
Achilles | 3037 | 09/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1908 | 10/1908 |
Achilles | 3038 | 09/1894 | W PPRD |
Withdrawn Pontypool Road |
10/1908 27/11/1948 |
10/1908 |
Achilles | 3039 | 09/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1915 | 07/1915 |
Achilles | 3040 | 09/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1912 | 03/1912 |
Achilles | 3041 | 10/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1912 | 11/1912 |
Achilles | 3042 | 10/1894 | W PPRD |
Withdrawn Pontypool Road |
01/1912 27/11/1948 |
01/1912 |
Achilles | 3043 | 01/1895 | W BAN |
Withdrawn Banbury |
12/1913 28/01/1950 |
12/1913 |
Achilles | 3044 | 01/1895 | W PPRD |
Withdrawn Pontypool Road |
10/1908 27/11/1948 |
10/1908 |
Achilles | 3045 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1914 | 05/1914 |
Achilles | 3046 | 01/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1908 | 10/1908 |
Achilles | 3047 | 02/1895 | W 84B |
Withdrawn Oxley |
11/1912 27/12/1952 |
11/1912 |
Achilles | 3048 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1913 | 06/1913 |
Achilles | 3049 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1913 | 07/1913 |
Achilles | 3050 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1915 | 12/1915 |
Achilles | 3051 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1912 | 11/1912 |
Achilles | 3052 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1913 | 09/1913 |
Achilles | 3053 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1911 | 09/1911 |
Achilles | 3054 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1911 | 10/1911 |
Achilles | 3055 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1914 | 02/1914 |
Achilles | 3056 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1914 | 10/1914 |
Achilles | 3057 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1912 | 09/1912 |
Achilles | 3058 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1912 | 02/1912 |
Achilles | 3059 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1913 | 06/1913 |
Achilles | 3060 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1915 | 03/1915 |
Achilles | 3061 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1912 | 12/1912 |
Achilles | 3062 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1915 | 04/1915 |
Achilles | 3063 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1912 | 01/1912 |
Achilles | 3064 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1911 | 09/1911 |
Achilles | 3065 | 07/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1914 | 10/1914 |
Achilles | 3066 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1913 | 10/1913 |
Achilles | 3067 | 12/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1914 | 12/1914 |
Achilles | 3068 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1912 | 11/1912 |
Achilles | 3069 | 01/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1912 | 06/1912 |
Achilles | 3070 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1914 | 10/1914 |
Achilles | 3071 | 02/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1914 | 10/1914 |
Achilles | 3072 | 06/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1912 | 08/1912 |
Achilles | 3073 | 06/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1912 | 10/1912 |
Achilles | 3074 | 06/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1915 | 12/1915 |
Achilles | 3075 | 07/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1912 | 06/1912 |
Achilles | 3076 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1912 | 07/1912 |
Achilles | 3077 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1912 | 11/1912 |
Achilles | 3078 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1911 | 11/1911 |
Achilles | 3079 | 02/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1911 | 09/1911 |
Achilles | 3080 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1913 | 10/1913 |