GWR Dean "3031" Class 4-2-2
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/1908 | Condemned | 3005 | COND | ||||
02/1908 | Condemned | 3020 | COND | ||||
06/1908 | Condemned | 3001 | COND | ||||
06/1908 | Condemned | 3014 | COND | ||||
06/1908 | Condemned | 3015 | COND | ||||
09/1908 | Condemned | 3002 | COND | ||||
09/1908 | Condemned | 3010 | COND | ||||
09/1908 | Condemned | 3017 | COND | ||||
09/1908 | Condemned | 3019 | COND | ||||
09/1908 | Condemned | 3025 | COND | ||||
10/1908 | Condemned | 3034 | COND | ||||
10/1908 | Condemned | 3037 | COND | ||||
10/1908 | Condemned | 3038 | COND | ||||
10/1908 | Condemned | 3044 | COND | ||||
10/1908 | Condemned | 3046 | COND | ||||
02/1909 | Condemned | 3003 | COND | ||||
02/1909 | Condemned | 3022 | COND | ||||
02/1909 | Condemned | 3024 | COND | ||||
02/1909 | Condemned | 3026 | COND | ||||
02/1909 | Condemned | 3028 | COND | ||||
05/1909 | Condemned | 3012 | COND | ||||
05/1909 | Condemned | 3021 | COND | ||||
05/1909 | Condemned | 3029 | COND | ||||
05/1909 | Condemned | 3030 | COND | ||||
05/1909 | Condemned | 3035 | COND | ||||
03/1911 | Condemned | 3016 | COND | ||||
03/1911 | Condemned | 3036 | COND | ||||
07/1911 | Condemned | 3033 | COND | ||||
09/1911 | Condemned | 3011 | COND | ||||
09/1911 | Condemned | 3053 | COND | ||||
09/1911 | Condemned | 3064 | COND | ||||
09/1911 | Condemned | 3079 | COND | ||||
10/1911 | Condemned | 3004 | COND | ||||
10/1911 | Condemned | 3054 | COND | ||||
11/1911 | Condemned | 3078 | COND | ||||
01/1912 | Condemned | 3042 | COND | ||||
01/1912 | Condemned | 3063 | COND | ||||
02/1912 | Condemned | 3058 | COND | ||||
03/1912 | Condemned | 3007 | COND | ||||
03/1912 | Condemned | 3040 | COND | ||||
06/1912 | Condemned | 3069 | COND | ||||
06/1912 | Condemned | 3075 | COND | ||||
07/1912 | Condemned | 3031 | COND | ||||
07/1912 | Condemned | 3076 | COND | ||||
08/1912 | Condemned | 3008 | COND | ||||
08/1912 | Condemned | 3072 | COND | ||||
09/1912 | Condemned | 3023 | COND | ||||
09/1912 | Condemned | 3057 | COND | ||||
10/1912 | Condemned | 3073 | COND | ||||
11/1912 | Condemned | 3041 | COND | ||||
11/1912 | Condemned | 3047 | COND | ||||
11/1912 | Condemned | 3051 | COND | ||||
11/1912 | Condemned | 3068 | COND | ||||
11/1912 | Condemned | 3077 | COND | ||||
12/1912 | Condemned | 3061 | COND | ||||
06/1913 | Condemned | 3018 | COND | ||||
06/1913 | Condemned | 3048 | COND | ||||
06/1913 | Condemned | 3059 | COND | ||||
07/1913 | Condemned | 3049 | COND | ||||
09/1913 | Condemned | 3052 | COND | ||||
10/1913 | Condemned | 3032 | COND | ||||
10/1913 | Condemned | 3066 | COND | ||||
10/1913 | Condemned | 3080 | COND | ||||
12/1913 | Condemned | 3043 | COND | ||||
02/1914 | Condemned | 3006 | COND | ||||
02/1914 | Condemned | 3009 | COND | ||||
02/1914 | Condemned | 3013 | COND | ||||
02/1914 | Condemned | 3055 | COND | ||||
05/1914 | Condemned | 3045 | COND | ||||
07/1914 | Condemned | 3027 | COND | ||||
10/1914 | Condemned | 3056 | COND | ||||
10/1914 | Condemned | 3065 | COND | ||||
10/1914 | Condemned | 3070 | COND | ||||
10/1914 | Condemned | 3071 | COND | ||||
12/1914 | Condemned | 3067 | COND | ||||
03/1915 | Condemned | 3060 | COND | ||||
04/1915 | Condemned | 3062 | COND | ||||
07/1915 | Condemned | 3039 | COND | ||||
12/1915 | Condemned | 3050 | COND | ||||
12/1915 | Condemned | 3074 | COND | ||||
30/06/1948 | Reallocation | 3022 | 98W | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
14/10/1948 | Reallocation | 3032 | 98W | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3038 | 98W | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3042 | 98W | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
27/11/1948 | Reallocation | 3044 | 98W | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
29/01/1949 | Reallocation | 3032 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | SPM | St Philips Marsh | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 3022 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | WOS | Worcester | |
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 3024 | 98W | DID | Didcot | ||
08/10/1949 | Reallocation | 3036 | 98W | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 3020 | 98W | BAN | Banbury | ||
28/01/1950 | Reallocation | 3043 | 98W | BAN | Banbury | ||
30/04/1951 | Reallocation | 3025 | 98W | 86B | Newport Pill | ||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 3026 | 98W | 84C | Banbury | ||
16/06/1951 | Reallocation | 3028 | 98W | 84B | Oxley | ||
08/09/1951 | Reallocation | 3033 | 98W | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
31/10/1951 | Reallocation | 3028 | 84B | Oxley | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | |
03/11/1951 | Reallocation | 3025 | 86B | Newport Pill | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
17/05/1952 | Reallocation | 3036 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 3025 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 87G | Carmarthen | |
01/11/1952 | Reallocation | 3031 | 98W | 85A | Worcester | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 3024 | DID | Didcot | 84C | Banbury | |
27/12/1952 | Reallocation | 3047 | 98W | 84B | Oxley |