GWR Dean "3252" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3264 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3274 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3279 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | |||
16/11/1935 | Reallocation | 3284 | ABH | Aberystwyth | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 3258 | WLN | Wellington | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 3264 | OSY | Oswestry | ABH | Aberystwyth | |
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 3272 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
14/12/1935 | Reallocation | 3274 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | |
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 3255 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
11/01/1936 | Reallocation | 3285 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |||
03/1936 | Condemned | 3263 | COND | ||||
03/1936 | Condemned | 3288 | COND | ||||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 3252 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 3258 | WLN | Wellington | SRD | Stafford Road | |
07/03/1936 | Reallocation | 3271 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
04/1936 | Condemned | 3286 | COND | ||||
05/1936 | Condemned | 3275 | COND | ||||
06/1936 | Condemned | 3255 | MCH | Machynlleth | COND | ||
06/1936 | Condemned | 3271 | MCH | Machynlleth | COND | ||
10/1936 | Condemned | 3287 | COND | ||||
11/1936 | Condemned | 3274 | TYS.1 | Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) | COND | ||
01/1937 | Condemned | 3277 | COND | ||||
01/1937 | Condemned | 3285 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | COND | ||
02/1937 | Condemned | 3281 | COND | ||||
03/1937 | Condemned | 3269 | COND | ||||
04/1937 | Condemned | 3261 | COND | ||||
05/1937 | Condemned | 3257 | COND | ||||
08/1937 | Condemned | 3252 | OSY | Oswestry | COND | ||
09/1937 | Condemned | 3262 | COND | ||||
10/1937 | Condemned | 3282 | COND | ||||
02/1938 | Condemned | 3258 | SRD | Stafford Road | COND | ||
03/1938 | Condemned | 3266 | COND | ||||
04/1938 | Condemned | 3260 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 3259 | COND | ||||
10/1938 | Condemned | 3279 | SDN.1 | Andover Junction (MSWJR) | COND | ||
12/1938 | Condemned | 3278 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 3253 | COND | ||||
01/1939 | Condemned | 3290 | COND | ||||
03/1939 | Condemned | 3268 | COND | ||||
04/1939 | Condemned | 3270 | COND | ||||
05/1939 | Condemned | 3280 | COND | ||||
08/1939 | Condemned | 3256 | COND | ||||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9054 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9064 | ABH | Aberystwyth | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9065 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9072 | MCH | Machynlleth | MCH | Machynlleth | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9073 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9076 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9083 | DID | Didcot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9084 | ABH | Aberystwyth | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9087 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9089 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9091 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
21/02/1948 | Reallocation | 9091 | MCH | Machynlleth | TYS | Tyseley | |
31/05/1948 | Reallocation | 9084 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |
01/02/1949 | Condemned | 9091 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1949 | Condemned | 9072 | 98W | COND | |||
18/07/1949 | Condemned | 9087 | 98W | COND | |||
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 9073 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | OXY | Oxley | |
05/11/1949 | Reallocation | 9076 | 98W | OXY | Oxley | ||
22/11/1949 | Condemned | 9076 | OXY | Oxley | COND | ||
08/12/1949 | Condemned | 9073 | 98W | COND | |||
15/12/1949 | Condemned | 9064 | 98W | COND | |||
23/12/1949 | Condemned | 9065 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1949 | Reallocation | 9084 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | MCH | Machynlleth | |
01/06/1950 | Condemned | 9054 | 98W | COND | |||
27/12/1950 | Condemned | 9083 | 98W | COND | |||
31/12/1950 | Reallocation | 9089 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 89A | Oswestry | |
03/05/1951 | Condemned | 9084 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1951 | Condemned | 9089 | 98W | COND |