GWR Dean "3300" Class 4-4-0
Class | GWR (Orig) | GWR (1912) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bulldog | 3253 | 3300 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 |
Bulldog | 3262 | 3301 | 04/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 |
Bulldog | 3263 | 3302 | 04/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 |
Bulldog | 3264 | 3303 | 05/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
Bulldog | 3268 | 3304 | 06/1896 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3269 | 3305 | 06/1896 | sdn W |
Andover Junction (MSWJR) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 09/1936 |
09/1936 |
Bulldog | 3273 | 3306 | 11/1896 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 01/1939 |
01/1939 |
Bulldog | 3279 | 3307 | 01/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1934 | 10/02/1934 |
Bulldog | 3280 | 3308 | 01/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 |
Bulldog | 3282 | 3309 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 02/06/1934 |
Bulldog | 3286 | 3310 | 02/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
Bulldog | 3312 | 3311 | 10/1898 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
Bulldog | 3316 | 3312 | 03/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1931 | 04/1931 |
Bulldog | 3318 | 3313 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1946 | 04/04/1946 |
Bulldog | 3322 | 3314 | 04/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3324 | 3315 | 06/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1931 | 06/1931 |
Bulldog | 3325 | 3316 | 06/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1938 | 04/1938 |
Bulldog | 3327 | 3317 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 |
Bulldog | 3330 | 3318 | 07/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1934 | 10/02/1934 |
Bulldog | 3331 | 3319 | 08/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
Bulldog | 3332 | 3320 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1929 | 08/1929 |
Bulldog | 3333 | 3321 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1935 | 04/1935 |
Bulldog | 3334 | 3322 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 |
Bulldog | 3335 | 3323 | 11/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 |
Bulldog | 3336 | 3324 | 12/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1935 | 06/1935 |
Bulldog | 3337 | 3325 | 12/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 |
Bulldog | 3338 | 3326 | 01/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 24/11/1933 |
Bulldog | 3339 | 3327 | 01/1900 | CNYD W |
Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 03/1936 |
03/1936 |
Bulldog | 3340 | 3328 | 01/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1934 | 04/04/1934 |
Bulldog | 3341 | 3329 | 01/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 |
Bulldog | 3342 | 3330 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1938 | 08/1938 |
Bulldog | 3343 | 3331 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1934 | 03/02/1934 |
Bulldog | 3344 | 3332 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1931 | 10/1931 |
Bulldog | 3345 | 3333 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 |
Bulldog | 3346 | 3334 | 02/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1930 | 04/1930 |
Bulldog | 3347 | 3335 | 02/1900 | EXE W |
Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1948 |
04/10/1948 |
Bulldog | 3348 | 3336 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 |
Bulldog | 3349 | 3337 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1934 | 24/05/1934 |
Bulldog | 3350 | 3338 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 04/11/1933 |
Bulldog | 3351 | 3339 | 03/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 |
Bulldog | 3352 | 3340 | 10/1899 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 02/06/1934 |
Bulldog | 3353 | 3341 | 05/1900 | NA EXE W |
Newton Abbot Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/02/1949 11/1949 |
22/11/1949 |
Bulldog | 3354 | 3342 | 08/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1938 | 10/1938 |
Bulldog | 3355 | 3343 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1934 | 28/03/1934 |
Bulldog | 3356 | 3344 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 13/01/1934 |
Bulldog | 3357 | 3345 | 06/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 |
Bulldog | 3358 | 3346 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 02/01/1934 |
Bulldog | 3359 | 3347 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 |
Bulldog | 3360 | 3348 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3361 | 3349 | 10/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3362 | 3350 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 |
Bulldog | 3363 | 3351 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1931 | 03/1931 |
Bulldog | 3364 | 3352 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 04/11/1933 |
Bulldog | 3365 | 3353 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 07/12/1946 |
Bulldog | 3366 | 3354 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 16/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3367 | 3355 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 13/01/1934 |
Bulldog | 3368 | 3356 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 |
Bulldog | 3369 | 3357 | 11/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 30/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3370 | 3358 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 30/11/1945 |
Bulldog | 3371 | 3359 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1936 | 09/1936 |
Bulldog | 3372 | 3360 | 12/1900 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 30/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3413 | 3361 | 12/1902 | TN W |
Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1947 |
17/09/1947 |
Bulldog | 3414 | 3362 | 12/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 |
Bulldog | 3415 | 3363 | 01/1903 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1949 |
21/10/1949 |
Bulldog | 3416 | 3364 | 02/1903 | SDN WES W |
Swindon Westbury Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 06/1949 |
21/06/1949 |
Bulldog | 3417 | 3365 | 02/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1930 | 01/1930 |
Bulldog | 3418 | 3366 | 02/1903 | CHR W |
Chester West Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 |
Bulldog | 3419 | 3367 | 02/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 |
Bulldog | 3420 | 3368 | 02/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 |
Bulldog | 3421 | 3389 | 02/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1936 | 07/1936 |
Bulldog | 3422 | 3370 | 03/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 |
Bulldog | 3423 | 3371 | 03/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1944 | 08/11/1944 |
Bulldog | 3424 | 3372 | 03/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1936 | 10/1936 |
Bulldog | 3425 | 3373 | 05/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1939 | 02/1939 |
Bulldog | 3426 | 3374 | 05/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1937 | 06/1937 |
Bulldog | 3427 | 3375 | 05/1903 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 09/1947 |
11/09/1947 |
Bulldog | 3428 | 3376 | 05/1903 | sdn DID W |
Andover Junction (MSWJR) Didcot Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 09/1948 |
27/09/1948 |
Bulldog | 3429 | 3377 | 05/1903 | SALOP WOS W |
Shrewsbury Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1949 03/1951 |
21/03/1951 |
Bulldog | 3430 | 3378 | 05/1903 | BRD W |
Bristol Bath Road Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 11/1945 |
30/11/1945 |
Bulldog | 3431 | 3379 | 05/1903 | GLO W |
Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1948 |
19/06/1948 |
Bulldog | 3432 | 3380 | 05/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1938 | 03/1938 |
Bulldog | 3443 | 3381 | 09/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1935 | 11/1935 |
Bulldog | 3444 | 3382 | 09/1903 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
25/11/1949 |
Bulldog | 3445 | 3383 | 09/1903 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
13/12/1949 |
Bulldog | 3446 | 3384 | 09/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 |
Bulldog | 3447 | 3385 | 09/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 30/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3448 | 3386 | 09/1903 | RDG W |
Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
22/11/1949 |
Bulldog | 3449 | 3387 | 10/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1934 | 06/12/1934 |
Bulldog | 3450 | 3388 | 10/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 |
Bulldog | 3451 | 3389 | 10/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 |
Bulldog | 3452 | 3390 | 10/1903 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1939 | 03/1939 |
Bulldog | 3453 | 3391 | 01/1904 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 05/1948 |
14/05/1948 |
Bulldog | 3454 | 3392 | 01/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1937 | 01/1937 |
Bulldog | 3455 | 3393 | 01/1904 | WOS W |
Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 11/1949 |
28/11/1949 |
Bulldog | 3456 | 3394 | 01/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 01/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3457 | 3395 | 01/1904 | BAN EXE W |
Banbury Exeter Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 08/1948 |
20/08/1948 |
Bulldog | 3458 | 3396 | 01/1904 | DID W |
Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/1948 |
01/03/1948 |
Bulldog | 3459 | 3397 | 02/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 17/11/1934 |
Bulldog | 3460 | 3398 | 02/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 |
Bulldog | 3461 | 3399 | 02/1904 | CHR W |
Chester West Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1947 |
08/10/1947 |
Bulldog | 3462 | 3400 | 02/1904 | NA EXE W |
Newton Abbot Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/11/1948 05/1949 |
10/05/1949 |
Bulldog | 3463 | 3401 | 03/1904 | LA HFD W |
Laira Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/09/1948 11/1949 |
29/11/1949 |
Bulldog | 3464 | 3402 | 03/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 |
Bulldog | 3465 | 3403 | 03/1904 | CNYD W |
Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/1937 |
01/1937 |
Bulldog | 3466 | 3404 | 03/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1937 | 09/1937 |
Bulldog | 3467 | 3405 | 03/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 |
Bulldog | 3468 | 3406 | 03/1904 | PPRD HFD W |
Pontypool Road Hereford Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 03/12/1949 01/1951 |
31/01/1951 |
Bulldog | 3469 | 3407 | 04/1904 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
08/12/1949 |
Bulldog | 3470 | 3408 | 04/1904 | WEY WES DID W |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Westbury Didcot Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 07/03/1936 15/06/1947 04/1948 |
10/04/1948 |
Bulldog | 3471 | 3409 | 04/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 |
Bulldog | 3472 | 3410 | 04/1904 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1936 | 11/1936 |
Bulldog | 3701 | 3411 | 04/1906 | TDU W |
Tondu Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 10/1938 |
10/1938 |
Bulldog | 3702 | 3412 | 04/1906 | brd W |
Weston-super-Mare Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 03/1936 |
13/03/1936 |
Bulldog | 3703 | 3413 | 04/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1936 | 08/1936 |
Bulldog | 3704 | 3414 | 05/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1938 | 10/1938 |
Bulldog | 3705 | 3415 | 05/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 |
Bulldog | 3706 | 3416 | 06/1906 | tn W |
Barnstaple Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 05/1936 |
15/05/1936 |
Bulldog | 3707 | 3417 | 06/1906 | Tys WLN W |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) Wellington Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 04/1948 |
24/04/1948 |
Bulldog | 3708 | 3418 | 06/1906 | RDG SHL W |
Reading (W.R.) Southall Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 21/02/1948 08/1949 |
15/08/1949 |
Bulldog | 3709 | 3419 | 06/1906 | NA DID W |
Newton Abbot Didcot Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 08/1949 |
18/08/1949 |
Bulldog | 3710 | 3420 | 06/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1937 | 09/1937 |
Bulldog | 3711 | 3421 | 06/1906 | SDN SDN W |
Swindon Swindon Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 04/1948 |
19/04/1948 |
Bulldog | 3712 | 3422 | 06/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 |
Bulldog | 3713 | 3423 | 06/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1939 | 01/1939 |
Bulldog | 3714 | 3424 | 07/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 |
Bulldog | 3715 | 3425 | 06/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1938 | 02/1938 |
Bulldog | 3716 | 3426 | 07/1906 | Tys RDG W |
Stratford-on-Avon (GWR) Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
16/11/1935 15/06/1947 12/1949 |
14/12/1949 |
Bulldog | 3717 | 3427 | 07/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1938 | 04/1938 |
Bulldog | 3718 | 3428 | 07/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1936 | 10/1936 |
Bulldog | 3719 | 3429 | 07/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1939 | 09/1939 |
Bulldog | 3720 | 3430 | 08/1906 | NA W |
Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1948 |
02/12/1948 |
Bulldog | 3721 | 3431 | 08/1906 | LA W |
Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1948 |
08/12/1948 |
Bulldog | 3722 | 3432 | 08/1906 | WEY HFD WOS W |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Hereford Worcester Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 05/11/1949 12/1949 |
06/12/1949 |
Bulldog | 3723 | 3433 | 08/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1939 | 04/1939 |
Bulldog | 3724 | 3434 | 08/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1937 | 07/1937 |
Bulldog | 3725 | 3435 | 08/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1945 | 03/11/1945 |
Bulldog | 3726 | 3436 | 08/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1938 | 12/1938 |
Bulldog | 3727 | 3437 | 09/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1939 | 03/1939 |
Bulldog | 3728 | 3438 | 09/1906 | WES W |
Westbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/1949 |
26/10/1949 |
Bulldog | 3729 | 3439 | 09/1906 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1936 | 07/1936 |
Bulldog | 3730 | 3440 | 09/1906 | GLO W |
Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1948 |
21/06/1948 |