GWR Dean "3300" Class 4-4-0
GWR (Orig) | GWR (1912) | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3353 | 3341 | 05/1900 | 22/11/1949 | 49.5 | |||||||
3354 | 3342 | 08/1900 | 10/1938 | 38.17 | |||||||
3355 | 3343 | 06/1900 | 28/03/1934 | 33.75 | |||||||
3356 | 3344 | 06/1900 | 13/01/1934 | 33.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/03/1934 | 33.76 | |||
3357 | 3345 | 06/1900 | 01/1936 | 35.58 | |||||||
3358 | 3346 | 10/1900 | 02/01/1934 | 33.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/02/1934 | 33.35 | |||
3359 | 3347 | 10/1900 | 08/1936 | 35.83 | |||||||
3360 | 3348 | 10/1900 | 16/11/1934 | 34.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/01/1935 | 34.27 | |||
3361 | 3349 | 10/1900 | 16/11/1934 | 34.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/01/1935 | 34.27 | |||
3362 | 3350 | 11/1900 | 07/1935 | 34.67 | |||||||
3363 | 3351 | 11/1900 | 03/1931 | 30.33 | |||||||
3364 | 3352 | 11/1900 | 04/11/1933 | 33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 16/12/1933 | 33.11 | |||
3365 | 3353 | 11/1900 | 07/12/1946 | 46.08 | |||||||
3366 | 3354 | 11/1900 | 16/11/1934 | 34 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/01/1935 | 34.18 | |||
3367 | 3355 | 11/1900 | 13/01/1934 | 33.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/03/1934 | 33.34 | |||
3368 | 3356 | 11/1900 | 01/1936 | 35.17 | |||||||
3369 | 3357 | 11/1900 | 30/11/1934 | 34 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 34.10 | |||
3370 | 3358 | 12/1900 | 30/11/1945 | 44.92 | |||||||
3371 | 3359 | 12/1900 | 09/1936 | 35.75 | |||||||
3372 | 3360 | 12/1900 | 30/11/1934 | 33.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/02/1935 | 34.18 | |||
3413 | 3361 | 12/1902 | 17/09/1947 | 44.75 | |||||||
3414 | 3362 | 12/1902 | 04/1937 | 34.33 | |||||||
3415 | 3363 | 01/1903 | 21/10/1949 | 46.75 | |||||||
3416 | 3364 | 02/1903 | 21/06/1949 | 46.33 | |||||||
3417 | 3365 | 02/1903 | 01/1930 | 26.92 | |||||||
3418 | 3366 | 02/1903 | 24/04/1948 | 45.17 | |||||||
3419 | 3367 | 02/1903 | 09/1935 | 32.58 | |||||||
3420 | 3368 | 02/1903 | 03/1935 | 32.08 | |||||||
3421 | 3389 | 02/1903 | 07/1936 | 33.42 | |||||||
3422 | 3370 | 03/1903 | 02/1939 | 35.92 | |||||||
3423 | 3371 | 03/1903 | 08/11/1944 | 41.67 | |||||||
3424 | 3372 | 03/1903 | 10/1936 | 33.58 | |||||||
3425 | 3373 | 05/1903 | 02/1939 | 35.75 | |||||||
3426 | 3374 | 05/1903 | 06/1937 | 34.08 | |||||||
3427 | 3375 | 05/1903 | 11/09/1947 | 44.33 | |||||||
3428 | 3376 | 05/1903 | 27/09/1948 | 45.33 | |||||||
3429 | 3377 | 05/1903 | 21/03/1951 | 47.83 | |||||||
3430 | 3378 | 05/1903 | 30/11/1945 | 42.5 | |||||||
3431 | 3379 | 05/1903 | 19/06/1948 | 45.08 | |||||||
3432 | 3380 | 05/1903 | 03/1938 | 34.83 | |||||||
3443 | 3381 | 09/1903 | 11/1935 | 32.17 | |||||||
3444 | 3382 | 09/1903 | 25/11/1949 | 46.17 | |||||||
3445 | 3383 | 09/1903 | 13/12/1949 | 46.25 | |||||||
3446 | 3384 | 09/1903 | 05/1936 | 32.67 | |||||||
3447 | 3385 | 09/1903 | 30/11/1934 | 31.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/01/1935 | 31.35 | |||
3448 | 3386 | 09/1903 | 22/11/1949 | 46.17 | |||||||
3449 | 3387 | 10/1903 | 06/12/1934 | 31.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 09/02/1935 | 31.34 | |||
3450 | 3388 | 10/1903 | 10/1935 | 32 | |||||||
3451 | 3389 | 10/1903 | 03/11/1945 | 42.08 | |||||||
3452 | 3390 | 10/1903 | 03/1939 | 35.42 | |||||||
3453 | 3391 | 01/1904 | 14/05/1948 | 44.33 | |||||||
3454 | 3392 | 01/1904 | 01/1937 | 33 | |||||||
3455 | 3393 | 01/1904 | 28/11/1949 | 45.83 | |||||||
3456 | 3394 | 01/1904 | 01/11/1934 | 30.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 30.94 | |||
3457 | 3395 | 01/1904 | 20/08/1948 | 44.58 | |||||||
3458 | 3396 | 01/1904 | 01/03/1948 | 44.17 | |||||||
3459 | 3397 | 02/1904 | 17/11/1934 | 30.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 12/01/1935 | 30.93 | |||
3460 | 3398 | 02/1904 | 09/1935 | 31.58 | |||||||
3461 | 3399 | 02/1904 | 08/10/1947 | 43.67 | |||||||
3462 | 3400 | 02/1904 | 10/05/1949 | 45.25 | |||||||
3463 | 3401 | 03/1904 | 29/11/1949 | 45.67 | |||||||
3464 | 3402 | 03/1904 | 03/1937 | 33 | |||||||
3465 | 3403 | 03/1904 | 01/1937 | 32.83 | |||||||
3466 | 3404 | 03/1904 | 09/1937 | 33.5 | |||||||
3467 | 3405 | 03/1904 | 04/1937 | 33.08 | |||||||
3468 | 3406 | 03/1904 | 31/01/1951 | 46.83 | |||||||
3469 | 3407 | 04/1904 | 08/12/1949 | 45.67 | |||||||
3470 | 3408 | 04/1904 | 10/04/1948 | 44 | |||||||
3471 | 3409 | 04/1904 | 01/1939 | 34.75 | |||||||
3472 | 3410 | 04/1904 | 11/1936 | 32.58 | |||||||
3701 | 3411 | 04/1906 | 10/1938 | 32.5 | |||||||
3702 | 3412 | 04/1906 | 13/03/1936 | 29.92 | |||||||
3703 | 3413 | 04/1906 | 08/1936 | 30.33 | |||||||
3704 | 3414 | 05/1906 | 10/1938 | 32.42 | |||||||
3705 | 3415 | 05/1906 | 02/1937 | 30.75 | |||||||
3706 | 3416 | 06/1906 | 15/05/1936 | 29.92 | |||||||
3707 | 3417 | 06/1906 | 24/04/1948 | 41.83 | |||||||
3708 | 3418 | 06/1906 | 15/08/1949 | 43.17 | |||||||
3709 | 3419 | 06/1906 | 18/08/1949 | 43.17 | |||||||
3710 | 3420 | 06/1906 | 09/1937 | 31.25 | |||||||
3711 | 3421 | 06/1906 | 19/04/1948 | 41.83 | |||||||
3712 | 3422 | 06/1906 | 03/1936 | 29.75 | |||||||
3713 | 3423 | 06/1906 | 01/1939 | 32.58 | |||||||
3714 | 3424 | 07/1906 | 05/1936 | 29.83 | |||||||
3715 | 3425 | 06/1906 | 02/1938 | 31.67 | |||||||
3716 | 3426 | 07/1906 | 14/12/1949 | 43.42 | |||||||
3717 | 3427 | 07/1906 | 04/1938 | 31.75 | |||||||
3718 | 3428 | 07/1906 | 10/1936 | 30.25 | |||||||
3719 | 3429 | 07/1906 | 09/1939 | 33.17 | |||||||
3720 | 3430 | 08/1906 | 02/12/1948 | 42.33 | |||||||
3721 | 3431 | 08/1906 | 08/12/1948 | 42.33 | |||||||
3722 | 3432 | 08/1906 | 06/12/1949 | 43.33 | |||||||
3723 | 3433 | 08/1906 | 04/1939 | 32.67 | |||||||
3724 | 3434 | 08/1906 | 07/1937 | 30.92 | |||||||
3725 | 3435 | 08/1906 | 03/11/1945 | 39.25 | |||||||
3726 | 3436 | 08/1906 | 12/1938 | 32.33 | |||||||
3727 | 3437 | 09/1906 | 03/1939 | 32.5 | |||||||
3728 | 3438 | 09/1906 | 26/10/1949 | 43.08 | |||||||
3729 | 3439 | 09/1906 | 07/1936 | 29.83 | |||||||
3730 | 3440 | 09/1906 | 21/06/1948 | 41.75 |