GWR Dean "Earl" Class 4-4-0
Date | Event | Number | From | Depot From | To | Depot To | Usage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
22/04/1936 | To Service | 3201 | NEW | OSY | Oswestry | ||
30/05/1936 | To Service | 3200 | NEW | OSY | Oswestry | ||
22/02/1947 | Reallocation | 9008 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | |||
14/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9008 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | TYS | Tyseley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9000 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9001 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9002 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9003 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9004 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9005 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9006 | DID | Didcot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9007 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9008 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS | Tyseley | |
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9009 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9010 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9011 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9012 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9013 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9014 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9015 | DID | Didcot | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9016 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9017 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9018 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9019 | TYS | Tyseley | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9020 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9021 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9022 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9023 | SDN | Swindon | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9024 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9025 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9026 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9027 | MCH | Machynlleth | |||
15/06/1947 | Reallocation | 9028 | OSY | Oswestry | |||
30/04/1948 | Reallocation | 9019 | TYS | Tyseley | TYS | Tyseley | |
03/07/1948 | Condemned | 9007 | 98W | COND | |||
23/08/1948 | Condemned | 9006 | 98W | COND | |||
01/11/1948 | Condemned | 9019 | 98W | COND | |||
13/08/1949 | Reallocation | 9003 | OSY | Oswestry | MCH | Machynlleth | |
16/06/1950 | Reallocation | 9024 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
15/07/1950 | Reallocation | 9024 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
25/07/1951 | Reallocation | 9016 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
25/07/1951 | Reallocation | 9020 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
25/07/1951 | Reallocation | 9026 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
26/07/1951 | Reallocation | 9028 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9016 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
11/08/1951 | Reallocation | 9028 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
06/11/1951 | Reallocation | 9028 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
05/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9020 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
05/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9028 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
06/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9008 | 98S | 89A | Oswestry | ||
06/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9010 | 98S | 89A | Oswestry | ||
06/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9016 | 98S | 89A | Oswestry | ||
06/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9026 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9008 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9010 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9016 | 89A | Oswestry | 89A | Oswestry | |
14/06/1952 | Reallocation | 9026 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89C | Machynlleth | |
28/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9028 | 98S | 81F | Oxford | ||
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9018 | SDN | Swindon | 81F | Oxford | |
29/11/1952 | Reallocation | 9028 | 81F | Oxford | 81F | Oxford | |
13/01/1953 | Reallocation | 9008 | 98S | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
13/01/1953 | Reallocation | 9010 | 98S | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
13/01/1953 | Reallocation | 9016 | 98S | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
13/01/1953 | Reallocation | 9020 | 98S | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
13/01/1953 | Reallocation | 9026 | 98S | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 9018 | 81F | Oxford | 89C | Machynlleth | |
11/07/1953 | Reallocation | 9028 | 81F | Oxford | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
03/10/1953 | Reallocation | 9015 | DID | Didcot | 81F | Oxford | |
23/10/1953 | Reallocation | 9008 | 98S | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
23/10/1953 | Reallocation | 9010 | 98S | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
05/04/1954 | Condemned | 9001 | 98W | COND | |||
27/05/1954 | Condemned | 9002 | 98W | COND | |||
19/06/1954 | Reallocation | 9010 | 87G | Carmarthen | 89A | Oswestry | |
05/07/1954 | Reallocation | 9016 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
05/07/1954 | Reallocation | 9020 | 98S | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
05/07/1954 | Reallocation | 9026 | 98S | 89A | Oswestry | ||
17/07/1954 | Reallocation | 9008 | 87G | Carmarthen | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9022 | OSY | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
09/10/1954 | Reallocation | 9027 | MCH | Machynlleth | 89A | Oswestry | |
03/1955 | Condemned | 9000 | MCH | Machynlleth | COND | ||
26/03/1955 | Reallocation | 9009 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
27/06/1955 | Reallocation | 9016 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
27/06/1955 | Reallocation | 9020 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
24/07/1955 | Reallocation | 9026 | 98S | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
05/10/1955 | Condemned | 9003 | 98W | COND | |||
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 9005 | MCH | Machynlleth | 89A | Oswestry | |
14/07/1956 | Reallocation | 9015 | 81F | Oxford | 89C | Machynlleth | |
11/08/1956 | Reallocation | 9018 | 89C | Machynlleth | 89A | Oswestry | |
08/09/1956 | Reallocation | 9018 | 89A | Oswestry | 89C | Machynlleth | |
02/07/1957 | Condemned | 9008 | 98W | COND | |||
02/07/1957 | Condemned | 9009 | 98W | COND | |||
08/07/1957 | Condemned | 9010 | 98W | COND | |||
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 9004 | MCH | Machynlleth | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
13/07/1957 | Reallocation | 9014 | MCH | Machynlleth | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
20/07/1957 | Condemned | 9011 | 98W | COND | |||
20/07/1957 | Condemned | 9012 | 98W | COND | |||
24/07/1957 | Condemned | 9023 | 98W | COND | |||
25/07/1957 | Condemned | 9016 | 98W | COND | |||
29/07/1957 | Condemned | 9020 | 98W | COND | |||
03/08/1957 | Condemned | 9022 | 98W | COND | |||
07/08/1957 | Condemned | 9026 | 98W | COND | |||
08/08/1957 | Condemned | 9025 | 98W | COND | |||
14/08/1957 | Condemned | 9027 | 98W | COND | |||
30/09/1957 | Condemned | 9024 | 98W | COND | |||
30/09/1957 | Condemned | 9028 | 98W | COND | |||
14/06/1958 | Reallocation | 9018 | 89C | Machynlleth | 84J | Croes Newydd | |
01/12/1958 | Condemned | 9013 | 98W | COND | |||
01/12/1958 | Condemned | 9021 | 98W | COND | |||
11/07/1959 | Reallocation | 9018 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 89A | Oswestry | |
28/07/1959 | Condemned | 9005 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1960 | Condemned | 9004 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1960 | Condemned | 9015 | 98W | COND | |||
17/06/1960 | Condemned | 9018 | 98W | COND | |||
25/10/1960 | Condemned | 9014 | 98W | COND | |||
25/10/1960 | Condemned | 9017 | 98W | COND |