GWR Dean "Bird" Class 4-4-0
Class | GWR (Orig) | GWR (1912) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bird | 3731 | 3441 | 05/1909 | TN LA WOS W |
Taunton Laira Worcester Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 15/06/1947 29/01/1949 02/1949 |
21/02/1949 |
Bird | 3732 | 3442 | 05/1909 | SALOP W |
Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 07/1948 |
10/07/1948 |
Bird | 3733 | 3443 | 05/1909 | TN TN W |
Taunton Taunton Withdrawn |
07/03/1936 15/06/1947 05/1949 |
11/05/1949 |
Bird | 3734 | 3444 | 05/1909 | TN W |
Taunton Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1951 |
05/06/1951 |
Bird | 3735 | 3445 | 05/1909 | WLN LA GLO W |
Wellington Laira Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 10/1948 |
04/10/1948 |
Bird | 3736 | 3446 | 11/1909 | WES LA WOS W |
Westbury Laira Worcester Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 15/06/1947 04/09/1948 12/1948 |
20/12/1948 |
Bird | 3737 | 3447 | 12/1909 | NEY 85A W |
Neyland Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 15/07/1950 04/1951 |
22/04/1951 |
Bird | 3738 | 3448 | 12/1909 | DID W |
Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/1949 |
03/01/1949 |
Bird | 3739 | 3449 | 12/1909 | CHEL W |
Cheltenham Malvern Road Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 06/1951 |
05/06/1951 |
Bird | 3740 | 3450 | 12/1909 | STB W |
Stourbridge Junction Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 12/1949 |
21/12/1949 |
Bird | 3741 | 3451 | 01/1910 | EXE W |
Exeter Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1951 |
25/04/1951 |
Bird | 3742 | 3452 | 01/1910 | SDN W |
Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/1948 |
10/04/1948 |
Bird | 3743 | 3453 | 01/1910 | PPRD WOS 81D W |
Pontypool Road Worcester Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/02/1949 11/08/1951 11/1951 |
07/11/1951 |
Bird | 3744 | 3454 | 01/1910 | HFD RDG W |
Hereford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/12/1949 11/1951 |
07/11/1951 |
Bird | 3745 | 3455 | 01/1910 | NEA HFD 85A W |
Neath (Court Sart) Hereford Worcester Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 23/04/1949 25/03/1950 06/1950 |
16/06/1950 |