Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 597 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18400 Week
» 71416 Month
» 190943 Year
» 3217796 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GWR Dean "Bird" Class 4-4-0
GWR (Orig) |
GWR (1912) |
Date To Service |
Depot Delivered To |
Date Withdrawn |
Depot Withdrawn From |
Svc Age (Yrs) |
Fate |
Where |
When |
Tot Age (Yrs) |
Name |
3731
|
3441
|
05/1909 |
|
21/02/1949 |
|
39.75 |
|
|
|
|
Blackbird |
3732
|
3442
|
05/1909 |
|
10/07/1948 |
|
39.17 |
|
|
|
|
Bullfinch |
3733
|
3443
|
05/1909 |
|
11/05/1949 |
|
40 |
|
|
|
|
Chaffinch |
3734
|
3444
|
05/1909 |
|
05/06/1951 |
|
42.08 |
|
|
|
|
Cormorant |
3735
|
3445
|
05/1909 |
|
04/10/1948 |
|
39.42 |
|
|
|
|
Flamingo |
3736
|
3446
|
11/1909 |
|
20/12/1948 |
|
39.08 |
|
|
|
|
Goldfinch |
3737
|
3447
|
12/1909 |
|
22/04/1951 |
|
41.33 |
|
|
|
|
Jackdaw |
3738
|
3448
|
12/1909 |
|
03/01/1949 |
|
39.08 |
|
|
|
|
Kingfisher |
3739
|
3449
|
12/1909 |
|
05/06/1951 |
|
41.5 |
|
|
|
|
Nightingale |
3740
|
3450
|
12/1909 |
|
21/12/1949 |
|
40 |
|
|
|
|
Peacock |
3741
|
3451
|
01/1910 |
|
25/04/1951 |
|
41.25 |
|
|
|
|
Pelican |
3742
|
3452
|
01/1910 |
|
10/04/1948 |
|
38.25 |
|
|
|
|
Penguin |
3743
|
3453
|
01/1910 |
|
07/11/1951 |
|
41.83 |
|
|
|
|
Seagull |
3744
|
3454
|
01/1910 |
|
07/11/1951 |
|
41.83 |
|
|
|
|
Skylark |
3745
|
3455
|
01/1910 |
|
16/06/1950 |
|
40.42 |
|
|
|
|
Starling |