Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 301 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5270 Week
» 17783 Month
» 105975 Year
» 990356 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Dean "Atbara" Class 4-4-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
Atbara 3373 04/1900 ATBARA 04/1900   09/1929
Atbara 3373 04/1900 MAINE 29/10/1900 Temporarily named for City Imperial Volunteers (C.I.V.) special on 29/10/1900. 05/11/1900 09/1929
Atbara 3373 04/1900 ROYAL SOVEREIGN 02/02/1901 Temporarily named for Queen Victoria's funeral train, 2nd February, 1901. 09/02/1901 09/1929
Atbara 3374 04/1900 BADEN POWELL 04/1900   12/1928
Atbara 3374 04/1900 PRETORIA 29/10/1900 Temprorail named for City Ipmerial Volunteers (C.I.V.) special on 29/10/1900 05/11/1900 12/1928
Atbara 3374 04/1900 BRITANNIA 07/03/1902 Temporarily named for two Royal Trains, 7/3/1902 and 10/3/1902. 14/03/1902 12/1928
Atbara 3374 04/1900 KITCHENER 12/07/1902 Temporarily named for special train, 12/7/1902 19/07/1902 12/1928
Atbara 3375 04/1900 CONQUEROR 04/1900 Believed named. 05/1900 10/1928
Atbara 3375 04/1900 EDGCUMBE 05/1900   1903 10/1928
Atbara 3375 04/1900 COLONEL EDGCUMBE 1903   10/1928
Atbara 3376 04/1900 HERSCHEL 04/1900 Name removed, possibly because it sounded German. 1914 11/1928
Atbara 3377 05/1900 KITCHENER 05/1900   04/1930
Atbara 3378 05/1900 KHARTOUM 05/1900   04/1927
Atbara 3379 05/1900 KIMBERLEY 05/1900   10/1927
Atbara 3380 05/1900 LADYSMITH 05/1900   09/1929
Atbara 3381 05/1900 MAINE 05/1900   07/1927
Atbara 3382 05/1900 MAFEKING 05/1900   09/1911
Atbara 3383 07/1900 KEKEWICH 07/1900   11/1928
Atbara 3384 07/1900 OMDURMAN 07/1900   04/1930
Atbara 3385 07/1900 POWERFUL 07/1900   04/1929
Atbara 3386 08/1900 PEMBROKE 08/1900 Name removed to avoid confusion with possible destination. 11/1930 04/1931
Atbara 3387 08/1900 ROBERTS 08/1900   07/1927
Atbara 3388 08/1900 SIR REDVERS 08/1900   10/1927
Atbara 3389 08/1900 SIR DANIEL 08/1900   11/1900 11/1927
Atbara 3389 08/1900 PRETORIA 11/1900   11/1927
Atbara 3390 08/1900 TERRIBLE 08/1900   10/1927
Atbara 3391 09/1900 WOLSELEY 09/1900   10/1928
Atbara 3392 09/1900 WHITE 09/1900   11/1929
Atbara 3392 09/1900 POWERFUL 29/10/1900 Temporarily named for City Imperial Volunteers (C.I.V.) special on 29/10/1900 05/11/1900 11/1929
Atbara 3393 06/1901 AUCKLAND 06/1901   09/1928
Atbara 3394 06/1901 ADELAIDE 06/1901 Removed on advent of new engine Queen Adelaide 11/1910 04/1929
Atbara 3395 07/1901 ADEN 07/1901   02/1930
Atbara 3396 07/1901 BRISBANE 07/1901   10/1928
Atbara 3397 08/1901 CAPE TOWN 08/1901   04/1929
Atbara 3398 08/1901 COLOMBO 08/1901   11/1927
Atbara 3399 08/1901 DUNEDIN 08/1901   12/1930
Atbara 3400 08/1901 DURBAN 08/1901   11/1929
Atbara 3401 08/1901 GIBRALTAR 08/1901   08/1928
Atbara 3402 08/1901 HALIFAX 08/1901   04/1929
Atbara 3403 09/1901 HOBART 09/1901   08/1929
Atbara 3404 09/1901 LYTTLETON 09/1901   06/1920 09/1928
Atbara 3405 09/1901 MAURITIUS 09/1901   09/1928
Atbara 3406 09/1901 MELBOURNE 09/1901   06/1929
Atbara 3407 09/1901 MALTA 09/1901   04/1929
Atbara 3408 10/1901 OPHIR 10/1901   09/1907 10/1929
Atbara 3409 10/1901 QUEBEC 10/1901   09/1929
Atbara 3410 10/1901 SYDNEY 10/1901   10/1927
Atbara 3411 10/1901 ST. JOHNS 10/1901   07/1927
Atbara 3412 10/1901 SINGAPORE 10/1901   05/1931