Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 577 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 577 Week
» 18898 Month
» 107090 Year
» 991471 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "Saint" Class 4-6-0


Class GWR (Original) GWR GWR (Hall Rbld) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
Saint 100 2900   02/1902 W Withdrawn 17/06/1932 17/06/1932
Saint   2901   05/1906 W Withdrawn 12/04/1933 12/04/1933
Saint   2902   05/1906 W Withdrawn 08/1949 08/1949
Saint   2903   05/1906 W Withdrawn 11/1949 30/11/1949
Saint   2904   05/1906 W Withdrawn 15/10/1932 15/10/1932
Saint   2905   05/1906 W Withdrawn 04/1948 30/04/1948
Saint   2906   05/1906 W Withdrawn 08/1952 08/1952
Saint   2907   05/1906 W Withdrawn 18/07/1933 18/07/1933
Saint   2908   05/1906 W Withdrawn 12/1950 12/1950
Saint   2909   05/1906 W Withdrawn 07/11/1931 07/11/1931
Saint   2910   05/1906 W Withdrawn 23/10/1931 23/10/1931
Saint   2911   28/07/1907 BRD
W
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
28/07/1907
03/1935
03/1935
Saint   2912   31/07/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
31/07/1907
02/1951
02/1951
Saint   2913   31/07/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
31/07/1907
05/1948
31/05/1948
Saint   2914   31/07/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
31/07/1907
01/1946
01/1946
Saint   2915   05/08/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
05/08/1907
10/1950
10/1950
Saint   2916   19/08/1907 BRD
W
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
19/08/1907
07/1948
31/07/1948
Saint   2917   13/08/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
13/08/1907
10/1934
10/1934
Saint   2918   19/08/1907 CDF
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
19/08/1907
02/1935
02/1935
Saint   2919   27/08/1907 CDF
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
27/08/1907
04/02/1932
04/02/1932
Saint   2920   03/09/1907 CDF
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
03/09/1907
10/1953
10/1953
Saint   2921   06/09/1907 BRD
W
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
06/09/1907
12/1945
12/1945
Saint   2922   08/09/1907 LA
W
Laira
Withdrawn
08/09/1907
12/1944
12/1944
Saint   2923   13/09/1907 LA
W
Laira
Withdrawn
13/09/1907
10/1934
10/1934
Saint   2924   16/09/1907 PDN
SRD
HFD
W
Old Oak Common
Stafford Road
Hereford
Withdrawn
16/09/1907
20/04/1946
18/05/1946
03/1950
03/1950
Saint   2925 4900 17/09/1907 NA
85A
83D
81A
W
Newton Abbot
Worcester
Laira
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
17/09/1907
31/08/1952
16/06/1956
06/10/1956
04/1959
04/1959
Saint   2926   26/09/1907 PDN
W
Old Oak Common
Withdrawn
26/09/1907
09/1951
09/1951
Saint   2927   01/10/1907 CDF
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
01/10/1907
12/1951
12/1951
Saint   2928   07/10/1907 EXE
W
Exeter
Withdrawn
07/10/1907
08/1948
31/08/1948
Saint   2929   10/10/1907 CDF
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
10/10/1907
12/1949
31/12/1949
Saint   2930   09/1907 W Withdrawn 10/1949 10/1949
Saint   2931   10/1911 W Withdrawn 02/1951 02/1951
Saint   2932   10/1911 84E
W
Tyseley
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
06/1951
06/1951
Saint   2933   11/1911 W Withdrawn 01/1953 01/1953
Saint   2934   11/1911 W Withdrawn 06/1952 06/1952
Saint   2935   11/1911 W Withdrawn 12/1948 12/1948
Saint   2936   11/1911 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
Saint   2937   12/1911 W Withdrawn 06/1953 06/1953
Saint   2938   12/1911 GLO
85C
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Hereford
Withdrawn
29/12/1945
31/03/1952
08/1952
08/1952
Saint   2939   12/1911 W Withdrawn 12/1950 12/1950
Saint   2940   12/1911 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
Saint   2941   05/1912 W Withdrawn 12/1949 31/12/1949
Saint   2942   05/1912 W Withdrawn 12/1949 31/12/1949
Saint   2943   05/1912 W Withdrawn 01/1951 01/1951
Saint   2944   05/1912 W Withdrawn 11/1951 11/1951
Saint   2945   06/1912 86C
W
Cardiff Canton
Withdrawn
01/11/1952
06/1953
06/1953
Saint   2946   06/1912 W Withdrawn 11/1949 30/11/1949
Saint   2947   06/1912 W Withdrawn 04/1951 04/1951
Saint   2948   06/1912 82A
W
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
31/08/1950
11/1951
11/1951
Saint   2949   05/1912 W Withdrawn 01/1952 01/1952
Saint   2950   05/1912 W Withdrawn 09/1952 09/1952
Saint   2951   03/1913 GLO
W
Gloucester Horton Road
Withdrawn
30/10/1948
06/1952
06/1952
Saint   2952   03/1913 W Withdrawn 09/1951 09/1951
Saint   2953   03/1913 W Withdrawn 02/1952 02/1952
Saint   2954   03/1913 W Withdrawn 07/1952 07/1952
Saint   2955   04/1913 WEY
W
Weymouth Radipole (GWR)
Withdrawn
23/03/1946
03/1950
03/1950
Saint 171 2971   12/1903 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
Scott 172 2972   02/1905 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
Saint 173 2973   03/1905 W Withdrawn 08/07/1933 08/07/1933
Saint 174 2974   03/1905 W Withdrawn 11/08/1933 11/08/1933
Saint 175 2975   03/1905 W Withdrawn 11/1944 11/1944
Saint 176 2976   04/1905 W Withdrawn 02/01/1934 02/01/1934
Saint 177 2977   04/1905 W Withdrawn 02/1935 02/1935
Saint 178 2978   04/1905 W Withdrawn 08/1946 08/1946
Saint 179 2979   04/1905 W Withdrawn 01/1951 01/1951
Saint 180 2980   05/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1948 31/05/1948
Saint 181 2981   06/1905 BAN
BAN
W
Banbury
Banbury
Withdrawn
20/04/1946
18/05/1946
03/1951
03/1951
Scott 182 2982   06/1905 W Withdrawn 06/1934 06/1934
Scott 183 2983   07/1905 W Withdrawn 03/1946 03/1946
Scott 184 2984   07/1905 W Withdrawn 02/05/1933 02/05/1933
Scott 185 2985   07/1905 W Withdrawn 08/08/1931 08/08/1931
Scott 186 2986   07/1905 W Withdrawn 07/11/1932 07/11/1932
Saint 187 2987   08/1905 W Withdrawn 10/1949 10/1949
Saint 188 2988   08/1905 W Withdrawn 05/1948 31/05/1948
Saint 189 2989   09/1905 W Withdrawn 09/1948 30/09/1948
Scott 190 2990   09/1905 W Withdrawn 01/1939 01/1939
Saint 98 2998   03/1903 W Withdrawn 02/06/1933 02/06/1933