Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 903 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1803 Week
» 13624 Month
» 182396 Year
» 1066777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "Saint" Class 4-6-0


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
28/07/1907 To Service 2911   NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road  
31/07/1907 To Service 2912   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
31/07/1907 To Service 2913   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
31/07/1907 To Service 2914   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
05/08/1907 To Service 2915   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
13/08/1907 To Service 2917   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
19/08/1907 To Service 2916   NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road  
19/08/1907 To Service 2918   NEW CDF Cardiff Canton  
27/08/1907 To Service 2919   NEW CDF Cardiff Canton  
03/09/1907 To Service 2920   NEW CDF Cardiff Canton  
06/09/1907 To Service 2921   NEW BRD Bristol Bath Road  
08/09/1907 To Service 2922   NEW LA Laira  
13/09/1907 To Service 2923   NEW LA Laira  
16/09/1907 To Service 2924   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
17/09/1907 To Service 2925   NEW NA Newton Abbot  
26/09/1907 To Service 2926   NEW PDN Old Oak Common  
01/10/1907 To Service 2927   NEW CDF Cardiff Canton  
07/10/1907 To Service 2928   NEW EXE Exeter  
10/10/1907 To Service 2929   NEW CDF Cardiff Canton  
08/08/1931 Condemned 2985       COND  
23/10/1931 Condemned 2910       COND  
07/11/1931 Condemned 2909       COND  
04/02/1932 Condemned 2919 CDF Cardiff Canton   COND  
17/06/1932 Condemned 2900       COND  
15/10/1932 Condemned 2904       COND  
07/11/1932 Condemned 2986       COND  
12/04/1933 Condemned 2901       COND  
02/05/1933 Condemned 2984       COND  
02/06/1933 Condemned 2998       COND  
08/07/1933 Condemned 2973       COND  
18/07/1933 Condemned 2907       COND  
11/08/1933 Condemned 2974       COND  
02/01/1934 Condemned 2976       COND  
06/1934 Condemned 2982       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 2917 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
10/1934 Condemned 2923 LA Laira   COND  
02/1935 Condemned 2918 CDF Cardiff Canton   COND  
02/1935 Condemned 2977       COND  
03/1935 Condemned 2911 BRD Bristol Bath Road   COND  
03/1935 Condemned 2972       COND  
01/1939 Condemned 2990       COND  
11/1944 Condemned 2975       COND  
12/1944 Condemned 2922 LA Laira   COND  
12/1945 Condemned 2921 BRD Bristol Bath Road   COND  
29/12/1945 Reallocation 2938     GLO Gloucester Horton Road  
01/1946 Condemned 2914 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
01/1946 Condemned 2971       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 2983       COND  
23/03/1946 Reallocation 2955     WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR)  
20/04/1946 Reallocation 2924 PDN Old Oak Common SRD Stafford Road  
20/04/1946 Reallocation 2981     BAN Banbury  
20/04/1946 Reallocation 181     BAN Banbury  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 2924 SRD Stafford Road HFD Hereford  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 2981 BAN Banbury BAN Banbury  
18/05/1946 Reallocation 181 BAN Banbury BAN Banbury  
08/1946 Condemned 2978       COND  
30/04/1948 Condemned 2905 98W     COND  
31/05/1948 Condemned 2913 98W     COND  
31/05/1948 Condemned 2980 98W     COND  
31/05/1948 Condemned 180 98W     COND  
31/05/1948 Condemned 2988 98W     COND  
31/05/1948 Condemned 188 98W     COND  
31/07/1948 Condemned 2916 98W     COND  
31/08/1948 Condemned 2928 98W     COND  
30/09/1948 Condemned 2989 98W     COND  
30/09/1948 Condemned 189 98W     COND  
30/10/1948 Reallocation 2951     GLO Gloucester Horton Road  
12/1948 Condemned 2935       COND  
08/1949 Condemned 2902       COND  
10/1949 Condemned 2930       COND  
10/1949 Condemned 2987       COND  
10/1949 Condemned 187       COND  
30/11/1949 Condemned 2903 98W     COND  
30/11/1949 Condemned 2946 98W     COND  
31/12/1949 Condemned 2929 98W     COND  
31/12/1949 Condemned 2941 98W     COND  
31/12/1949 Condemned 2942 98W     COND  
03/1950 Condemned 2924 HFD Hereford   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 2955 WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR)   COND  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 2932     84E Tyseley  
31/08/1950 Reallocation 2948     82A Bristol Bath Road  
10/1950 Condemned 2915 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
12/1950 Condemned 2908       COND  
12/1950 Condemned 2939       COND  
01/1951 Condemned 2943       COND  
01/1951 Condemned 2979       COND  
01/1951 Condemned 179       COND  
02/1951 Condemned 2912 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
02/1951 Condemned 2931       COND  
03/1951 Condemned 2981 BAN Banbury   COND  
03/1951 Condemned 181 BAN Banbury   COND  
04/1951 Condemned 2936       COND  
04/1951 Condemned 2947       COND  
06/1951 Condemned 2932 84E Tyseley   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 2926 PDN Old Oak Common   COND  
09/1951 Condemned 2952       COND  
11/1951 Condemned 2944       COND  
11/1951 Condemned 2948 82A Bristol Bath Road   COND  
12/1951 Condemned 2927 CDF Cardiff Canton   COND  
01/1952 Condemned 2940       COND  
01/1952 Condemned 2949       COND  
02/1952 Condemned 2953       COND  
31/03/1952 Reallocation 2938 GLO Gloucester Horton Road 85C Hereford  
06/1952 Condemned 2934       COND  
06/1952 Condemned 2951 GLO Gloucester Horton Road   COND  
07/1952 Condemned 2954       COND  
08/1952 Condemned 2906       COND  
08/1952 Condemned 2938 85C Hereford   COND  
09/1952 Condemned 2950       COND  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 2945     86C Cardiff Canton  
01/1953 Condemned 2933       COND  
06/1953 Condemned 2937       COND  
06/1953 Condemned 2945 86C Cardiff Canton   COND  
10/1953 Condemned 2920 CDF Cardiff Canton   COND