Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 836 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 21818 Month
» 163772 Year
» 1048153 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "Saint" Class 4-6-0


GWR (Original) GWR GWR (Hall Rbld) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
100 2900 02/1902 17/06/1932 30.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 11/03/1933 31.09
2902 05/1906 08/1949 43.25
2903 05/1906 30/11/1949 Tyseley 43.5
2905 05/1906 30/04/1948 41.92
2906 05/1906 08/1952 Cardiff Canton 46.25
2908 05/1906 12/1950 Swindon 44.58
2912 31/07/1907 Old Oak Common 02/1951 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 43.58
2913 31/07/1907 Old Oak Common 31/05/1948 40.83
2915 05/08/1907 Old Oak Common 10/1950 Chester West 43.17
2916 19/08/1907 Bristol Bath Road 31/07/1948 40.92
2920 03/09/1907 Cardiff Canton 10/1953 Hereford 46.08
2924 16/09/1907 Old Oak Common 03/1950 Hereford 42.5
2926 26/09/1907 Old Oak Common 09/1951 Chester West 44
2927 01/10/1907 Cardiff Canton 12/1951 Swindon 44.17
2928 07/10/1907 Exeter 31/08/1948 40.83
2929 10/10/1907 Cardiff Canton 31/12/1949 Bristol Bath Road 42.17
2930 09/1907 10/1949 42.08
2931 10/1911 02/1951 Bristol Bath Road 39.33
2932 10/1911 06/1951 Tyseley 39.67
2933 11/1911 01/1953 Leamington 41.17
2934 11/1911 06/1952 Swindon 40.58
2935 11/1911 12/1948 37.08
2936 11/1911 04/1951 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 39.42
2937 12/1911 06/1953 Hereford 41.5
2938 12/1911 08/1952 Gloucester Horton Road 40.67
2939 12/1911 12/1950 Bristol Bath Road 39
2940 12/1911 01/1952 Cardiff Canton 40.08
2941 05/1912 31/12/1949 Westbury 37.58
2942 05/1912 31/12/1949 37.58
2943 05/1912 01/1951 Cardiff Canton 38.67
2944 05/1912 11/1951 Hereford 39.5
2945 06/1912 06/1953 Cardiff Canton 41
2946 06/1912 30/11/1949 37.42
2947 06/1912 04/1951 Swindon 38.83
2948 06/1912 11/1951 Bristol Bath Road 39.42
2949 05/1912 01/1952 Swindon 39.67
2950 05/1912 09/1952 Bristol Bath Road 40.33
2951 03/1913 06/1952 Gloucester Horton Road 39.25
2952 03/1913 09/1951 Severn Tunnel Junction 38.5
2953 03/1913 02/1952 Chester West 38.92
2954 03/1913 07/1952 Swindon 39.33
2955 04/1913 03/1950 Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 36.92
179 2979 04/1905 01/1951 Ebbw Junction (Newport) 45.75
180 2980 05/1905 31/05/1948 43
181 2981 06/1905 03/1951 Banbury 45.75
187 2987 08/1905 10/1949 44.17
188 2988 08/1905 31/05/1948 42.75
189 2989 09/1905 30/09/1948 43