Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 76 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 1937 Week
» 22919 Month
» 164873 Year
» 1049254 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "Saint" Class 4-6-0


GWR (Original) GWR GWR (Hall Rbld) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
2901 05/1906 12/04/1933 26.92 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 01/07/1933 27.15
2904 05/1906 15/10/1932 26.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 19/11/1932 26.53
2907 05/1906 18/07/1933 27.17 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/08/1933 27.30
2909 05/1906 07/11/1931 25.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 16/01/1932 25.69
2910 05/1906 23/10/1931 25.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 21/11/1931 25.54
2911 28/07/1907 Bristol Bath Road 03/1935 27.67
2914 31/07/1907 Old Oak Common 01/1946 38.5
2917 13/08/1907 Old Oak Common 10/1934 27.17
2918 19/08/1907 Cardiff Canton 02/1935 27.5
2919 27/08/1907 Cardiff Canton 04/02/1932 24.5 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/12/1932 25.33
2921 06/09/1907 Bristol Bath Road 12/1945 38.25
2922 08/09/1907 Laira 12/1944 37.25
2923 13/09/1907 Laira 10/1934 27.08
2925 4900 17/09/1907 Newton Abbot 04/1959 12/1924
to 4900
51.58
171 2971 12/1903 01/1946 42.08
172 2972 02/1905 03/1935 30.08
173 2973 03/1905 08/07/1933 28.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1933 28.55
174 2974 03/1905 11/08/1933 28.42 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1933 28.55
175 2975 03/1905 11/1944 39.67
176 2976 04/1905 02/01/1934 28.75 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 10/02/1934 28.84
177 2977 04/1905 02/1935 29.83
178 2978 04/1905 08/1946 41.33
182 2982 06/1905 06/1934 29
183 2983 07/1905 03/1946 40.67
184 2984 07/1905 02/05/1933 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/06/1933 27.90
185 2985 07/1905 08/08/1931 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/09/1931 26.22
186 2986 07/1905 07/11/1932 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/12/1932 27.44
190 2990 09/1905 01/1939 33.33
98 2998 03/1903 02/06/1933 30.25 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1933 30.55