Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 62 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 62 Week
» 18383 Month
» 106575 Year
» 990956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Churchward "Saint" Class 4-6-0


GWR (Original) GWR GWR (Hall Rbld) Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
171 2971 12/1903 01/1946 42.08
172 2972 02/1905 03/1935 30.08
182 2982 06/1905 06/1934 29
183 2983 07/1905 03/1946 40.67
184 2984 07/1905 02/05/1933 27.83 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 03/06/1933 27.90
185 2985 07/1905 08/08/1931 26.08 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 26/09/1931 26.22
186 2986 07/1905 07/11/1932 27.33 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 17/12/1932 27.44
190 2990 09/1905 01/1939 33.33