GWR Churchward "4000" Class 4-6-0
GWR (Original) | GWR | GWR (Renum) | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Mileage | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 4000 | 04/1906 | 20/05/1957 | 11/1929 to 4073 |
Landore | 51.08 | 2,110,396 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 13/07/1957 | 51.28 | ||
4001 | 02/1907 | 06/01/1934 | 26.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/02/1934 | 27.01 | ||||||
4002 | 03/1907 | 02/06/1933 | 26.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 26/08/1933 | 26.47 | ||||||
4003 | 02/1907 | 18/07/1951 | Landore | 44.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||||||
4004 | 02/1907 | 24/04/1948 | Oxford | 41.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4005 | 02/1907 | 17/11/1934 | 27.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 27.85 | ||||||
4006 | 04/1907 | 11/1932 | 25.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | ||||||||
4007 | 04/1907 | 03/09/1951 | Worcester | 44.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4008 | 05/1907 | 06/1935 | 28.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | ||||||||
100A1 | A1 | 18/05/1907 | Laira | 06/03/1950 | 09/04/1925 to 4073 |
Old Oak Common | 42.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 05/1950 | 43.02 | ||
4010 | 05/1907 | 01/11/1934 | 27.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 27.61 | ||||||
4011 | 03/1908 | 11/1932 | 24.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | ||||||||
4012 | 03/1908 | 21/10/1949 | Newton Abbot | 41.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4013 | 03/1908 | 03/05/1950 | Chester West | 42.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4014 | 03/1908 | 04/06/1946 | 38.25 | 1,766,634 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 10/08/1946 | 38.43 | |||||
4015 | 03/1908 | 09/02/1951 | Swindon | 42.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4016 | 04/1908 | 24/09/1951 | 31/10/1925 to 4073 |
Swindon | 43.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | ||||||
4017 | 04/1908 | 11/11/1949 | Swindon | 41.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4018 | 04/1908 | 23/04/1951 | Stafford Road | 43 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4019 | 05/1908 | 28/10/1949 | Bristol Bath Road | 41.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4020 | 05/1908 | 21/03/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 42.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4021 | 06/1909 | 10/10/1952 | Oxford | 43.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4022 | 06/1909 | 14/02/1952 | Swindon | 42.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4023 | 06/1909 | 12/07/1952 | Landore | 43.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4024 | 06/1909 | 02/1935 | 25.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | ||||||||
4025 | 07/1909 | 14/08/1950 | Stafford Road | 41.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4026 | 09/1909 | 20/02/1950 | Taunton | 40.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4027 | 09/1909 | 10/10/1934 | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 17/11/1934 | 25.19 | ||||||
4028 | 09/1909 | 09/11/1951 | Westbury | 42.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4029 | 10/1909 | 30/11/1934 | 25.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 15/12/1934 | 25.18 | ||||||
4030 | 10/1909 | 29/05/1950 | Bristol Bath Road | 40.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4031 | 10/1910 | 11/06/1951 | Stafford Road | 40.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4032 | 03/11/1910 | Laira | 24/09/1951 | 16/04/1926 to 4073 |
Swindon | 40.83 | 1,225,908 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/12/1951 | 41.10 | ||
4033 | 11/1910 | 14/06/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 40.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4034 | 11/1910 | 15/09/1952 | Swindon | 41.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4035 | 11/1910 | 22/10/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 40.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4036 | 12/1910 | 11/03/1952 | Swindon | 41.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4037 | 30/12/1910 | Laira | 17/09/1962 | 02/07/1926 to 4073 |
Exeter | 51.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | |||||
4038 | 01/1911 | 28/04/1952 | Westbury | 41.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4039 | 02/1911 | 20/11/1950 | Landore | 39.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4040 | 03/1911 | 05/06/1951 | Shrewsbury | 40.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4041 | 06/1913 | 19/04/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 37.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4042 | 05/1913 | 08/11/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 38.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4043 | 05/1913 | 02/01/1952 | Bristol Bath Road | 38.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4044 | 05/1913 | 17/02/1953 | Shrewsbury | 39.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/04/1953 | 39.95 | |||||
4045 | 06/1913 | 01/11/1950 | Westbury | 37.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4046 | 05/1914 | 15/11/1951 | Shrewsbury | 37.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4047 | 05/1914 | 30/07/1951 | Bristol Bath Road | 37.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4048 | 05/1914 | 20/01/1953 | Landore | 38.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4049 | 05/1914 | 20/07/1953 | Stafford Road | 39.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4050 | 06/1914 | 19/02/1952 | Landore | 37.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4051 | 06/1914 | 16/10/1950 | Worcester | 36.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4052 | 06/1914 | 30/06/1953 | Shrewsbury | 39 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4053 | 06/1914 | 12/07/1954 | Stafford Road | 40.08 | 1,806,399 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 11/09/1954 | 40.27 | ||||
4054 | 06/1914 | 08/02/1952 | Laira | 37.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4055 | 07/1914 | 12/02/1951 | Swindon | 36.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4056 | 07/1914 | 28/10/1957 | Bristol Bath Road | 43.25 | 2,074,338 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 30/11/1957 | 43.41 | ||||
4057 | 07/1914 | 07/02/1952 | Swindon | 37.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4058 | 07/1914 | 16/04/1951 | Stafford Road | 36.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4059 | 07/1914 | 16/09/1952 | Gloucester Horton Road | 38.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4060 | 07/1914 | 11/10/1952 | Bristol Bath Road | 38.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | |||||||
4061 | 05/1922 | 11/03/1957 | Stafford Road | 34.83 | 1,550,800 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 18/05/1957 | 35.03 | ||||
4062 | 05/1922 | 05/11/1956 | Swindon | 34.5 | 1,612,472 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 01/12/1956 | 34.57 | ||||
4063 | 5083 | 11/1922 | 07/01/1959 | 07/06/1937 to 4073 |
Worcester | 36.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 31/01/1959 | 36.24 | |||
4064 | 5084 | 12/1922 | 02/07/1963 | 16/04/1937 to 4073 |
Old Oak Common | 40.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1962 | 40.03 | |||
4065 | 5085 | 12/1922 | 14/02/1964 | 13/07/1939 to 4073 |
St Philips Marsh | 41.17 | Cut | Hayes (Bridgend) | 06/1964 | 41.53 | |||
4066 | 5086 | 12/1922 | 10/11/1958 | 11/12/1937 to 4073 |
Swindon | 35.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 27/12/1958 | 36.06 | |||
4067 | 5087 | 01/1923 | 01/08/1963 | 03/12/1940 to 4073 |
Llanelli | 40.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 01/1964 | 41.03 | |||
4068 | 5088 | 01/1923 | 21/09/1962 | 07/03/1939 to 4073 |
Stafford Road | 39.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Swindon) | 03/1963 | 40.19 | |||
4069 | 5089 | 01/1923 | 14/11/1964 | 01/11/1939 to 4073 |
Oxley | 41.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1965 | 42.12 | |||
4070 | 5090 | 02/1923 | 31/05/1962 | 01/05/1939 to 4073 |
Old Oak Common | 39.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1962 | 39.86 | |||
4071 | 5091 | 02/1923 | 03/10/1964 | 18/12/1938 to 4073 |
Tyseley | 41.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1964 | 41.78 | |||
4072 | 5092 | 02/1923 | 29/07/1963 | 07/04/1938 to 4073 |
Cardiff East Dock | 40.42 | Cut | Coopers Metals (Sharpness) | 10/1964 | 41.69 |