GWR Collett "4073" Class 4-6-0
Class | GWR (Original) | GWR | GWR (Renum) | BR (Renum) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Castle | 111 | 02/1908 | PDN PDN 83D 83D W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Laira Laira Withdrawn |
02/1908 15/06/1947 24/05/1950 15/07/1950 13/07/1953 |
13/07/1953 | |||
Castle | 40 | 4000 | 04/1906 | SDN NA PDN SALOP SRD TYS 4A SRD SRD 84K 84A 87G 87E S W |
Swindon Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Stafford Road Tyseley Shrewsbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Chester West Stafford Road Carmarthen Landore Stored Withdrawn |
21/11/1929 16/12/1930 01/08/1931 22/06/1934 11/05/1937 03/1938 04/1938 04/05/1939 15/06/1947 05/01/1955 31/01/1955 09/1956 10/1956 25/04/1957 20/05/1957 |
20/05/1957 | ||
Castle | 100A1 | A1 | 18/05/1907 | LA NA LA BRD LA NA LA PDN LA NA LA EXE BRD CDF PDN PDN 82C W |
Laira Newton Abbot Laira Bristol Bath Road Laira Newton Abbot Laira Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Laira Exeter Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Withdrawn |
18/05/1907 14/01/1911 20/07/1911 16/02/1918 28/08/1918 06/01/1922 09/06/1923 10/04/1926 25/06/1926 16/06/1927 06/12/1930 03/09/1931 28/01/1932 05/1933 20/04/1934 15/06/1947 01/03/1950 31/03/1950 |
06/03/1950 | ||
Castle | 4016 | 04/1908 | PDN SRD PDN SRD OXY SRD BRD SDN BRD NA NA 81A 81A W 82C |
Old Oak Common Stafford Road Old Oak Common Stafford Road Oxley Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn Swindon |
27/02/1926 01/04/1926 25/05/1926 16/08/1926 03/10/1928 17/04/1929 02/1933 14/04/1939 17/06/1939 18/07/1940 15/06/1947 07/1950 15/07/1950 24/09/1951 27/09/1951 |
24/09/1951 | |||
Castle | 4032 | 03/11/1910 | LA PDN LA EXE LA NA PDN LA TR LA NA EXE LA NA LA NA LA LA PZ PZ LA LA 82C 83F 83B 83B 82C W |
Laira Old Oak Common Laira Exeter Laira Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Laira Truro Laira Newton Abbot Exeter Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Laira Penzance Penzance Laira Laira Swindon Truro Taunton Taunton Swindon Withdrawn |
03/11/1910 23/06/1917 14/01/1925 07/1925 16/04/1926 27/03/1929 19/03/1932 01/04/1933 07/1938 10/1938 05/1943 06/1943 06/09/1943 08/06/1944 18/07/1944 08/10/1946 11/1946 15/06/1947 12/05/1949 18/06/1949 02/11/1949 03/12/1949 27/06/1950 09/09/1950 10/1950 17/10/1950 19/09/1951 12/1951 |
24/09/1951 | |||
Castle | 4037 | 30/12/1910 | LA SDN LA EXE PDN OXF PDN OXF PDN SRD PDN SRD TYS SRD PDN CARM SDN CARM PDN PDN 83G 83A 87E 83A 83C W |
Laira Swindon Laira Exeter Old Oak Common Oxford Old Oak Common Oxford Old Oak Common Stafford Road Old Oak Common Stafford Road Tyseley Stafford Road Old Oak Common Carmarthen Swindon Carmarthen Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Penzance Newton Abbot Landore Newton Abbot Exeter Withdrawn |
30/12/1910 07/06/1913 17/06/1913 12/1913 16/08/1915 01/07/1919 25/07/1919 12/1919 06/10/1920 02/07/1926 27/08/1926 12/11/1926 27/07/1929 09/08/1929 27/01/1930 03/1933 28/11/1933 19/12/1933 18/05/1934 15/06/1947 16/06/1956 28/09/1956 23/02/1957 06/1957 14/07/1962 17/09/1962 |
17/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 4073 | 11/08/1923 | PDN PDN CDF LDR PDN OXF PDN SDN PDN PDN 82A 82B 82B 82C 82A 86C W |
Old Oak Common (on loan) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Oxford Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Swindon Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/08/1923 08/1924 06/11/1924 04/03/1934 02/10/1934 06/04/1935 02/1939 03/1939 21/04/1943 07/1943 15/06/1947 15/07/1950 10/1952 01/11/1952 27/01/1953 27/03/1953 23/01/1957 10/05/1960 |
10/05/1960 | |||
Castle | 4074 | 12/1923 | n/a PDN NA BRD NA LDR EXE PDN CDF LDR PDN LDR LDR 87G 87E 81A 87E 81D 82C 82B 81E 81A W |
Unallocated Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Landore Exeter Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Old Oak Common Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Old Oak Common Landore Reading (W.R.) Swindon St Philips Marsh Didcot Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
12/1923 04/1924 12/1931 27/05/1932 24/06/1932 07/1933 16/09/1934 28/03/1937 29/08/1937 08/04/1940 26/04/1941 01/11/1941 15/06/1947 09/1956 06/1957 13/07/1959 12/08/1959 03/05/1960 31/10/1960 17/01/1962 19/05/1962 17/12/1962 03/05/1963 |
03/05/1963 | |||
Castle | 4075 | 01/1924 | n/a PDN LA NA EXE NA CDF PDN PDN 82A 82A 82B 82B 82A 81A W |
Unallocated Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
01/1924 04/02/1924 15/04/1926 18/08/1927 18/08/1928 12/01/1929 20/11/1931 17/09/1932 15/06/1947 06/11/1950 02/12/1950 10/1952 01/11/1952 26/02/1953 04/11/1959 03/11/1961 |
03/11/1961 | |||
Castle | 4076 | 07/02/1924 | PDN BRD PDN BRD CARM LDR EXE SDN NA 4A PDN PDN SRD SRD CHR TYS CHR 83A 84K 87E 87F 87A 87F W |
Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Carmarthen Landore Exeter Swindon Newton Abbot Shrewsbury Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stafford Road Stafford Road Chester West Tyseley Chester West Newton Abbot Chester West Landore Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Withdrawn |
07/02/1924 30/11/1932 04/01/1933 20/01/1933 20/05/1934 11/1934 30/08/1935 28/08/1938 10/1938 17/06/1940 24/07/1942 15/06/1947 08/1948 04/09/1948 25/12/1948 04/02/1949 03/1949 27/10/1954 01/1955 30/11/1957 15/08/1961 28/05/1962 16/07/1962 09/02/1963 |
08/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 4077 | 10/02/1924 | PDN CDF CARM LA NA EXE NA PZ LA PZ NA LA NA NA 83D 83A 82A 88A 82B W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Carmarthen Laira Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Penzance Laira Penzance Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
10/02/1924 08/10/1929 10/07/1932 10/1933 14/03/1935 01/1939 01/03/1939 04/1939 14/01/1940 03/1941 30/11/1941 11/1946 01/1947 15/06/1947 11/09/1954 05/05/1959 10/02/1960 10/11/1960 30/11/1960 13/08/1962 |
02/08/1962 | |||
Castle | 4078 | 24/02/1924 | PDN CDF PDN 4A LDR LDR CHR 84K 81D 82A 84A 84C 81A 87F W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Landore Landore Chester West Chester West Reading (W.R.) Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Banbury Old Oak Common Llanelli Withdrawn |
24/02/1924 23/04/1931 17/12/1932 10/07/1935 01/11/1935 15/06/1947 25/12/1948 27/01/1958 15/06/1958 08/11/1958 11/07/1959 04/11/1959 04/04/1960 13/06/1961 02/07/1962 |
02/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 4079 | 04/03/1924 | PDN LA PDN BRD SRD CDF NPT CDF HFD HFD GLO 84A 84A 82A 83B 82B S 82C 82B W |
Old Oak Common (on loan) Laira Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Hereford Hereford Gloucester Horton Road Stafford Road Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Taunton St Philips Marsh Stored Swindon (Re-instd) St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
04/03/1924 17/05/1925 13/04/1926 25/06/1926 11/09/1931 01/12/1932 14/12/1935 05/1937 06/1937 01/11/1939 06/1944 15/06/1947 03/11/1948 27/11/1948 01/11/1952 29/06/1953 13/06/1957 13/09/1960 18/01/1961 14/03/1962 11/08/1962 30/11/1963 05/1964 |
14/05/1964 | |||
Castle | 4080 | 23/03/1924 | PDN LA NA LA NA LA NA PZ LDR LA LDR BRD BRD BRD BRD NA NA LA LA 82F 82F 82D 83A 82A 83A 84G 86C 88L 81A 81C W |
Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Penzance Landore Laira Landore Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Laira Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Westbury Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Old Oak Common Southall Withdrawn |
23/03/1924 02/09/1926 03/08/1928 27/03/1929 26/04/1930 29/12/1932 12/1933 01/1935 26/05/1935 09/01/1941 23/12/1941 09/11/1942 10/1943 06/01/1944 08/1946 09/1946 15/06/1947 07/01/1949 29/01/1949 06/1949 18/06/1949 02/06/1950 15/07/1950 04/11/1950 19/05/1953 17/07/1954 13/05/1959 22/04/1960 02/08/1960 07/09/1962 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 10/08/1964 |
10/08/1964 | |||
Castle | 4081 | 03/1924 | n/a PDN RDG PDN CDF LA EXE LA CDF BRD BRD BRD LDR LDR SDN 87E 87E 86C 83C 82A 84G 82A 87G 87F 87G W |
Unallocated Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Exeter Laira Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Landore Landore Swindon Landore Landore Cardiff Canton Exeter Bristol Bath Road Shrewsbury Bristol Bath Road Carmarthen Llanelli Carmarthen Withdrawn |
03/1924 06/04/1924 05/03/1929 15/03/1929 09/01/1931 08/01/1932 08/1932 05/11/1932 04/1933 12/05/1934 21/04/1940 05/1940 03/1941 12/07/1941 26/11/1946 15/06/1947 10/07/1948 04/11/1950 02/12/1950 20/03/1958 16/05/1958 02/12/1958 18/06/1959 15/07/1959 16/09/1960 18/10/1961 14/07/1962 09/02/1963 |
01/01/1963 | |||
Castle | 4082 | 7013 | 12/04/1924 | PDN NA LA PDN SRD PDN BRD PDN SDN GLO STJ WOS WOS 82C 81A S 81A 2A W |
Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Laira Old Oak Common Stafford Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Severn Tunnel Junction Worcester Worcester Swindon Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Tyseley Withdrawn |
12/04/1924 25/05/1928 13/05/1929 23/08/1931 16/12/1932 22/02/1933 25/08/1935 13/03/1938 02/1941 08/10/1946 08/02/1947 15/06/1947 13/01/1948 09/03/1948 02/1949 26/02/1949 08/02/1952 05/01/1954 22/10/1962 13/04/1964 20/06/1964 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Castle | 4083 | 09/05/1925 | PDN CDF PDN LA CDF S CDF CDF S 84G 84G 84A 84A 83A 83C 88A W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Laira Cardiff Canton Stored Cardiff Canton (Re-instd) Cardiff Canton Stored Shrewsbury (Re-instd) Shrewsbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Newton Abbot Exeter Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
09/05/1925 05/06/1932 07/1933 28/12/1934 08/02/1936 06/09/1941 09/09/1941 15/06/1947 21/02/1950 15/07/1950 09/09/1950 16/11/1950 31/12/1950 24/03/1958 13/09/1960 13/09/1961 19/12/1961 |
19/12/1961 | |||
Castle | 4084 | 30/05/1925 | LA NA LA NA CDF CARM LDR PDN BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD 81D 86C W |
Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Carmarthen Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Reading (W.R.) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
30/05/1925 02/12/1929 07/02/1931 13/08/1931 03/1933 19/04/1934 10/1934 03/07/1935 21/03/1938 09/1942 10/1942 05/1943 27/08/1943 09/1946 11/1946 15/06/1947 03/1948 04/1948 04/11/1959 22/12/1959 11/10/1960 |
11/10/1960 | |||
Castle | 4085 | 10/06/1925 | LA PDN CARM LDR CARM EXE PDN RDG RDG 85A 85B 85A 81A W |
Laira Old Oak Common Carmarthen Landore Carmarthen Exeter Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
10/06/1925 01/04/1930 12/02/1932 06/1932 07/1932 17/07/1934 02/05/1937 01/1939 15/06/1947 15/04/1958 20/05/1958 18/02/1960 18/08/1960 02/05/1962 |
02/05/1962 | |||
Castle | 4086 | 20/06/1925 | LA EXE LA CARM BRD S BRD PDN BRD CDF WOS GLO WOS WOS S 85A 87G 87G 83D 81D 86C 81D 84A 81D W |
Laira Exeter Laira Carmarthen Bristol Bath Road Stored Bristol Bath Road (Re-instd) Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Worcester Stored Worcester (Re-instd) Carmarthen Carmarthen Laira Reading (W.R.) Cardiff Canton Reading (W.R.) Stafford Road Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
20/06/1925 09/1929 19/12/1929 07/09/1931 07/09/1932 01/01/1934 14/07/1934 20/10/1934 11/1934 26/02/1935 02/06/1936 01/12/1937 22/06/1939 15/06/1947 22/08/1950 20/08/1951 10/1952 01/11/1952 09/02/1953 28/09/1959 09/12/1959 10/05/1961 11/12/1961 19/01/1962 03/04/1962 |
03/04/1962 | |||
Castle | 4087 | 27/06/1925 | LA NA LA NA LA CDF PDN EXE SRD TR PZ NA TR LA LA PZ PZ 83D 83D 83D 83G 83G 83D S 82B S W |
Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Exeter Stafford Road Truro Penzance Newton Abbot Truro Laira Laira Penzance Penzance Laira Laira Laira Penzance Penzance Laira Stored St Philips Marsh (Re-instd) Stored Withdrawn |
27/06/1925 16/04/1927 24/05/1927 08/1928 18/08/1931 29/07/1932 07/1933 21/02/1936 07/05/1937 08/07/1937 15/10/1937 04/02/1939 28/06/1939 03/01/1941 15/06/1947 12/1949 28/01/1950 22/04/1950 20/05/1950 23/04/1952 10/1952 01/11/1952 08/1954 13/08/1962 06/04/1963 09/09/1963 07/10/1963 |
03/10/1963 | |||
Castle | 4088 | 25/07/1925 | LA NA SRD NA LA PZ LA PDN LA LA PZ PZ LA LA 83A 83D 85A 82C S 82B W |
Laira Newton Abbot Stafford Road Newton Abbot Laira Penzance Laira Old Oak Common Laira Laira Penzance Penzance Laira Laira Newton Abbot Laira Worcester Swindon Stored St Philips Marsh (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
25/07/1925 14/01/1929 30/12/1929 01/1933 25/06/1934 05/1935 03/08/1935 03/03/1937 02/1939 15/06/1947 02/1949 26/03/1949 25/05/1949 18/06/1949 28/10/1953 09/1954 28/00/1958 07/02/1961 24/09/1962 02/11/1963 05/1964 |
14/05/1964 | |||
Castle | 4089 | 08/07/1925 | PDN CDF PDN SRD LDR PDN LDR CDF LDR SDN BRD BRD BRD WEY LA LA 81A 81A 83A 83D 83D 81A 85A 81A S 81D W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Stafford Road Landore Old Oak Common Landore Cardiff Canton Landore Swindon Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Laira Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Laira Laira Old Oak Common Worcester Old Oak Common Stored Reading (W.R.) (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
08/07/1925 15/06/1928 17/09/1929 20/12/1932 02/11/1935 05/04/1936 30/04/1936 07/01/1937 17/02/1937 09/02/1938 02/1942 15/06/1947 08/1947 30/10/1947 30/06/1948 07/1948 10/07/1948 31/01/1951 20/07/1951 18/01/1952 26/01/1952 02/1952 06/1954 02/12/1958 05/07/1960 22/10/1962 31/12/1963 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 4090 | 15/08/1925 | PDN LA NA PZ PDN LA EXE LA NA LA LA PZ 83G 81A 81A 84A 81A 87E 87G 87E 87A S 89A S 88L W |
Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Penzance Old Oak Common Laira Exeter Laira Newton Abbot Laira Laira Penzance Penzance Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stafford Road Old Oak Common Landore Carmarthen Landore Neath (Court Sart) Stored Shrewsbury (Re-instd) Stored Cardiff East Dock (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
15/08/1925 20/06/1931 18/01/1934 04/1935 30/11/1935 22/03/1937 04/1938 05/1938 30/12/1938 10/01/1939 15/06/1947 02/1950 25/02/1950 11/1952 29/11/1952 03/07/1953 12/1955 11/08/1959 22/09/1959 16/06/1960 28/08/1961 17/04/1962 14/07/1962 07/09/1962 24/09/1962 07/06/1963 |
06/06/1963 | |||
Castle | 4091 | 01/08/1925 | PDN CDF BRD NA LA CDF LDR CDF PDN SDN PDN WOS PDN PDN 82A 82A 81A W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Worcester Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
01/08/1925 30/06/1930 16/09/1931 03/1933 19/06/1934 03/10/1934 07/1938 10/1938 19/09/1939 05/08/1941 01/11/1941 21/03/1946 03/10/1946 15/06/1947 11/06/1950 15/07/1950 12/1955 19/01/1959 |
19/01/1959 | |||
Castle | 4092 | 06/08/1925 | PDN SRD PDN CDF LA WOS WOS 84A 84A 81D 81F W |
Old Oak Common Stafford Road Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Worcester Worcester Stafford Road Stafford Road Reading (W.R.) Oxford Withdrawn |
06/08/1925 26/05/1926 05/09/1926 28/04/1931 15/01/1934 21/02/1939 15/06/1947 07/11/1950 02/12/1950 20/03/1958 31/10/1960 19/12/1961 |
19/12/1961 | |||
Castle | 4093 | 26/05/1926 | PDN TYS PDN CDF NA LA PZ LA BRD BRD 85A 85A 87E 87E 87A 87F 82B W |
Old Oak Common Tyseley Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Laira Penzance Laira Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Worcester Worcester Landore Landore Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
26/05/1926 15/10/1932 24/10/1932 12/1933 02/03/1936 08/07/1937 03/1938 13/05/1939 06/1943 15/06/1947 07/11/1950 02/12/1950 10/1952 01/11/1952 13/06/1961 11/02/1963 04/03/1963 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 4094 | 05/06/1926 | PDN LA NA LA NA LA CDF S CDF CDF 82A 82A 84A 87E 87G W |
Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Stored Cardiff Canton (Re-instd) Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Landore Carmarthen Withdrawn |
05/06/1926 22/12/1929 26/03/1931 07/07/1932 25/06/1934 10/10/1934 07/11/1937 12/01/1942 07/11/1942 15/06/1947 09/12/1952 27/12/1952 07/1954 06/1957 11/09/1961 23/03/1962 |
23/03/1962 | |||
Castle | 4095 | 16/06/1926 | LA NA LA NA LA NA LDR LDR 84C 87E 83G 83B 83D S 83D 81D W |
Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Landore Landore Banbury Landore Penzance Taunton Laira Stored Laira (Re-instd) Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
16/06/1926 16/05/1928 26/05/1931 09/1931 18/01/1934 19/05/1935 22/08/1936 15/06/1947 07/06/1952 17/06/1952 12/12/1957 22/04/1960 16/06/1960 14/03/1962 15/06/1962 06/10/1962 12/12/1962 |
12/12/1962 | |||
Castle | 4096 | 23/06/1926 | LA NA LA NA SRD LDR BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD 81A 81D 81A W |
Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Stafford Road Landore Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
23/06/1926 02/04/1928 15/03/1930 04/04/1931 02/1933 03/06/1934 18/11/1935 03/1941 25/07/1941 15/06/1947 09/1948 10/1948 10/1948 11/1948 20/03/1958 14/07/1962 17/12/1962 09/02/1963 |
01/01/1963 | |||
Castle | 4097 | 30/06/1926 | PDN WOS CARM PDN CDF SRD BRD LA TR NA LA PZ PZ EXE EXE 83D 83D 81A 81A 87E 82C W |
Old Oak Common Worcester Carmarthen Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Laira Truro Newton Abbot Laira Penzance Penzance Exeter Exeter Laira Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Landore Swindon Withdrawn |
30/06/1926 02/08/1929 11/09/1929 23/12/1930 06/01/1931 07/1933 24/07/1934 06/01/1936 08/1939 31/12/1939 24/05/1945 17/12/1946 15/06/1947 10/1948 30/10/1948 03/1950 25/03/1950 31/01/1951 02/10/1951 06/1957 04/04/1960 06/05/1960 |
06/05/1960 | |||
Castle | 4098 | 29/07/1926 | PDN NA BRD NA PDN TN EXE NA TR EXE LA NA LA NA NA S 81A S W |
Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Taunton Exeter Newton Abbot Truro Exeter Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Stored Withdrawn |
29/07/1926 02/12/1929 25/10/1930 12/11/1930 06/1933 29/05/1934 10/1934 27/01/1936 06/03/1937 18/08/1937 24/09/1938 18/04/1939 05/05/1939 25/04/1947 15/06/1947 14/03/1962 14/07/1962 07/09/1962 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 4099 | 03/08/1926 | PDN CDF NA CDF PDN EXE NA NA 83G 87E 87A 87F W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Exeter Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Penzance Landore Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Withdrawn |
03/08/1926 02/03/1931 18/04/1932 07/1933 16/06/1934 17/10/1936 18/12/1943 15/06/1947 26/03/1955 02/11/1957 13/05/1961 14/07/1962 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5000 | 28/08/1926 | PDN LA PDN PDN CARM CARM PDN PDN 82A 82A 82C 85B 86C 2B W |
Old Oak Common Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Carmarthen Carmarthen Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Hereford Oxley Withdrawn |
28/08/1926 02/1933 19/04/1936 15/06/1947 10/1948 14/10/1948 02/1949 26/02/1949 07/1950 15/07/1950 03/11/1955 19/05/1962 02/11/1962 14/06/1964 10/1964 |
31/10/1964 | |||
Castle | 5001 | 21/08/1926 | PDN CDF PDN SRD CDF PDN CDF CDF 81A 84G 81A S 81A W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Stafford Road Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
21/08/1926 26/08/1931 20/09/1931 14/04/1935 13/12/1935 15/12/1937 17/08/1939 15/06/1947 22/01/1958 26/09/1958 02/08/1960 14/09/1962 04/02/1963 25/02/1963 |
26/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 5002 | 28/08/1926 | PDN CDF LA NA CDF LDR SDN LDR LDR CARM CARM 87E LDR 87G 87E 82C 85A 82C S 81D 82B 81D 81C W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Landore Swindon Landore Landore Carmarthen Carmarthen Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Swindon Worcester Swindon Stored Reading (W.R.) (Re-instd) St Philips Marsh Reading (W.R.) Southall Withdrawn |
28/08/1926 18/06/1929 29/08/1930 23/12/1932 28/01/1934 13/06/1939 12/01/1941 02/1941 15/06/1947 07/1949 13/08/1949 10/01/1950 28/01/1950 09/1956 10/1956 03/01/1958 12/11/1959 08/02/1960 24/09/1962 03/1963 30/11/1963 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 01/09/1964 |
01/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 5003 | 28/05/1927 | PDN CDF NA TN EXE SDN EXE LA EXE SDN TN TN 83C 83D 87G 86C 83A W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Taunton Exeter Swindon Exeter Laira Exeter Swindon Taunton Taunton Exeter Laira Carmarthen Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
28/05/1927 09/06/1934 13/03/1936 05/1937 17/08/1937 20/01/1941 03/1941 14/07/1941 18/09/1941 07/08/1942 27/08/1942 15/06/1947 27/02/1951 09/02/1957 11/12/1957 20/03/1958 17/03/1959 29/08/1962 |
29/08/1962 | |||
Castle | 5004 | 16/06/1927 | TN LA NA CDF PDN PDN 84G 86C 87E 87A W |
Taunton Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Landore Neath (Court Sart) Withdrawn |
16/06/1927 07/07/1927 21/07/1930 04/04/1934 21/12/1935 15/06/1947 06/1956 20/09/1957 20/03/1958 13/06/1961 03/04/1962 |
03/04/1962 | |||
Castle | 5005 | 11/06/1927 | PDN TN LA TN LA PDN CDF CDF 83A 81A 82C W |
Old Oak Common Taunton Laira Taunton Laira Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Swindon Withdrawn |
11/06/1927 09/07/1930 09/1930 23/12/1930 01/1931 21/05/1932 21/12/1945 15/06/1947 12/1956 20/03/1958 26/09/1958 02/1960 |
29/02/1960 | |||
Castle | 5006 | 11/06/1927 | PDN LA LDR PDN BRD WEY BRD LDR LDR CDF CDF 81A 87G 87E 87F 87G W |
Old Oak Common Laira Landore Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Bristol Bath Road Landore Landore Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Carmarthen Landore Llanelli Carmarthen Withdrawn |
11/06/1927 06/1933 29/06/1934 17/12/1935 24/04/1938 05/1938 06/1938 12/1942 15/06/1947 07/1948 10/07/1948 06/1954 20/03/1958 13/07/1960 06/07/1961 11/09/1961 03/04/1962 |
03/04/1962 | |||
Castle | 5007 | 30/06/1927 | LA PDN LA SRD LDR SDN CDF CDF 81A 82C 85B W |
Laira Old Oak Common Laira Stafford Road Landore Swindon Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
30/06/1927 15/10/1932 08/03/1935 27/06/1935 05/05/1938 15/03/1940 30/03/1940 15/06/1947 18/02/1957 02/02/1959 09/03/1961 09/1962 |
05/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5008 | 30/06/1927 | LA PDN CARM CDF PDN WOS PDN PDN SDN 81F 81F 84A 84A 81A 87G 81A W |
Laira Old Oak Common Carmarthen Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Worcester Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Oxford Oxford Stafford Road Stafford Road Old Oak Common Carmarthen Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
30/06/1927 20/12/1930 23/12/1930 09/03/1932 06/1933 06/12/1938 01/1939 15/06/1947 21/10/1949 04/02/1950 25/02/1950 07/1950 12/08/1950 11/1956 30/12/1956 30/01/1957 07/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5009 | 06/07/1927 | LA NA PDN LDR LA RDG LA EXE RDG PDN EXE NA LA NA LA LA SDN SDN W |
Laira Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Landore Laira Reading (W.R.) Laira Exeter Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Exeter Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Laira Swindon Swindon Withdrawn |
06/07/1927 09/1927 19/09/1929 08/07/1932 20/12/1934 04/12/1935 07/12/1935 01/1936 06/03/1936 05/04/1936 05/1936 12/06/1937 03/03/1939 19/11/1943 10/12/1943 15/06/1947 10/1948 14/10/1948 24/10/1960 |
24/10/1960 | |||
Castle | 5010 | 26/07/1927 | PDN CDF LA NA CDF PDN CDF LDR CDF SRD CDF SDN CDF CDF LDR LDR 84A S 84A 84A 83D 84A 81A 81D W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Laira Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Cardiff Canton Swindon Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Landore Landore Stafford Road Stored Stafford Road (Re-instd) Stafford Road Laira Stafford Road Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
26/07/1927 26/07/1930 15/06/1931 19/12/1933 24/04/1934 14/12/1935 31/12/1935 08/1938 10/1938 26/04/1940 12/1940 20/01/1943 04/1943 15/06/1947 11/06/1948 10/07/1948 08/05/1950 23/05/1950 26/07/1950 12/08/1950 04/03/1953 14/05/1953 20/03/1958 10/01/1959 05/10/1959 |
05/10/1959 | |||
Castle | 5011 | 22/07/1927 | NA CDF NA EXE NA LA NA EXE LA PZ NA NA 81D 81A W |
Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Exeter Laira Penzance Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
22/07/1927 09/07/1930 01/1933 03/03/1934 04/1934 10/1934 13/12/1936 04/1939 19/12/1939 11/03/1941 30/07/1941 15/06/1947 03/05/1960 09/12/1960 04/09/1962 |
17/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5012 | 27/07/1927 | NA CARM PDN NA PDN CDF EXE EXE 83D 83D 86C 86C 81F 81F W |
Newton Abbot Carmarthen Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Exeter Exeter Laira Laira Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Oxford Oxford Withdrawn |
27/07/1927 13/09/1929 10/10/1931 15/06/1932 04/07/1932 01/1933 25/08/1939 15/06/1947 03/1950 25/03/1950 11/1952 01/11/1952 12/1952 27/12/1952 24/04/1962 |
24/04/1962 | |||
Castle | 5013 | 27/06/1932 | NA LA EXE NA LA PZ NA PZ LDR LDR 87G 87E 87A 87F W |
Newton Abbot Laira Exeter Newton Abbot Laira Penzance Newton Abbot Penzance Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Withdrawn |
27/06/1932 07/1933 03/07/1934 31/12/1935 02/1936 07/1939 30/08/1939 19/09/1939 11/03/1940 15/06/1947 08/1951 01/1952 17/06/1961 06/1962 07/1962 |
04/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 5014 | 07/07/1932 | LA NA EXE NA PDN BRD BRD PDN PDN 2A W |
Laira Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Tyseley Withdrawn |
07/07/1932 12/1933 03/1934 04/1934 19/12/1935 16/07/1938 08/1942 09/1942 10/1942 12/1942 15/06/1947 14/06/1964 02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 5015 | 09/07/1932 | CDF EXE LA 4A PDN 4A SRD SDN SRD SRD 82A 87E 81A 88L W |
Cardiff Canton Exeter Laira Shrewsbury Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Stafford Road Swindon Stafford Road Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Landore Old Oak Common Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
09/07/1932 05/07/1934 26/12/1935 11/12/1938 28/06/1940 23/05/1942 16/10/1945 27/01/1947 03/04/1947 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 16/06/1960 25/01/1961 04/10/1962 25/04/1963 |
25/04/1963 | |||
Castle | 5016 | 09/07/1932 | PDN NA PZ LA PZ LDR LDR 83D 87E 87F W |
Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Penzance Laira Penzance Landore Landore Laira Landore Llanelli Withdrawn |
09/07/1932 12/1933 04/1936 19/01/1937 01/1938 03/05/1938 15/06/1947 11/10/1954 12/1954 13/06/1961 04/09/1962 |
17/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5017 | 11/07/1932 | TN CDF PDN LA NA LA NA WOS SDN WOS WOS 85B 85B W |
Taunton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Worcester Swindon Worcester Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
11/07/1932 09/11/1932 11/1933 29/12/1934 01/1935 05/03/1936 08/07/1937 01/04/1939 14/02/1947 04/1947 15/06/1947 10/1951 03/11/1951 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5018 | 28/07/1932 | PDN NA PDN SRD SRD 82A 82A 82C 82C 85A 85B 85B 85A 85B 86C 85B 86C 85B 81D W |
Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Stafford Road Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Swindon Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Gloucester Horton Road Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
28/07/1932 23/01/1936 07/04/1936 02/1945 15/06/1947 07/07/1950 12/08/1950 23/09/1950 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 01/1951 28/02/1951 14/07/1951 11/08/1951 10/1952 10/1952 01/11/1952 27/12/1952 03/1958 10/03/1964 |
10/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 5019 | 24/07/1932 | SDN LA NA LA PDN BRD BRD BRD 84A W |
Swindon Laira Newton Abbot Laira Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Withdrawn |
24/07/1932 19/08/1932 11/1933 13/12/1937 05/02/1939 17/06/1940 15/06/1947 04/1948 05/1948 08/05/1958 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5020 | 05/08/1932 | LA CDF LDR CDF CDF 83D 86C 83D 83G 83B 83C 88A 87F W |
Laira Cardiff Canton Landore Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Laira Cardiff Canton Laira Penzance Taunton Exeter Cardiff Canton Llanelli Withdrawn |
05/08/1932 18/02/1934 27/03/1935 26/06/1939 15/06/1947 26/01/1957 20/04/1957 30/11/1957 27/12/1958 22/05/1960 18/06/1960 07/10/1961 14/07/1962 20/11/1962 |
20/11/1962 | |||
Castle | 5021 | 17/08/1932 | LA SDN LA NA LA NA LA 4A SRD 4A SRD 4A SALOP LA LA 83C 83C 83D 86C 82B 88A W |
Laira Swindon Laira Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Laira Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Laira Laira Exeter Exeter Laira Cardiff Canton St Philips Marsh Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
17/08/1932 10/03/1933 31/03/1933 09/01/1935 01/02/1935 17/03/1936 29/08/1937 17/12/1938 25/11/1940 05/04/1941 20/05/1942 08/09/1945 15/06/1947 29/06/1948 10/07/1948 10/1952 01/11/1952 03/1957 22/09/1959 15/09/1960 03/10/1960 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5022 | 30/08/1932 | PDN PDN NA PDN SRD SRD W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Stafford Road Stafford Road Withdrawn |
30/08/1932 15/06/1947 16/10/1947 02/03/1948 09/1948 04/09/1948 17/06/1963 |
24/06/1963 | |||
Castle | 5023 | 12/04/1934 | PDN CDF PDN PDN S 83D 83D 83G 83G 83D 85A 82C S W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Laira (Re-instd) Laira Penzance Penzance Laira Worcester Swindon Stored Withdrawn |
02/05/1934 22/04/1936 18/11/1937 15/06/1947 28/02/1950 07/07/1950 15/07/1950 10/1952 01/11/1952 08/1954 27/01/1958 20/03/1958 24/09/1962 09/02/1963 |
11/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 5024 | 18/04/1934 | LA NA PZ NA PZ LA BRD BRD NA NA BRD BRD NA NA W |
Laira Newton Abbot Penzance Newton Abbot Penzance Laira Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Withdrawn |
28/04/1934 01/06/1934 25/02/1936 05/1936 22/10/1936 20/04/1937 05/1943 15/06/1947 11/1948 12/1948 25/12/1948 07/1949 16/07/1949 18/11/1949 03/12/1949 21/05/1962 |
21/05/1962 | |||
Castle | 5025 | 20/04/1934 | PDN EXE TN EXE BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD 82D 82B 82A 82A 82C 81F S 86C W |
Old Oak Common Exeter Taunton Exeter Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Westbury St Philips Marsh Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Oxford Stored Hereford (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
01/05/1934 07/03/1936 17/09/1936 10/1936 17/09/1937 11/1945 10/11/1945 06/1947 15/06/1947 07/1947 09/1947 08/10/1947 02/1951 28/02/1951 24/04/1951 30/04/1951 05/1956 20/03/1958 12/12/1962 29/10/1963 13/11/1963 |
13/11/1963 | |||
Castle | 5026 | 24/04/1934 | NA PZ EXE TN EXE LA LA PZ LA LA 81A 81F 81F 84A 84E 84A 2B W |
Newton Abbot Penzance Exeter Taunton Exeter Laira Laira Penzance Laira Laira Old Oak Common Oxford Oxford Stafford Road Tyseley Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
30/04/1934 12/1936 03/05/1937 10/1939 11/1939 17/05/1947 15/06/1947 08/10/1949 12/1949 28/01/1950 07/11/1950 02/12/1950 01/11/1952 20/03/1958 19/12/1960 19/05/1961 09/09/1963 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 | |||
Castle | 5027 | 27/04/1934 | PDN PDN 84K 84K 84A 84A 82A 81A 87G 87F W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Chester West Chester West Stafford Road Stafford Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Carmarthen Llanelli Withdrawn |
12/05/1934 15/06/1947 04/11/1950 02/12/1950 06/11/1951 01/12/1951 06/1954 20/03/1958 05/07/1961 14/07/1962 20/11/1962 |
20/11/1962 | |||
Castle | 5028 | 17/05/1934 | LA NA TR NA NA 83D W |
Laira Newton Abbot Truro Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Withdrawn |
26/05/1934 03/01/1938 06/1938 10/1938 15/06/1947 06/1956 20/05/1960 |
20/05/1960 | |||
Castle | 5029 | 17/05/1934 | PDN PDN 85A 83A 83D S 88L W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Worcester Newton Abbot Laira Stored Cardiff East Dock (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
28/05/1934 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 05/05/1959 04/11/1959 14/03/1962 15/12/1962 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 5030 | 18/05/1934 | EXE CDF NPT CDF CDF 87G 87E 87G W |
Exeter Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Carmarthen Landore Carmarthen Withdrawn |
01/06/1934 14/05/1936 03/1941 08/1942 15/06/1947 19/08/1958 16/06/1960 07/09/1960 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5031 | 24/05/1934 | SRD SRD S 84A 84K 84A 2B W |
Stafford Road Stafford Road Stored Stafford Road (Re-instd) Chester West Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
02/06/1934 15/06/1947 14/09/1950 07/11/1950 01/02/1955 03/1955 09/09/1963 15/10/1963 |
22/10/1963 | |||
Castle | 5032 | 25/05/1934 | SALOP SALOP 84A 84A 83A 81A W |
Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/06/1934 15/06/1947 11/1951 01/12/1951 20/03/1958 04/03/1960 07/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5033 | 10/05/1935 | SRD SRD CHR SRD SRD CHR CHR 81F W |
Stafford Road Stafford Road Chester West Stafford Road Stafford Road Chester West Chester West Oxford Withdrawn |
17/05/1935 15/06/1947 25/07/1947 13/02/1948 31/03/1948 31/05/1948 07/1948 15/06/1958 07/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5034 | 14/05/1935 | NA PZ NA NA S 81A 81D 81D 81A W |
Newton Abbot Penzance Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
21/05/1935 01/1940 06/1940 15/06/1947 09/10/1950 11/11/1950 12/1950 02/12/1950 12/1953 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5035 | 21/05/1935 | CDF SRD PDN PDN 82C W |
Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Withdrawn |
29/05/1935 14/12/1935 20/04/1940 15/06/1947 06/09/1960 17/05/1962 |
17/05/1962 | |||
Castle | 5036 | 28/05/1935 | CDF SRD PDN PDN 81D 81D 81A W |
Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
04/06/1935 01/1936 28/02/1937 15/06/1947 03/1950 25/03/1950 29/12/1960 04/09/1962 |
17/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5037 | 31/05/1935 | PDN TYS PDN PDN 82A 82A 82D 82A 82D 82A 85A 81A 87A 87F 87A 87F S 82B W |
Old Oak Common Tyseley Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Westbury Bristol Bath Road Westbury Bristol Bath Road Worcester Old Oak Common Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Stored St Philips Marsh (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
08/06/1935 04/02/1936 03/1936 15/06/1947 07/07/1950 12/08/1950 02/1951 17/02/1951 28/02/1951 30/04/1951 06/1954 25/05/1960 13/06/1961 14/07/1962 03/11/1962 09/02/1963 09/09/1963 05/11/1963 10/03/1964 |
20/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 5038 | 12/06/1935 | PDN PDN 84G 81F 81D W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Oxford Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
21/06/1935 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 19/05/1962 03/11/1962 17/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 5039 | 18/06/1935 | PDN PDN 87G 87E 87G 86C 87G 81A 87G 87E 85A 87E 87G 87F 81A 87J S 88A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Carmarthen Landore Carmarthen Cardiff Canton Carmarthen Old Oak Common Carmarthen Landore Worcester Landore Carmarthen Llanelli Old Oak Common Fishguard Goodwick Stored Cardiff East Dock (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
25/06/1935 15/06/1947 06/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1952 23/11/1955 12/1955 02/1956 03/1956 06/1957 30/12/1959 18/02/1960 13/09/1960 09/02/1963 04/05/1963 27/07/1963 09/09/1963 31/12/1963 15/06/1964 |
15/06/1964 | |||
Castle | 5040 | 25/06/1935 | PDN PDN 82C 82B S W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon St Philips Marsh Stored Withdrawn |
01/07/1935 15/06/1947 04/09/1961 19/10/1961 13/02/1962 28/10/1963 |
28/10/1963 | |||
Castle | 5041 | 02/07/1935 | LA PZ LA LA BRD BRD BRD S 83A 83A 87E 87A S 81A S W |
Laira Penzance Laira Laira Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Stored Newton Abbot (Re-instd) Newton Abbot Landore Neath (Court Sart) Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Stored Withdrawn |
11/07/1935 03/02/1940 06/1940 15/06/1947 07/1948 07/08/1948 10/1948 22/10/1948 17/02/1950 06/07/1950 12/08/1950 27/09/1955 13/06/1961 17/04/1962 02/07/1962 14/12/1962 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 5042 | 05/07/1935 | PDN BRD PDN BRD PDN BRD WOS GLO GLO 85A 81A 83A S 87G 87F S 88A 86C 85B W |
Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Stored Carmarthen (Re-instd) Llanelli Stored Cardiff East Dock (Re-instd) Hereford Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
11/07/1935 09/09/1935 21/03/1936 24/05/1936 16/10/1936 10/11/1936 17/10/1937 27/05/1939 15/06/1947 02/02/1959 07/04/1960 11/08/1962 24/09/1962 12/01/1963 09/03/1963 09/09/1963 31/12/1963 13/04/1964 20/07/1964 25/06/1965 |
25/06/1965 | |||
Castle | 5043 | 13/03/1936 | PDN SDN PDN SDN PDN PDN S 87G 87G 87G 81A 88A 88L W |
Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Carmarthen (Re-instd) Carmarthen Carmarthen Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
13/03/1936 12/1941 04/04/1942 23/05/1947 15/06/1947 16/06/1947 17/02/1951 06/1952 14/06/1952 27/12/1952 02/1956 21/04/1962 07/09/1962 16/12/1963 |
16/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 5044 | 18/03/1936 | PDN PDN 82C 86C 87A 88A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Cardiff Canton Neath (Court Sart) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
29/03/1936 15/06/1947 04/07/1960 05/07/1960 13/06/1961 05/07/1961 03/04/1962 |
03/04/1962 | |||
Castle | 5045 | 26/03/1936 | PDN PDN S 84A 84A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Stafford Road (Re-instd) Stafford Road Withdrawn |
03/04/1936 15/06/1947 28/09/1950 06/11/1950 02/12/1950 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5046 | 01/04/1936 | CDF PDN CDF CDF 84A W |
Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Withdrawn |
08/04/1936 09/09/1943 24/10/1943 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5047 | 08/04/1936 | LDR NA LA NA NA LA NA 84A W |
Landore Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Stafford Road Withdrawn |
21/04/1936 27/04/1940 09/1943 27/11/1943 15/06/1947 16/03/1948 27/04/1948 03/11/1954 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5048 | 25/04/1936 | BRD LDR SDN BRD BRD SDN BRD BRD 88A 87A S 87F W |
Bristol Bath Road Landore Swindon Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Neath (Court Sart) Stored Llanelli (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
04/05/1936 19/01/1938 18/12/1939 02/1940 12/1940 01/1941 06/02/1942 02/1943 15/06/1947 03/11/1960 05/07/1961 17/04/1962 11/08/1962 14/08/1962 |
14/08/1962 | |||
Castle | 5049 | 30/04/1936 | WOS CDF CDF 83D 83A 82A 82B W |
Worcester Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Laira Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
08/05/1936 13/08/1939 15/06/1947 12/1956 24/07/1958 22/04/1960 16/09/1960 22/03/1963 |
22/03/1963 | |||
Castle | 5050 | 02/05/1936 | WOS GLO EXE LA LA SALOP 4A 81A 82B 82C 82B W |
Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Exeter Laira Laira Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Old Oak Common St Philips Marsh Swindon St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
05/1936 22/07/1939 13/11/1939 11/1942 15/06/1947 07/08/1948 09/1948 16/09/1960 08/08/1961 18/01/1962 05/04/1962 02/09/1963 |
29/08/1963 | |||
Castle | 5051 | 09/05/1936 | LDR LDR 87A 87F W |
Landore Landore Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Withdrawn |
24/05/1936 15/06/1947 23/06/1961 09/02/1963 24/05/1963 |
24/05/1963 | |||
Castle | 5052 | 15/05/1936 | CDF CDF 81A 82A 82B W |
Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
25/03/1936 15/06/1947 15/01/1957 06/09/1960 16/09/1960 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5053 | 29/05/1936 | 4A SRD SRD 83A 83D 88A W |
Shrewsbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Newton Abbot Laira Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
06/06/1936 25/10/1937 15/06/1947 08/12/1954 04/11/1959 11/09/1961 13/07/1962 |
13/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 5054 | 03/06/1936 | PDN CDF CDF 82A 81A 87G 87A 87F S 86C 85A 85B W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Carmarthen Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Stored Hereford (Re-instd) Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
13/06/1936 01/04/1938 15/06/1947 10/04/1957 04/11/1959 31/10/1960 03/11/1962 09/02/1963 09/09/1963 30/11/1963 13/04/1964 14/09/1964 24/10/1964 |
23/10/1964 | |||
Castle | 5055 | 09/06/1936 | PDN OXF PDN RDG PDN PDN 83A S 87G S 87J S 86C 85B W |
Old Oak Common Oxford Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Stored Carmarthen (Re-instd) Stored Fishguard Goodwick (Re-instd) Stored Hereford (Re-instd) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
14/06/1936 05/1939 07/1939 15/06/1942 10/1942 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 24/09/1962 21/12/1962 14/01/1963 27/07/1963 09/09/1963 02/11/1963 20/07/1964 28/09/1964 |
28/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 5056 | 17/06/1936 | PDN PDN S 81A 88L 86C 2B W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Cardiff East Dock Hereford Oxley Withdrawn |
28/06/1936 15/06/1947 23/10/1950 04/11/1950 26/07/1963 13/04/1964 14/06/1964 11/1964 |
21/11/1964 | |||
Castle | 5057 | 26/06/1936 | NA EXE NA LA LA 81A 81A 83D 83A 83D 82A 84C 81A W |
Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Laira Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Laira Newton Abbot Laira Bristol Bath Road Banbury Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
09/07/1936 03/1938 04/1938 01/1939 15/06/1947 31/01/1951 01/03/1951 26/01/1952 02/1952 30/04/1952 08/06/1954 04/11/1959 24/03/1960 10/03/1964 |
10/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 5058 | 19/05/1937 | NA NA 83D 83D 83A 83D 82C 83D 85B S W |
Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Laira Laira Newton Abbot Laira Swindon Laira Gloucester Horton Road Stored Withdrawn |
23/05/1937 15/06/1947 03/1950 25/03/1950 29/05/1957 01/06/1957 22/09/1959 30/11/1959 11/09/1961 12/11/1962 06/03/1963 |
06/03/1963 | |||
Castle | 5059 | 26/05/1937 | EXE EXE 83A 84A 84G W |
Exeter Exeter Newton Abbot Stafford Road Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
08/06/1937 15/06/1947 05/1953 02/04/1958 17/05/1960 22/06/1962 |
22/06/1962 | |||
Castle | 5060 | 01/06/1937 | SRD NA LA LA PZ LA 81A 81A W |
Stafford Road Newton Abbot Laira Laira Penzance Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
10/06/1937 28/01/1939 04/12/1940 15/06/1947 21/05/1949 13/08/1949 13/01/1951 31/01/1951 22/06/1962 |
22/06/1962 | |||
Castle | 5061 | 09/06/1937 | 4A SRD 4A SRD 4A SALOP S 84A 84A 84K 84K 81D 86C W |
Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stored Stafford Road (Re-instd) Stafford Road Chester West Chester West Reading (W.R.) Cardiff Canton Withdrawn |
11/06/1937 10/1938 11/1938 16/04/1943 22/04/1943 15/06/1947 07/03/1950 11/1950 31/01/1951 05/1951 14/07/1951 05/09/1958 09/12/1959 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5062 | 15/06/1937 | SRD NA NA 83C 83C 83B 83B 82C 82C 82A 87E 87A S 87F W |
Stafford Road Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Exeter Exeter Taunton Taunton Swindon Swindon Bristol Bath Road Landore Neath (Court Sart) Stored Llanelli (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
23/06/1937 09/1937 15/06/1947 05/1950 20/05/1950 02/1951 28/02/1951 14/10/1952 01/11/1952 23/04/1958 16/09/1960 13/06/1961 17/04/1962 02/07/1962 14/08/1962 |
14/08/1962 | |||
Castle | 5063 | 22/06/1937 | WOS WOS 82A 84A 2B W |
Worcester Worcester Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
03/07/1937 15/06/1947 01/06/1954 16/04/1958 09/09/1963 02/1965 |
20/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 5064 | 26/06/1937 | NA SRD 4A SALOP 82A 82A 82C 85B W |
Newton Abbot Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
08/07/1937 09/1937 10/1937 15/06/1947 05/10/1950 02/12/1950 23/04/1958 11/09/1961 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5065 | 02/07/1937 | EXE CDF PDN PDN S S 81A W |
Exeter Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
09/07/1937 03/08/1939 22/12/1944 15/06/1947 26/10/1949 14/04/1950 08/1950 09/02/1963 |
07/01/1963 | |||
Castle | 5066 | 06/07/1937 | PDN PDN W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
16/07/1937 15/06/1947 17/09/1962 |
17/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5067 | 07/07/1937 | PDN SDN SDN BRD 87G 81D W |
Old Oak Common Swindon Swindon Bristol Bath Road Carmarthen Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
21/07/1937 20/03/1943 15/06/1947 24/01/1948 20/06/1958 10/05/1961 13/07/1962 |
13/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 5068 | 03/06/1938 | BRD BRD SDN SDN 81F W |
Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Swindon Oxford Withdrawn |
22/06/1938 11/1940 01/02/1941 06/11/1941 15/06/1947 19/05/1962 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5069 | 03/06/1938 | PDN PDN SDN PDN 82A 82A 83D W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Laira Withdrawn |
21/06/1938 15/06/1947 30/09/1947 11/1947 22/10/1952 01/11/1952 23/06/1954 21/02/1962 |
21/02/1962 | |||
Castle | 5070 | 18/06/1938 | PDN BRD SRD SRD 84G S 81A W |
Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Stafford Road Shrewsbury Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
03/07/1938 01/1939 18/03/1940 15/06/1947 10/02/1960 07/09/1962 17/11/1962 20/03/1964 |
20/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 5071 | 23/06/1938 | NA EXE NA NA 85A 85B 85A 85B 82B W |
Newton Abbot Exeter Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Gloucester Horton Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
07/07/1938 12/06/1940 07/1940 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 20/05/1958 16/09/1959 15/12/1960 24/02/1962 22/10/1963 |
22/10/1963 | |||
Castle | 5072 | 29/06/1938 | NA LDR LDR 86C 83D 84A 88A 84A W |
Newton Abbot Landore Landore Cardiff Canton Laira Stafford Road Cardiff Canton Stafford Road Withdrawn |
07/07/1938 03/1947 15/06/1947 12/1955 24/01/1957 20/03/1958 11/10/1960 31/10/1960 30/10/1962 |
30/10/1962 | |||
Castle | 5073 | 07/07/1938 | LA SRD 4A SALOP 82A 83B 88A 88L W |
Laira Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Bristol Bath Road Taunton Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
13/07/1938 12/1938 02/1939 15/06/1947 20/03/1958 13/09/1960 11/09/1961 07/09/1962 26/02/1964 |
26/02/1964 | |||
Castle | 5074 | 26/07/1938 | PDN BRD BRD NA BRD BRD S 86C 87E 86C 81A 87E 87A 87F 88L S 82B W |
Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Stored Cardiff Canton (Re-instd) Landore Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Landore Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Cardiff East Dock Stored St Philips Marsh (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
31/07/1938 01/1939 04/1942 10/06/1942 24/08/1945 07/09/1945 15/06/1947 22/02/1951 02/07/1954 07/1955 05/07/1956 12/1956 16/06/1960 13/06/1961 14/07/1962 06/10/1962 04/03/1963 05/11/1963 06/05/1964 |
06/05/1964 | |||
Castle | 5075 | 03/08/1938 | SRD SRD CHR SDN SRD CHR CHR 84A 83D 83C 87A 88A 82B W |
Stafford Road Stafford Road Chester West Swindon Stafford Road Chester West Chester West Stafford Road Laira Exeter Neath (Court Sart) Cardiff Canton St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
16/08/1938 15/06/1947 29/01/1949 28/03/1949 23/04/1949 18/06/1949 15/07/1949 05/1956 04/1958 18/06/1959 25/07/1961 27/01/1962 14/07/1962 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5076 | 10/08/1938 | EXE LDR BRD BRD BRD BRD 81A S 81A 82A 82A 83D 82A 81D 81A 81C W |
Exeter Landore Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road (Re-instd) Bristol Bath Road Laira Bristol Bath Road Reading (W.R.) Old Oak Common Southall Withdrawn |
25/08/1938 12/1938 02/1939 05/1945 07/1945 15/06/1947 03/1948 04/1948 07/02/1951 17/02/1951 21/04/1951 06/1951 14/07/1951 16/10/1951 29/11/1951 31/03/1960 04/05/1963 29/06/1964 16/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 5077 | 15/08/1938 | PDN TN TN 86C 86C 82C 86C 82A 87E 87F W |
Old Oak Common Taunton Taunton Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Swindon Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road Landore Llanelli Withdrawn |
23/08/1938 07/02/1939 15/06/1947 06/11/1950 02/12/1950 12/08/1952 22/09/1952 15/06/1954 07/1956 13/06/1961 24/07/1962 |
24/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 5078 | 04/05/1939 | LA PZ LA TN NA NA 86C 82A 82B 87E 87A S W |
Laira Penzance Laira Taunton Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Cardiff Canton Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Landore Neath (Court Sart) Stored Withdrawn |
15/05/1939 01/1941 01/07/1941 10/1941 01/1942 15/06/1947 24/07/1958 02/12/1958 16/09/1960 03/10/1960 13/06/1961 11/12/1961 20/11/1962 |
20/11/1962 | |||
Castle | 5079 | 11/05/1939 | PDN CDF LDR SDN LA LA NA 87E W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Landore Swindon Laira Laira Newton Abbot Landore Withdrawn |
19/05/1939 13/11/1940 03/1941 24/01/1947 03/1947 15/06/1947 11/1947 22/04/1960 06/05/1960 |
06/05/1960 | |||
Castle | 5080 | 19/05/1939 | PDN CDF SDN CDF CDF SDN CDF 87E 87F S W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Swindon Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Swindon Cardiff Canton Landore Llanelli Stored Withdrawn |
25/05/1939 08/1940 09/01/1941 20/03/1941 15/06/1947 16/08/1949 13/09/1949 12/1955 07/09/1961 01/05/1962 11/04/1963 |
11/04/1963 | |||
Castle | 5081 | 27/05/1939 | SRD PDN PDN NA PDN 85A 86C 87J 88A 88L W |
Stafford Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Worcester Cardiff Canton Fishguard Goodwick (on loan) Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
03/06/1939 17/01/1945 15/06/1947 13/01/1949 02/1949 10/12/1954 02/08/1960 09/03/1961 10/05/1961 07/09/1962 21/10/1963 |
21/10/1963 | |||
Castle | 5082 | 08/06/1939 | BRD BRD BRD 81A 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
16/06/1939 04/1944 05/1944 15/06/1947 07/11/1952 29/11/1952 02/07/1962 |
02/07/1962 | |||
Castle | 4063 | 5083 | 11/1922 | LDR NEA LDR SDN BRD BRD SDN SDN 85A W |
Landore Neath (Court Sart) Landore Swindon Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Swindon Worcester Withdrawn |
07/06/1937 02/10/1937 24/11/1937 06/12/1946 15/06/1947 29/08/1947 30/04/1948 21/07/1948 06/1956 07/01/1959 |
07/01/1959 | ||
Castle | 4064 | 5084 | 12/1922 | BRD BRD WEY BRD BRD BRD SDN SDN 82A 82C 81A 82C 81A W |
Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Swindon Bristol Bath Road Swindon Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
14/12/1935 06/1937 10/1937 11/1937 15/01/1943 02/1943 15/06/1947 21/05/1948 30/06/1948 22/08/1952 02/11/1952 15/07/1955 01/09/1955 19/10/1956 02/07/1963 |
02/07/1963 | ||
Castle | 4065 | 5085 | 12/1922 | PDN PDN 82A 82A 82B S 81D 87A 87F 82B W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Stored Reading (W.R.) (Re-instd) Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli (on loan) St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
13/07/1939 15/06/1947 10/1952 04/10/1952 16/09/1960 13/02/1962 11/08/1962 03/11/1962 09/02/1963 09/03/1963 02/1964 |
14/02/1964 | ||
Castle | 4066 | 5086 | 12/1922 | SRD 4A SRD 4A SALOP S 85A 85A 82C 85A 82C W |
Stafford Road Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stored Worcester (Re-instd) Worcester Swindon Worcester Swindon Withdrawn |
11/12/1937 02/1938 29/11/1939 03/08/1942 15/06/1947 26/09/1950 06/11/1950 02/12/1950 30/12/1954 09/02/1955 03/10/1958 10/11/1958 |
10/11/1958 | ||
Castle | 4067 | 5087 | 01/1923 | PDN PDN SDN PDN SDN PDN 87F 87A 87F W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Llanelli Neath (Court Sart) Llanelli Withdrawn |
03/12/1940 15/06/1947 10/02/1949 24/02/1949 04/04/1949 02/05/1949 11/01/1962 09/07/1962 13/08/1962 01/08/1963 |
01/08/1963 | ||
Castle | 4068 | 5088 | 01/1923 | SALOP SRD SRD 84F 84A W |
Shrewsbury Stafford Road Stafford Road Stourbridge Junction Stafford Road Withdrawn |
07/03/1939 08/03/1942 15/06/1947 29/11/1961 02/01/1962 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | ||
Castle | 4069 | 5089 | 01/1923 | LDR LDR PDN PDN SDN CDF CDF 87E 83A 83D 84A 2B W |
Landore Landore Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Landore Newton Abbot Laira Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
01/11/1939 15/06/1947 07/1948 07/08/1948 31/03/1949 14/04/1949 18/06/1949 04/1954 25/10/1955 04/1956 20/05/1958 09/09/1963 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 | ||
Castle | 4070 | 5090 | 02/1923 | LA LA 86C 85A 86C 85A 82A 81A W |
Laira Laira Cardiff Canton Worcester Cardiff Canton Worcester Bristol Bath Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
01/05/1939 15/06/1947 10/1952 11/1952 01/11/1952 27/12/1952 20/03/1958 19/10/1960 31/05/1962 |
31/05/1962 | ||
Castle | 4071 | 5091 | 02/1923 | SDN BRD WEY BRD BRD SDN SDN 84G 82C 84G 84K 83C 87G 87E 87F 88A 88L 85A 2A W |
Swindon Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Swindon Shrewsbury Swindon Shrewsbury Chester West Exeter Carmarthen Landore Llanelli Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Worcester Tyseley Withdrawn |
11/01/1936 18/12/1938 04/1939 06/1939 15/06/1947 30/06/1947 24/01/1948 05/1953 03/02/1954 04/1954 09/1955 06/1957 09/1957 12/06/1958 13/06/1961 11/09/1961 07/09/1962 13/04/1964 14/06/1964 03/10/1964 |
03/10/1964 | ||
Castle | 4072 | 5092 | 02/1923 | GLO WOS SDN WOS WOS 81A 81D 82A 86C 88L W |
Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Swindon Worcester Worcester Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
07/04/1938 07/1943 31/07/1946 11/1946 15/06/1947 27/01/1955 02/1958 20/03/1958 02/08/1960 07/09/1962 07/1963 |
29/07/1963 | ||
Castle | 5093 | 15/06/1939 | PDN CDF NPT LDR SDN LDR LDR 81A 81A 83C 81A 87F 81A W |
Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Ebbw Junction (Newport) Landore Swindon Landore Landore Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Exeter Old Oak Common Llanelli Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
25/06/1939 08/1940 02/1941 03/1941 26/12/1941 02/1942 15/06/1947 06/1952 12/07/1952 09/1953 12/1953 07/01/1961 27/01/1961 30/09/1963 |
30/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 5094 | 16/06/1939 | NA LA NA NA 82A 82A 82F 82F 82A 82A 82C 85B 82C 85B 82A 82B W |
Newton Abbot Laira Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
23/06/1939 04/06/1943 09/02/1944 15/06/1947 06/07/1950 12/08/1950 06/1951 16/06/1951 07/1951 14/07/1951 31/07/1956 21/08/1956 25/06/1958 16/10/1958 30/06/1960 16/09/1960 21/09/1962 |
21/09/1962 | |||
Castle | 5095 | 23/06/1939 | LA LA 81A 81A 86C 84G 86C 84G W |
Laira Laira Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
06/07/1939 15/06/1947 31/01/1951 16/02/1951 18/01/1957 12/06/1958 24/06/1958 08/09/1960 16/08/1962 |
16/08/1962 | |||
Castle | 5096 | 29/06/1939 | BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD BRD NPT BRD 83B 88A 88L 85A W |
Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road Ebbw Junction (Newport) Bristol Bath Road Taunton Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Worcester Withdrawn |
08/07/1939 05/1940 06/1940 07/1942 08/1942 02/05/1947 15/06/1947 18/07/1947 12/1947 12/1947 22/11/1949 01/1950 13/09/1960 20/09/1961 07/09/1962 13/04/1964 15/06/1964 |
15/06/1964 | |||
Castle | 5097 | 05/07/1939 | 4A SRD 4A SALOP 82A 88A 88L W |
Shrewsbury Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
17/07/1939 01/02/1941 03/1941 15/06/1947 02/06/1959 16/09/1960 07/09/1962 08/03/1963 |
08/03/1963 | |||
Castle | 5098 | 16/05/1946 | SRD EXE EXE PZ PZ LA LA SDN LA 83A 87G 87F 81A 81D W |
Stafford Road Exeter Exeter Penzance Penzance Laira Laira Swindon Laira Newton Abbot Carmarthen Llanelli Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
05/1946 09/1946 15/06/1947 10/1948 30/10/1948 11/03/1949 21/05/1949 30/05/1949 01/07/1949 27/01/1962 11/08/1962 09/02/1963 06/05/1963 13/04/1964 15/06/1964 |
15/06/1964 | |||
Castle | 5099 | 25/05/1946 | PDN SDN PDN PDN CDF CDF 81A 82A 86C 85A 85B S W |
Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Bristol Bath Road Cardiff Canton Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Stored Withdrawn |
25/05/1946 24/02/1947 05/1947 15/06/1947 05/1948 31/05/1948 20/11/1956 12/06/1958 26/08/1958 20/02/1962 06/10/1962 12/11/1962 09/02/1963 |
11/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 7000 | 25/05/1946 | NA NA 85B 85A 85B 85A W |
Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Worcester Withdrawn |
25/05/1946 15/06/1947 15/05/1959 14/08/1962 30/08/1962 22/03/1963 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 7001 | 31/05/1946 | CDF CDF PDN PDN 83D 81A 84A 2B W |
Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Laira Old Oak Common Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
31/05/1946 15/06/1947 09/04/1948 31/05/1948 11/07/1953 13/07/1953 18/08/1961 09/09/1963 17/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 7002 | 06/06/1946 | LDR LDR 87G 87E 85A W |
Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Worcester Withdrawn |
06/06/1946 15/06/1947 10/1956 12/06/1958 26/11/1959 10/03/1964 |
10/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 7003 | 13/06/1946 | LDR LDR 82A 85B 82B 85B W |
Landore Landore Bristol Bath Road Gloucester Horton Road St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
13/06/1946 15/06/1947 02/12/1958 16/06/1960 13/04/1964 22/06/1964 10/08/1964 |
10/08/1964 | |||
Castle | 7004 | 19/06/1946 | GLO GLO CDF CDF PDN PDN 85A 81D W |
Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Worcester Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
19/06/1946 15/06/1947 30/09/1948 30/10/1948 01/1949 29/01/1949 05/07/1960 29/09/1963 15/01/1964 |
15/01/1964 | |||
Castle | 7005 | 25/06/1946 | WOS WOS 81C W |
Worcester Worcester Southall Withdrawn |
25/06/1946 15/06/1947 08/1964 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 7006 | 28/06/1946 | 4A SALOP CDF CDF GLO GLO SDN 85B 81A 83D 86C 85A 81A W |
Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Gloucester Horton Road Gloucester Horton Road Swindon Gloucester Horton Road Old Oak Common Laira Cardiff Canton Worcester Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
28/06/1946 15/06/1947 06/1948 30/06/1948 25/08/1948 14/10/1948 20/01/1950 28/05/1951 26/02/1958 03/1958 22/09/1959 05/07/1960 19/03/1962 16/12/1963 |
16/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 7007 | 01/07/1946 | SRD SRD PDN PDN WOS 85A W |
Stafford Road Stafford Road Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Worcester Worcester Withdrawn |
01/07/1946 15/06/1947 09/1948 04/09/1948 02/1950 25/02/1950 09/02/1963 |
18/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 7008 | 12/05/1948 | OXF OXF 82C 81F 81A W |
Oxford Oxford Swindon Oxford Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/1948 30/06/1948 10/11/1954 01/1955 09/03/1963 09/1964 |
28/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 7009 | 27/05/1948 | LDR 87G 81A 85A 85B 81A W |
Landore Carmarthen Old Oak Common Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
07/1948 27/06/1961 05/07/1961 24/02/1962 03/11/1962 17/12/1962 22/03/1963 |
22/03/1963 | |||
Castle | 7010 | 09/06/1948 | OXF OXF 81A 81A 81D W |
Oxford Oxford Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
07/1948 10/07/1948 10/1952 29/11/1952 27/01/1964 10/03/1964 |
10/03/1964 | |||
Castle | 7011 | 17/06/1948 | BRD 84C 86C 85A 81D 85A 2B W |
Bristol Bath Road Banbury Cardiff Canton Worcester Reading (W.R.) Worcester Oxley Withdrawn |
07/1948 21/10/1959 04/04/1960 23/12/1960 22/11/1962 27/01/1964 14/06/1964 13/02/1965 |
13/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 7012 | 25/06/1948 | LDR 82C 87E 87G 81A 84A 2B W |
Landore Swindon Landore Carmarthen Old Oak Common Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
08/1948 14/04/1950 12/05/1950 22/09/1959 31/10/1960 13/06/1961 09/09/1963 11/1964 |
14/11/1964 | |||
Castle | 7013 | 4082 | 02/07/1948 | PDN 85A 81A 85A S 81A 85B W |
Old Oak Common Worcester Old Oak Common Worcester Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
07/1948 25/04/1952 09/1957 06/05/1960 08/1963 28/09/1963 24/08/1964 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | ||
Castle | 7014 | 16/07/1948 | SDN BRD 87E 82B 81A 84A 2B 2A W |
Swindon Bristol Bath Road Landore St Philips Marsh Old Oak Common Stafford Road Oxley Tyseley Withdrawn |
21/07/1948 08/1948 16/09/1960 03/10/1960 08/08/1961 15/06/1962 09/09/1963 27/06/1964 02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 7015 | 29/07/1948 | SDN SDN SDN 82A 84A 84G S 81A W |
Swindon Swindon Swindon Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Shrewsbury Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
09/1948 04/09/1948 26/03/1949 11/1955 28/05/1959 04/11/1959 07/09/1962 06/10/1962 05/04/1963 |
05/04/1963 | |||
Castle | 7016 | 10/08/1948 | CDF 82C 86C 87E 87G 87F 88A 88L W |
Cardiff Canton Swindon Cardiff Canton Landore Carmarthen Llanelli Cardiff Canton Cardiff East Dock Withdrawn |
09/1948 08/12/1950 15/12/1950 20/09/1956 22/09/1959 05/07/1961 11/09/1961 07/09/1962 26/11/1962 |
26/11/1962 | |||
Castle | 7017 | 24/08/1948 | SDN PDN CDF CDF 81A S W |
Swindon Old Oak Common Cardiff Canton Cardiff Canton Old Oak Common Stored Withdrawn |
09/1948 11/1948 12/1948 29/01/1949 09/07/1954 12/11/1962 09/02/1963 |
11/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 7018 | 24/05/1949 | LDR 82C 82A 82B 81A W |
Landore Swindon Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
06/1949 15/08/1955 26/05/1956 16/09/1960 09/10/1961 17/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 7019 | 27/05/1949 | BRD 84A 2B W |
Bristol Bath Road Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
06/1949 09/11/1961 09/09/1963 02/1965 |
13/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 7020 | 31/05/1949 | CDF 82C 81A S 81A 81C W |
Cardiff Canton Swindon Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Southall Withdrawn |
06/1949 08/11/1956 21/12/1956 13/02/1962 28/12/1963 13/04/1964 09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 7021 | 08/06/1949 | LDR 87G 87G 87E 87G 87E 87E 87G 87E 87F W |
Landore Carmarthen Carmarthen Landore Carmarthen Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Llanelli Withdrawn |
06/1949 06/1950 12/08/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 31/01/1951 02/1951 11/1957 18/06/1959 13/06/1961 09/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 7022 | 15/06/1949 | CDF 83D 86C 85A 85B W |
Cardiff Canton Laira Hereford Worcester Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
07/1949 23/01/1958 30/11/1963 13/04/1964 05/10/1964 25/06/1965 |
25/06/1965 | |||
Castle | 7023 | 24/06/1949 | CDF 85A 2B W |
Cardiff Canton Worcester Oxley Withdrawn |
07/1949 02/08/1960 14/06/1964 13/02/1965 |
13/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 7024 | 30/06/1949 | PDN 84A 2B W |
Old Oak Common Stafford Road Oxley Withdrawn |
07/1949 18/08/1961 09/09/1963 02/1965 |
13/02/1965 | |||
Castle | 7025 | 04/08/1949 | PDN 84G 85A W |
Old Oak Common Shrewsbury Worcester Withdrawn |
08/1949 02/08/1960 06/10/1962 07/09/1964 |
07/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 7026 | 16/08/1949 | n/a SRD SRD 85B 84A 2B 2A W |
Unallocated Stafford Road Stafford Road Gloucester Horton Road Stafford Road Oxley Tyseley Withdrawn |
08/1949 11/1949 03/12/1949 07/09/1962 12/11/1962 09/09/1963 27/06/1964 10/1964 |
17/10/1964 | |||
Castle | 7027 | 02/09/1949 | S LA LA 81A 82C 81A 85A 81D W |
Stored Laira Laira Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Worcester Reading (W.R.) Withdrawn |
02/09/1949 08/10/1949 11/1949 31/01/1951 17/10/1951 09/11/1951 25/04/1960 31/08/1963 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 7028 | 19/05/1950 | 87E 87E 87E 87G 87E 87F S 87F 87F W |
Landore Landore Landore Carmarthen Landore Llanelli Stored Llanelli (Re-instd) Llanelli (on loan) (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
20/05/1950 06/1950 17/06/1950 10/1956 06/1957 31/10/1961 01/05/1962 09/07/1962 09/09/1963 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |||
Castle | 7029 | 25/05/1950 | 83A 83A 81A 85B W |
Newton Abbot Newton Abbot Old Oak Common Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
05/1950 17/06/1950 02/07/1962 05/10/1964 12/1965 |
31/12/1965 | |||
Castle | 7030 | 05/06/1950 | 81A 81A S 81A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
05/06/1950 17/06/1950 13/02/1962 01/05/1962 09/02/1963 |
01/02/1963 | |||
Castle | 7031 | 20/06/1950 | 83D 83D 83B 83D 82C 85A W |
Laira Laira Taunton Laira Swindon Worcester Withdrawn |
06/1950 15/07/1950 31/01/1957 24/03/1959 05/01/1960 24/03/1962 16/07/1963 |
16/07/1963 | |||
Castle | 7032 | 23/06/1950 | 82C 81A 81A W |
Swindon Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
05/07/1950 10/07/1950 15/07/1950 09/1964 |
28/09/1964 | |||
Castle | 7033 | 07/07/1950 | 81A 81A 82C 81A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Swindon Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
07/1950 15/07/1950 27/03/1952 28/04/1952 09/02/1963 |
07/01/1963 | |||
Castle | 7034 | 01/08/1950 | 82A 82A 82B 85B W |
Bristol Bath Road Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Gloucester Horton Road Withdrawn |
08/1950 12/08/1950 16/09/1960 11/12/1961 06/1965 |
25/06/1965 | |||
Castle | 7035 | 09/08/1950 | 84G 84G 85B 82A 82C 82A 87E 85B 81F 81A W |
Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Gloucester Horton Road Bristol Bath Road Swindon Bristol Bath Road Landore Gloucester Horton Road Oxford Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
12/08/1950 09/1950 09/1953 01/10/1956 19/11/1956 01/12/1956 16/02/1959 29/02/1960 12/11/1962 04/03/1963 01/06/1964 |
01/06/1964 | |||
Castle | 7036 | 17/08/1950 | 81A 81A 84A S 81A W |
Old Oak Common Old Oak Common Stafford Road Stored Old Oak Common (Re-instd) Withdrawn |
09/1950 09/09/1950 14/07/1962 07/09/1962 06/10/1962 09/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 | |||
Castle | 7037 | 28/08/1950 | 82C 82C 82C 82C 81A W |
Swindon Swindon (on loan) Swindon (Re-instd) Swindon Old Oak Common Withdrawn |
08/1950 09/09/1950 08/11/1950 02/12/1950 06/09/1960 04/03/1963 |
01/03/1963 |