GWR Collett "4073" Class 4-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tue 19/12/1933 | 4085 | CARM | This locomotive was working a Paddington - Fishguard express when it struck and killed a man on the down line near Swindon. The man was none other than George Jackson Churchward who had been checking a loose sleeper. | |||
Sat 19/02/1938 | 5084 | BRD | Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. - In the shop. | RO 3/1938 | ||
Tue 20/08/1940 | 5072 | NA | Damaged in German attack on Newton Abbot | |||
Wed 25/07/1951 | 5015 | 84A | Involved in a collision - details unknown | |||
Sun 27/05/1956 | 7027 | 81A | Paddington-Bristol express | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Thu 08/08/1957 | 4090 | 81A | Down Bristolian with 10 coaches in 99 minutes | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Mon 28/04/1958 | 7018 | 82A | Worked the up Bristolian - passed Little Somerford at 100mph, arrived at Paddington in 94 minutes | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Wed 06/08/1958 | 5043 | 81A | Seen at Paddington having arrived with the Bristolian | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Sun 12/11/1961 | 4075, 4083, 4092, 4095, 5039, 5071, 5073, 5078, 5087, 5096, 5098, 7002, 7013, 7015, 7021, 7022, 7034 |
Wdn, 88A, 81F, 83D, 87G, 85B, 88A, 87A, 81A, 88A, 83D, 85A, 81A, 89A, 87F, 83D, 82B |
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 04/03/1962 | 4082, 4093, 5026, 5043, 5056, 5069, 7001, 7002, 7003, 7004, 7006, 7026, 7027, 7037 |
85A, 87A, 84A, 81A, 81A, Wdn, 84A, 85A, 85B, 85A, 85A, 84A, 85A, 81A |
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Dump. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. |
|||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 5054 | Wdn | Swindon Works visit: In 'C' shop | RO 1/1965 | ||
Sat 27/11/1965 | 7029 | 85B | Farewell to Western Region steam, Paddington - Bristol, Gloucester and Swindon | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | 7029 | Wdn | Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited | RO 9/1969 | ||
Sat 26/07/1969 | 7029 | Wdn | D1643 hauled steam locomotives 7029 'Clun Castle', 5428 'Eric Treacy' and 5593 'Kolhapur' away from Allerton depot at 18:45 | RO 9/1969 |