GWR Collett "4900" Class 4-6-0
Class | Number | Built | Name | Name Date | Notes | Removed | Date Withdrawn |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hall | 4901 | 12/1928 | ADDERLEY HALL | 12/1928 | 30/09/1960 | 16/09/1960 | |
Hall | 4902 | 12/1928 | ALDENHAM HALL | 12/1928 | 30/09/1963 | 17/09/1963 | |
Hall | 4903 | 12/1928 | ASTLEY HALL | 12/1928 | 31/10/1964 | 09/10/1964 | |
Hall | 4904 | 12/1928 | BINNEGAR HALL | 12/1928 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4905 | 12/1928 | BARTON HALL | 12/1928 | 30/11/1963 | 13/11/1963 | |
Hall | 4906 | 01/1929 | BRADFIELD HALL | 01/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4907 | 01/1929 | BROUGHTON HALL | 01/1929 | 31/08/1963 | 01/08/1963 | |
Hall | 4908 | 01/1929 | BROOME HALL | 01/1929 | 31/10/1963 | 22/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4909 | 01/1929 | BLAKESLEY HALL | 01/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4910 | 01/1929 | BLAISDON HALL | 01/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4911 | 02/1929 | BOWDEN HALL | 02/1929 | 30/06/1941 | 06/1941 | |
Hall | 4912 | 02/1929 | BERRINGTON HALL | 02/1929 | 30/08/1962 | 24/08/1962 | |
Hall | 4913 | 02/1929 | BAGLAN HALL | 02/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4914 | 02/1929 | CRANMORE HALL | 02/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4915 | 02/1929 | CONDOVER HALL | 02/1929 | 28/02/1963 | 26/02/1963 | |
Hall | 4916 | 02/1929 | CRUMLIN HALL | 02/1929 | 31/08/1964 | 10/08/1964 | |
Hall | 4917 | 03/1929 | CROSSWOOD HALL | 03/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4918 | 03/1929 | DARTINGTON HALL | 03/1929 | 30/06/1963 | 24/06/1963 | |
Hall | 4919 | 03/1929 | DONNINGTON HALL | 03/1929 | 31/10/1964 | 09/10/1964 | |
Hall | 4920 | 03/1929 | DUMBLETON HALL | 03/1929 | 31/12/1965 | 03/12/1965 | |
Hall | 4921 | 04/1929 | EATON HALL | 04/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4922 | 04/1929 | ENVILLE HALL | 04/1929 | 31/07/1963 | 04/07/1963 | |
Hall | 4923 | 04/1929 | EVENLEY HALL | 04/1929 | 31/05/1964 | 30/05/1964 | |
Hall | 4924 | 05/1929 | EYDON HALL | 05/1929 | 31/10/1963 | 03/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4925 | 05/1929 | EYNSHAM HALL | 05/1929 | 31/08/1962 | 07/08/1962 | |
Hall | 4926 | 05/1929 | FARLEIGH HALL | 05/1929 | 30/09/1961 | 25/09/1961 | |
Hall | 4927 | 05/1929 | FARNBOROUGH HALL | 05/1929 | 30/09/1963 | 23/09/1963 | |
Hall | 4928 | 05/1929 | GATACRE HALL | 05/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4929 | 05/1929 | GOYTREY HALL | 05/1929 | 30/03/1965 | 19/03/1965 | |
Hall | 4930 | 05/1929 | HAGLEY HALL | 05/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4931 | 05/1929 | HANBURY HALL | 05/1929 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 4932 | 06/1929 | HATHERTON HALL | 06/1929 | 30/11/1964 | 06/11/1964 | |
Hall | 4933 | 06/1929 | HIMLEY HALL | 06/1929 | 31/08/1964 | 15/08/1964 | |
Hall | 4934 | 06/1929 | HINDLIP HALL | 06/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4935 | 06/1929 | KETLEY HALL | 06/1929 | 31/03/1963 | 22/03/1963 | |
Hall | 4936 | 06/1929 | KINLET HALL | 06/1929 | 31/01/1964 | 15/01/1964 | |
Hall | 4937 | 06/1929 | LANELAY HALL | 06/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4938 | 06/1929 | LIDDINGTON HALL | 06/1929 | 30/11/1962 | 26/11/1962 | |
Hall | 4939 | 07/1929 | LITTLETON HALL | 07/1929 | 28/02/1963 | 11/02/1963 | |
Hall | 4940 | 07/1929 | LUDFORD HALL | 07/1929 | 30/11/1959 | 09/11/1959 | |
Hall | 4941 | 07/1929 | LLANGEDWYN HALL | 07/1929 | 31/10/1962 | 22/10/1962 | |
Hall | 4942 | 07/1929 | MAINDY HALL | 07/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4943 | 07/1929 | MARRINGTON HALL | 07/1929 | 31/12/1963 | 16/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4944 | 07/1929 | MIDDLETON HALL | 07/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4945 | 08/1929 | MILLIGAN HALL | 08/1929 | 30/11/1961 | 03/11/1961 | |
Hall | 4946 | 08/1929 | MOSELEY HALL | 08/1929 | 30/06/1963 | 24/06/1963 | |
Hall | 4947 | 08/1929 | NANHORAN HALL | 08/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4948 | 08/1929 | NORTHWICK HALL | 08/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4949 | 08/1929 | PACKWOOD HALL | 08/1929 | 30/09/1964 | 01/09/1964 | |
Hall | 4950 | 08/1929 | PATSHULL HALL | 08/1929 | 31/05/1964 | 06/05/1964 | |
Hall | 4951 | 07/1929 | PENDEFORD HALL | 07/1929 | 30/06/1964 | 25/06/1964 | |
Hall | 4952 | 08/1929 | PEPLOW HALL | 08/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4953 | 08/1929 | PITCHFORD HALL | 08/1929 | 31/05/1963 | 02/05/1963 | |
Hall | 4954 | 08/1929 | PLAISH HALL | 08/1929 | 30/11/1964 | 14/11/1964 | |
Hall | 4955 | 08/1929 | PLASPOWER HALL | 08/1929 | 31/10/1963 | 21/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4956 | 09/1929 | PLOWDEN HALL | 09/1929 | 31/07/1963 | 04/07/1963 | |
Hall | 4957 | 09/1929 | POSTLIP HALL | 09/1929 | 31/03/1962 | 30/03/1962 | |
Hall | 4958 | 09/1929 | PRIORY HALL | 09/1929 | 30/09/1964 | 21/09/1964 | |
Hall | 4959 | 09/1929 | PURLEY HALL | 09/1929 | 31/12/1964 | 26/12/1964 | |
Hall | 4960 | 09/1929 | PYLE HALL | 09/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4961 | 11/1929 | PYRLAND HALL | 11/1929 | 30/11/1962 | 05/11/1962 | |
Hall | 4962 | 11/1929 | RAGLEY HALL | 11/1929 | 31/10/1965 | 01/10/1965 | |
Hall | 4963 | 11/1929 | RIGNALL HALL | 11/1929 | 30/06/1962 | 05/06/1962 | |
Hall | 4964 | 11/1929 | RODWELL HALL | 11/1929 | 31/10/1963 | 15/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4965 | 11/1929 | ROOD ASHTON HALL | 11/1929 | 31/03/1962 | 26/03/1962 | |
Hall | 4966 | 11/1929 | SHAKENHURST HALL | 11/1929 | 30/11/1963 | 01/11/1963 | |
Hall | 4967 | 12/1929 | SHIRENEWTON HALL | 12/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 13/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4968 | 12/1929 | SHOTTON HALL | 12/1929 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 4969 | 12/1929 | SHRUGBOROUGH HALL | 12/1929 | 30/09/1962 | 13/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4970 | 12/1929 | SKETTY HALL | 12/1929 | 31/07/1963 | 29/07/1963 | |
Hall | 4971 | 01/1930 | STANWAY HALL | 01/1930 | 31/08/1962 | 13/08/1962 | |
Hall | 4972 | 01/1930 | SAINT BRIDES HALL | 01/1930 | 29/02/1964 | 14/02/1964 | |
Hall | 4973 | 01/1930 | SWEENEY HALL | 01/1930 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 4974 | 01/1930 | TALGARTH HALL | 01/1930 | 30/04/1962 | 13/04/1962 | |
Hall | 4975 | 01/1930 | UMBERSLADE HALL | 01/1930 | 30/09/1963 | 30/09/1963 | |
Hall | 4976 | 01/1930 | WARFIELD HALL | 01/1930 | 31/05/1964 | 06/05/1964 | |
Hall | 4977 | 01/1930 | WATCOMBE HALL | 01/1930 | 31/05/1962 | 10/05/1962 | |
Hall | 4978 | 02/1930 | WESTWOOD HALL | 02/1930 | 30/09/1964 | 21/09/1964 | |
Hall | 4979 | 02/1930 | WOOTON HALL | 02/1930 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4980 | 02/1930 | WROTTESLEY HALL | 02/1930 | 31/07/1963 | 04/07/1963 | |
Hall | 4981 | 12/1930 | ABBERLEY HALL | 12/1930 | 31/10/1963 | 03/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4982 | 01/1931 | ACTON HALL | 01/1931 | 31/05/1962 | 11/05/1962 | |
Hall | 4983 | 01/1931 | ALBERT HALL | 01/1931 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4984 | 01/1931 | ALBRIGHTON HALL | 01/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 4985 | 01/1931 | ALLESLEY HALL | 01/1931 | 30/09/1964 | 28/09/1964 | |
Hall | 4986 | 01/1931 | ASTON HALL | 01/1931 | 31/05/1962 | 11/05/1962 | |
Hall | 4987 | 01/1931 | BROCKLEY HALL | 01/1931 | 30/04/1962 | 09/04/1962 | |
Hall | 4988 | 01/1931 | BULWELL HALL | 01/1931 | 29/02/1964 | 14/02/1964 | |
Hall | 4989 | 02/1931 | CHERWELL HALL | 02/1931 | 30/11/1964 | 06/11/1964 | |
Hall | 4990 | 02/1931 | CLIFTON HALL | 02/1931 | 30/04/1962 | 05/04/1962 | |
Hall | 4991 | 02/1931 | COBHAM HALL | 02/1931 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 4992 | 02/1931 | CROSBY HALL | 02/1931 | 30/04/1965 | 30/04/1965 | |
Hall | 4993 | 02/1931 | DALTON HALL | 02/1931 | 28/02/1965 | 06/02/1965 | |
Hall | 4994 | 02/1931 | DOWNTON HALL | 02/1931 | 31/03/1963 | 15/03/1963 | |
Hall | 4995 | 02/1931 | EASTON HALL | 02/1931 | 30/06/1962 | 08/06/1962 | |
Hall | 4996 | 03/1931 | EDEN HALL | 03/1931 | 30/09/1963 | 30/09/1963 | |
Hall | 4997 | 03/1931 | ELTON HALL | 03/1931 | 31/10/1961 | 30/10/1961 | |
Hall | 4998 | 03/1931 | EYTON HALL | 03/1931 | 31/10/1963 | 22/10/1963 | |
Hall | 4999 | 03/1931 | GOPSAL HALL | 03/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5900 | 03/1931 | HINDERTON HALL | 03/1931 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 5901 | 05/1931 | HAZEL HALL | 05/1931 | 30/06/1964 | 25/06/1964 | |
Hall | 5902 | 05/1931 | HOWICK HALL | 05/1931 | 30/11/1962 | 13/11/1962 | |
Hall | 5903 | 05/1931 | KEELE HALL | 05/1931 | 30/09/1963 | 10/09/1963 | |
Hall | 5904 | 05/1931 | KELHAM HALL | 05/1931 | 30/11/1963 | 13/11/1963 | |
Hall | 5905 | 05/1931 | KNOWSLEY HALL | 05/1931 | 31/07/1963 | 29/07/1963 | |
Hall | 5906 | 05/1931 | LAWTON HALL | 05/1931 | 31/05/1962 | 25/05/1962 | |
Hall | 5907 | 05/1931 | MARBLE HALL | 05/1931 | 30/11/1961 | 03/11/1961 | |
Hall | 5908 | 06/1931 | MORETON HALL | 06/1931 | 30/07/1963 | 29/07/1963 | |
Hall | 5909 | 06/1931 | NEWTON HALL | 06/1931 | 30/07/1962 | 30/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5910 | 06/1931 | PARK HALL | 06/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5911 | 06/1931 | PRESTON HALL | 06/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5912 | 06/1931 | QUEEN'S HALL | 06/1931 | 31/12/1962 | 18/12/1962 | |
Hall | 5913 | 06/1931 | RUSHTON HALL | 06/1931 | 31/05/1962 | 14/05/1962 | |
Hall | 5914 | 07/1931 | RIPON HALL | 07/1931 | 31/01/1964 | 22/01/1964 | |
Hall | 5915 | 07/1931 | TRENTHAM HALL | 07/1931 | 31/01/1960 | 13/01/1960 | |
Hall | 5916 | 07/1931 | TRINITY HALL | 07/1931 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5917 | 07/1931 | WESTMINSTER HALL | 07/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5918 | 07/1931 | WALTON HALL | 07/1931 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5919 | 07/1931 | WORSLEY HALL | 07/1931 | 31/08/1963 | 26/08/1963 | |
Hall | 5920 | 08/1931 | WYCLIFFE HALL | 08/1931 | 31/01/1962 | 18/01/1962 | |
Hall | 5921 | 11/05/1933 | BINGLEY HALL | 11/05/1933 | 31/01/1962 | 08/01/1962 | |
Hall | 5922 | 16/05/1933 | CAXTON HALL | 16/05/1933 | 31/01/1964 | 06/01/1964 | |
Hall | 5923 | 22/05/1933 | COLSTON HALL | 22/05/1933 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 5924 | 27/05/1933 | DINTON HALL | 27/05/1933 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 5925 | 27/05/1933 | EASTCOTE HALL | 27/05/1933 | 31/10/1962 | 15/10/1962 | |
Hall | 5926 | 01/06/1933 | GROTRIAN HALL | 01/06/1933 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5927 | 02/06/1933 | GUILD HALL | 02/06/1933 | 31/10/1964 | 24/10/1964 | |
Hall | 5928 | 08/06/1933 | HADDON HALL | 08/06/1933 | 31/05/1962 | 11/05/1962 | |
Hall | 5929 | 12/06/1933 | HANHAM HALL | 12/06/1933 | 31/10/1963 | 28/10/1963 | |
Hall | 5930 | 14/06/1933 | HANNINGTON HALL | 14/06/1933 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5931 | 21/06/1933 | HATHERLEY HALL | 21/06/1933 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5932 | 23/06/1933 | HAYDON HALL | 23/06/1933 | 31/10/1965 | 26/10/1965 | |
Hall | 5933 | 28/06/1933 | KINGSWY HALL | 28/06/1933 | 31/08/1965 | 06/08/1965 | |
Hall | 5934 | 28/06/1933 | KNELLER HALL | 28/06/1933 | 31/05/1964 | 06/05/1964 | |
Hall | 5935 | 05/07/1933 | NORTON HALL | 05/07/1933 | 31/05/1962 | 15/05/1962 | |
Hall | 5936 | 07/07/1933 | OAKLEY HALL | 07/07/1933 | 31/01/1965 | 15/01/1965 | |
Hall | 5937 | 10/07/1933 | STANFORD HALL | 10/07/1933 | 30/11/1963 | 13/11/1963 | |
Hall | 5938 | 13/07/1933 | STANLEY HALL | 13/07/1933 | 31/05/1963 | 03/05/1963 | |
Hall | 5939 | 31/07/1933 | TANGLEY HALL | 31/07/1933 | 31/10/1964 | 23/10/1964 | |
Hall | 5940 | 01/08/1933 | WHITBOURNE HALL | 01/08/1933 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5941 | 20/02/1935 | CAMPION HALL | 20/02/1935 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5942 | 28/02/1935 | DOLDOWLOD HALL | 28/02/1935 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 5943 | 05/03/1935 | ELMDON HALL | 05/03/1935 | 30/06/1963 | 24/06/1963 | |
Hall | 5944 | 12/03/1935 | ICKENHAM HALL | 12/03/1935 | 30/04/1963 | 08/04/1963 | |
Hall | 5945 | 21/03/1935 | LECKHAMPTON HALL | 21/03/1935 | 30/04/1963 | 08/04/1963 | |
Hall | 5946 | 20/03/1935 | MARWELL HALL | 20/03/1935 | 31/07/1962 | 10/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5947 | 25/03/1935 | SAINT BENET'S HALL | 25/03/1935 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5948 | 28/05/1935 | SIDDINGTON HALL | 28/05/1935 | 31/08/1963 | 26/08/1963 | |
Hall | 5949 | 03/04/1935 | TREMATON HALL | 03/04/1935 | 31/05/1961 | 30/05/1961 | |
Hall | 5950 | 11/04/1935 | WARDLEY HALL | 11/04/1935 | 30/11/1961 | 17/11/1961 | |
Hall | 5951 | 05/12/1935 | CLYFFE HALL | 05/12/1935 | 30/04/1964 | 20/04/1964 | |
Hall | 5952 | 07/12/1935 | COGAN HALL | 07/12/1935 | 30/06/1964 | 15/06/1964 | |
Hall | 5953 | 11/12/1935 | DUNLEY HALL | 11/12/1935 | 31/10/1962 | 15/10/1962 | |
Hall | 5954 | 12/12/1935 | FAENDRE HALL | 12/12/1935 | 31/10/1963 | 10/10/1963 | |
Hall | 5955 | 14/12/1935 | GARTH HALL | 14/12/1935 | 30/04/1965 | 30/04/1965 | |
Hall | 5956 | 18/12/1935 | HORSLEY HALL | 18/12/1935 | 31/03/1963 | 15/03/1963 | |
Hall | 5957 | 20/12/1935 | HUTTON HALL | 20/12/1935 | 31/07/1964 | 06/07/1964 | |
Hall | 5958 | 01/01/1936 | KNOLTON HALL | 01/01/1936 | 31/03/1964 | 10/03/1964 | |
Hall | 5959 | 03/01/1936 | MAWLEY HALL | 03/01/1936 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5960 | 09/01/1936 | SAINT EDMUND HALL | 09/01/1936 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5961 | 26/06/1936 | TOYNBEE HALL | 26/06/1936 | 30/08/1965 | 06/08/1965 | |
Hall | 5962 | 02/07/1936 | WANTAGE HALL | 02/07/1936 | 30/11/1964 | 27/11/1964 | |
Hall | 5963 | 07/07/1936 | WIMPOLE HALL | 07/07/1936 | 30/06/1964 | 08/06/1964 | |
Hall | 5964 | 23/07/1936 | WOLSWLEY HALL | 23/07/1936 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5965 | 01/08/1936 | WOOLAS HALL | 01/08/1936 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5966 | 20/03/1937 | ASHFORD HALL | 20/03/1937 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5967 | 23/03/1937 | BICKMARSH HALL | 23/03/1937 | 30/06/1964 | 01/06/1964 | |
Hall | 5968 | 25/03/1937 | CORY HALL | 25/03/1937 | 30/09/1962 | 27/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5969 | 02/04/1937 | HONINGTON HALL | 02/04/1937 | 31/08/1962 | 29/08/1962 | |
Hall | 5970 | 07/04/1937 | HENGRAVE HALL | 07/04/1937 | 30/11/1963 | 11/11/1963 | |
Hall | 5971 | 17/04/1937 | MEREVALE HALL | 17/04/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 5972 | 22/04/1937 | OLTON HALL | 22/04/1937 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 5973 | 01/05/1937 | ROLLESTON HALL | 01/05/1937 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5974 | 30/04/1937 | WALLSWORTH HALL | 30/04/1937 | 31/12/1964 | 26/12/1964 | |
Hall | 5975 | 26/05/1937 | WINSLOW HALL | 26/05/1937 | 31/07/1964 | 24/07/1964 | |
Hall | 5976 | 01/09/1938 | ASHWICKE HALL | 01/09/1938 | 31/07/1964 | 24/07/1964 | |
Hall | 5977 | 02/09/1938 | BECKFORD HALL | 02/09/1938 | 31/08/1963 | 19/08/1963 | |
Hall | 5978 | 05/09/1938 | BODINNICK HALL | 05/09/1938 | 31/10/1963 | 21/10/1963 | |
Hall | 5979 | 08/09/1938 | CRUCKTON HALL | 08/09/1938 | 30/11/1964 | 06/11/1964 | |
Hall | 5980 | 18/09/1938 | DINGLEY HALL | 18/09/1938 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5981 | 03/10/1938 | FRENSHAM HALL | 03/10/1938 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5982 | 05/10/1938 | HARRINGTON HALL | 05/10/1938 | 30/09/1962 | 01/09/1962 | |
Hall | 5983 | 12/10/1938 | HENLEY HALL | 12/10/1938 | 30/04/1965 | 10/04/1965 | |
Hall | 5984 | 14/10/1938 | LINDEN HALL | 14/10/1938 | 31/01/1965 | 15/01/1965 | |
Hall | 5985 | 18/10/1938 | MOSTYN HALL | 18/10/1938 | 30/09/1963 | 13/09/1963 | |
Hall | 5986 | 21/11/1939 | ARBURY HALL | 21/11/1939 | 30/09/1963 | 10/09/1963 | |
Hall | 5987 | 23/11/1939 | BROCKET HALL | 23/11/1939 | 31/01/1964 | 15/01/1964 | |
Hall | 5988 | 28/11/1939 | BOSTOCK HALL | 28/11/1939 | 31/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | |
Hall | 5989 | 05/12/1939 | CRANSLEY HALL | 05/12/1939 | 31/07/1962 | 13/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5990 | 06/12/1939 | DORFORD HALL | 06/12/1939 | 31/01/1965 | 16/01/1965 | |
Hall | 5991 | 14/12/1939 | GRESHAM HALL | 14/12/1939 | 31/07/1964 | 18/07/1964 | |
Hall | 5992 | 18/12/1939 | HORTON HALL | 18/12/1939 | 31/08/1965 | 06/08/1965 | |
Hall | 5993 | 22/12/1939 | KIRBY HALL | 22/12/1939 | 31/05/1963 | 13/05/1963 | |
Hall | 5994 | 29/12/1939 | ROYDON HALL | 29/12/1939 | 31/03/1963 | 07/03/1963 | |
Hall | 5995 | 04/01/1940 | WICK HALL | 04/01/1940 | 30/04/1963 | 25/04/1963 | |
Hall | 5996 | 03/06/1940 | MYTTON HALL | 03/06/1940 | 31/08/1962 | 27/08/1962 | |
Hall | 5997 | 07/06/1940 | SPARKFORD HALL | 07/06/1940 | 31/07/1962 | 24/07/1962 | |
Hall | 5998 | 12/06/1940 | TREVOR HALL | 12/06/1940 | 31/03/1964 | 17/03/1964 | |
Hall | 5999 | 14/06/1940 | WOLLATON HALL | 14/06/1940 | 30/09/1962 | 21/09/1962 | |
Hall | 6900 | 22/06/1940 | ABNEY HALL | 22/06/1940 | 31/10/1964 | 23/10/1964 | |
Hall | 6901 | 01/07/1940 | ARLEY HALL | 01/07/1940 | 30/06/1964 | 15/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6902 | 04/07/1940 | BUTLERS HALL | 04/07/1940 | 31/05/1961 | 01/05/1961 | |
Hall | 6903 | 10/07/1940 | BELMONT HALL | 10/07/1940 | 30/09/1965 | 18/09/1965 | |
Hall | 6904 | 13/07/1940 | CHARFIELD HALL | 13/07/1940 | 31/01/1965 | 23/01/1965 | |
Hall | 6905 | 20/07/1940 | CLAUGHTON HALL | 20/07/1940 | 30/06/1964 | 08/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6906 | 08/11/1940 | CHICHELEY HALL | 08/11/1940 | 30/04/1965 | 03/04/1965 | |
Hall | 6907 | 09/11/1940 | DAVENHAM HALL | 09/11/1940 | 28/02/1965 | 06/02/1965 | |
Hall | 6908 | 20/11/1940 | DOWNHAM HALL | 20/11/1940 | 31/07/1965 | 21/07/1965 | |
Hall | 6909 | 27/11/1940 | FREWIN HALL | 27/11/1940 | 30/06/1964 | 25/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6910 | 10/12/1940 | GOSSINGTON HALL | 10/12/1940 | 31/10/1965 | 01/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6911 | 10/01/1941 | HOLKER HALL | 10/01/1941 | 30/04/1965 | 24/04/1965 | |
Hall | 6912 | 30/01/1941 | HELMSTER HALL | 30/01/1941 | 28/02/1964 | 14/02/1964 | |
Hall | 6913 | 07/02/1941 | LEVENS HALL | 07/02/1941 | 30/06/1964 | 25/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6914 | 11/02/1941 | LANGTON HALL | 11/02/1941 | 30/04/1964 | 01/04/1964 | |
Hall | 6915 | 15/02/1941 | MURSLEY HALL | 15/02/1941 | 28/02/1965 | 13/02/1965 | |
Hall | 6916 | 11/06/1941 | MISTERTON HALL | 04/1946 | 31/08/1965 | 14/08/1965 | |
Hall | 6917 | 14/06/1941 | OLDLANDS HALL | 12/1946 | 30/09/1965 | 25/09/1965 | |
Hall | 6918 | 18/06/1941 | SANDON HALL | 04/1946 | 30/06/1965 | 10/09/1965 | |
Hall | 6919 | 21/06/1941 | TYLNEY HALL | 08/1947 | 31/08/1963 | 26/08/1963 | |
Hall | 6920 | 03/07/1941 | BARNINGHAM HALL | 05/1946 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 6921 | 11/07/1941 | BORWICK HALL | 01/1948 | 31/10/1965 | 26/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6922 | 19/07/1941 | BURTON HALL | 12/1946 | 30/04/1965 | 01/05/1965 | |
Hall | 6923 | 24/07/1941 | CROXTETH HALL | 08/1946 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 6924 | 05/08/1941 | GRANTLEY HALL | 05/1947 | 31/10/1965 | 26/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6925 | 09/08/1941 | HACKNESS HALL | 08/1946 | 30/11/1964 | 21/11/1964 | |
Hall | 6926 | 11/11/1941 | HOLKHAM HALL | 11/1946 | 31/05/1965 | 29/05/1965 | |
Hall | 6927 | 15/11/1941 | LILFORD HALL | 06/1948 | 31/10/1965 | 01/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6928 | 22/11/1941 | UNDERLEY HALL | 09/1947 | 30/06/1965 | 16/06/1965 | |
Hall | 6929 | 28/11/1941 | WHORLTON HALL | 12/1946 | 31/10/1963 | 28/10/1963 | |
Hall | 6930 | 29/11/1941 | ALDERSEY HALL | 05/1946 | 31/10/1965 | 16/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6931 | 06/12/1941 | ALDBOROUGH HALL | 09/1947 | 31/10/1965 | 01/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6932 | 11/12/1941 | BURWARTON HALL | 03/1946 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 6933 | 15/12/1941 | BIRTLES HALL | 12/1946 | 30/11/1964 | 14/11/1964 | |
Hall | 6934 | 20/12/1941 | BEACHAMWELL HALL | 03/1948 | 31/10/1965 | 09/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6935 | 20/12/1941 | BROWSHOLME HALL | 01/1947 | 28/02/1965 | 06/02/1965 | |
Hall | 6936 | 11/07/1942 | BRECCLES HALL | 02/1947 | 30/11/1964 | 13/11/1964 | |
Hall | 6937 | 11/07/1942 | CONYNGHAM HALL | 10/1946 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 6938 | 22/07/1942 | CORNDEAN HALL | 03/1946 | 31/03/1965 | 19/03/1965 | |
Hall | 6939 | 27/07/1942 | CALVELEY HALL | 08/1946 | 31/10/1963 | 28/10/1963 | |
Hall | 6940 | 07/08/1942 | DIDLINGTON HALL | 08/1946 | 31/05/1964 | 06/05/1964 | |
Hall | 6941 | 15/08/1942 | FILLONGLEY HALL | 04/1946 | 30/04/1964 | 24/04/1964 | |
Hall | 6942 | 22/08/1942 | ESHTON HALL | 04/1948 | 31/12/1964 | 14/12/1964 | |
Hall | 6943 | 26/08/1942 | FARNLEY HALL | 06/1947 | 31/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | |
Hall | 6944 | 03/09/1942 | FLEDBOROUGH HALL | 03/1947 | 30/11/1965 | 18/11/1965 | |
Hall | 6945 | 08/09/1942 | GLASFRYN HALL | 09/1946 | 30/09/1964 | 01/09/1964 | |
Hall | 6946 | 05/12/1942 | HEATHERDEN HALL | 03/1946 | 30/06/1964 | 15/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6947 | 07/12/1942 | HELMINGHAM HALL | 11/1946 | 30/11/1965 | 18/11/1965 | |
Hall | 6948 | 11/12/1942 | HOLBROOKE HALL | 01/1948 | 31/12/1963 | 02/12/1963 | |
Hall | 3955 | 16/12/1942 | HABERFIELD HALL | 05/1947 | 31/05/1961 | 12/05/1961 | |
Hall | 6950 | 23/12/1942 | KINGSTHORPE HALL | 04/1947 | 30/06/1964 | 25/06/1964 | |
Hall | 6951 | 08/02/1943 | IMPNEY HALL | 04/1948 | 31/12/1965 | 25/12/1965 | |
Hall | 6952 | 22/02/1943 | KIMBERLEY HALL | 09/1948 | 31/12/1965 | 25/12/1965 | |
Hall | 3953 | 27/02/1943 | LEIGHTON HALL | 04/1947 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 6954 | 02/03/1943 | LOTHERTON HALL | 08/1948 | 31/05/1964 | 14/05/1964 | |
Hall | 6955 | 14/03/1943 | LYDCOTT HALL | 06/1947 | 28/02/1965 | 06/02/1965 | |
Hall | 6956 | 28/03/1943 | MOTTRAM HALL | 01/1947 | 31/12/1965 | 31/12/1965 | |
Hall | 3952 | 01/04/1943 | NORCLIFFE HALL | 04/1947 | 31/10/1965 | 26/10/1965 | |
Hall | 6958 | 08/04/1943 | OXBURGH HALL | 08/1947 | 30/06/1965 | 16/06/1965 |