GWR Hawksworth "1000" Class 4-6-0
Class | GWR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
County | 1000 | 04/08/1945 | PDN 83D 83D 84K 82A 82B 82C W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Chester West Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 01/11/1952 27/03/1954 10/09/1960 25/01/1964 07/1964 |
06/07/1964 |
County | 1001 | 12/09/1945 | NA NEY 83G 87H W |
Newton Abbot Neyland Penzance Neyland Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 28/01/1961 06/10/1962 27/05/1963 |
24/05/1963 |
County | 1002 | 27/09/1945 | BRD WEY WEY BRD 83D 83G 83E 83D 83G 81E 89A W |
Bristol Bath Road Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Weymouth Radipole (GWR) Bristol Bath Road Laira Penzance St Blazey Laira Penzance Didcot Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 18/06/1949 30/06/1949 08/10/1949 21/03/1953 16/05/1953 18/06/1960 05/11/1960 03/12/1960 25/02/1961 03/11/1962 09/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 |
County | 1003 | 02/10/1945 | PDN 83D 83D 84G 84G 83D W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 28/01/1961 22/10/1962 |
22/10/1962 |
County | 1004 | 15/10/1945 | LA 83F 83G 84A 84G 84G 84A 82C 83G W |
Laira Truro Penzance Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stafford Road Swindon Penzance Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 25/03/1950 20/05/1950 03/11/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 21/02/1953 27/03/1954 31/12/1960 09/1962 |
21/09/1962 |
County | 1005 | 06/11/1945 | BRD 82B W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 15/06/1947 10/09/1960 17/06/1963 |
24/06/1963 |
County | 1006 | 15/11/1945 | LA LA 87G 83G 83F 83G 83E 83D 82C W |
Laira Laira Carmarthen Penzance Truro Penzance St Blazey Laira Swindon Withdrawn |
01/12/1945 23/03/1946 15/06/1947 19/06/1954 06/11/1954 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 18/06/1960 05/11/1960 15/12/1962 09/1963 |
17/09/1963 |
County | 1007 | 05/12/1945 | BRD 83F 83C 81E W |
Bristol Bath Road Truro Exeter Didcot Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/01/1955 03/10/1959 25/03/1961 05/10/1962 |
05/10/1962 |
County | 1008 | 10/12/1945 | PDN 84K 83G 83D 83G 83G 81E 87H 89A 89A 82C W |
Old Oak Common Chester West Penzance Laira Penzance Penzance Didcot Neyland Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 14/06/1958 09/08/1958 24/01/1959 03/12/1960 25/02/1961 06/10/1962 09/02/1963 02/03/1963 08/09/1963 07/10/1963 |
03/10/1963 |
County | 1009 | 21/12/1945 | LA NEY 82A 82B W |
Laira Neyland Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 29/01/1955 10/09/1960 09/02/1963 |
01/02/1963 |
County | 1010 | 22/01/1946 | PDN 83D 83D 83F 83D 82C W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Truro Laira Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 03/10/1959 07/1964 |
24/07/1964 |
County | 1011 | 29/01/1946 | BRD 82B 82C W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1960 30/11/1963 11/1964 |
06/11/1964 |
County | 1012 | 05/02/1946 | PDN 83D 83D 82C W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 06/10/1956 04/1964 |
24/04/1964 |
County | 1013 | 11/02/1946 | BRD LA 83F 83G 83G 84G 84G 82C W |
Bristol Bath Road Laira Truro Penzance Penzance Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 29/01/1949 17/06/1950 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 08/09/1963 07/1964 |
24/07/1964 |
County | 1014 | 18/02/1946 | BRD 82B 87H 89A 89A 82C W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Neyland Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1960 07/10/1961 09/03/1963 30/03/1963 08/09/1963 04/1964 |
24/04/1964 |
County | 1015 | 01/03/1946 | PDN 83D 83D 82C 81E 83D W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Swindon Didcot Laira Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 03/10/1959 09/09/1961 03/11/1962 13/11/1962 |
13/11/1962 |
County | 1016 | 12/03/1946 | SRD 83D 84G W |
Stafford Road Laira Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 09/09/1963 |
17/09/1963 |
County | 1017 | 18/03/1946 | SRD 84G 84G 83D 89A W |
Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Laira Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 31/12/1960 28/01/1961 19/12/1962 |
19/12/1962 |
County | 1018 | 23/03/1946 | NA 83G 83G 84G 84G 84A 83D 83G 83D 83G W |
Newton Abbot Penzance Penzance Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stafford Road Laira Penzance Laira Penzance Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 24/01/1953 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 18/06/1960 03/12/1960 09/1962 |
27/09/1962 |
County | 1019 | 02/04/1946 | PZ NA 83G 83G 84G 84G 84A 82C 82C 89A W |
Penzance Newton Abbot Penzance Penzance Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Stafford Road Swindon Swindon Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 01/12/1951 31/12/1951 24/01/1953 27/03/1954 16/06/1962 06/10/1962 16/02/1963 |
11/02/1963 |
County | 1020 | 14/12/1946 | EXE NEY 87G 87H 82B 82C W |
Exeter Neyland Carmarthen Neyland St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 06/10/1956 03/11/1956 03/11/1962 02/11/1963 02/1964 |
26/02/1964 |
County | 1021 | 19/12/1945 | PDN 83D 83D 83G 83D 82C 82B W |
Old Oak Common Laira Laira Penzance Laira Swindon St Philips Marsh Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 26/03/1955 16/07/1955 28/11/1959 31/12/1960 12/11/1963 |
01/11/1963 |
County | 1022 | 24/12/1946 | PZ LA 83G 83G 84K 84G 85C 84G W |
Penzance Laira Penzance Penzance Chester West Shrewsbury Hereford Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 30/10/1948 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 03/11/1951 14/06/1958 08/08/1959 31/10/1959 05/10/1962 |
05/10/1962 |
County | 1023 | 01/01/1947 | TR EXE 83F 83D 83G 83G 83F 83F 83D 83F 83C 82C 89A W |
Truro Exeter Truro Laira Penzance Penzance Truro Truro Laira Truro Exeter Swindon Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 27/11/1948 22/04/1950 15/07/1950 31/01/1951 28/02/1951 08/09/1951 30/09/1951 05/11/1955 03/12/1955 03/10/1959 25/03/1961 06/10/1962 02/03/1963 |
01/03/1963 |
County | 1024 | 09/01/1947 | SRD 84G 84G 83D 83D 81A 84K 82A 82B 82C W |
Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Laira Laira Old Oak Common Chester West Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 14/06/1958 10/09/1960 02/11/1963 04/1964 |
08/04/1964 |
County | 1025 | 20/01/1947 | SRD 84G 84G W |
Stafford Road Shrewsbury Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 23/02/1963 |
18/02/1963 |
County | 1026 | 31/01/1947 | PDN 83D 82A 84K 84G W |
Old Oak Common Laira Bristol Bath Road Chester West Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 04/10/1952 21/02/1953 27/03/1954 08/10/1955 09/1962 |
13/09/1962 |
County | 1027 | 11/03/1947 | WES 87H 87H 82A 82B 87H 89A 82C W |
Westbury Neyland Neyland Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Neyland Shrewsbury Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 28/11/1959 10/09/1960 07/10/1961 02/03/1963 08/09/1963 05/11/1963 |
25/10/1963 |
County | 1028 | 26/03/1947 | BRD 82B 82C W |
Bristol Bath Road St Philips Marsh Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 10/09/1960 02/11/1963 12/1963 |
02/12/1963 |
County | 1029 | 10/04/1947 | SRD 87H 82C W |
Stafford Road Neyland Swindon Withdrawn |
15/06/1947 26/12/1953 12/08/1961 05/12/1962 |
05/12/1962 |