Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "County" Class 4-6-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Tue 17/08/1954 1013 84G   Wolverhampton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954  
Sun 12/11/1961 1006,
1010,
1015,
1023,
1024
83D,
82C,
81E,
82C,
82B
  Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Works sidings.
Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop.
SLS 1/1962  
Sun 04/03/1962 1009,
1013,
1015,
1019,
1021,
1027,
1028
82B,
89A,
81E,
82C,
82B,
87H,
82B
  Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard.
Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.
   
Sun 04/03/1962 1011 82B   Wolverhampton Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.    
Sun 29/11/1964 1011 Wdn   Swindon Works visit: Outside the stock shed RO 1/1965