Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "County" Class 4-6-0


GWR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1000 04/08/1945 07/1964 Swindon 18.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 19.38
1001 12/09/1945 05/1963 Neyland 17.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1964 18.68
1002 27/09/1945 09/1963 Kidderminster 18 18.40
1003 02/10/1945 22/10/1962 Laira 17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1964 18.63
1004 15/10/1945 09/1962 Penzance 16.92 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1964 18.59
1005 06/11/1945 06/1963 St Philips Marsh 17.58 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1964 18.79
1006 15/11/1945 09/1963 Swindon 17.83 18.59
1007 05/12/1945 05/10/1962 Didcot 16.83 17.96
1008 10/12/1945 10/1963 Swindon 17.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1963 18.02
1009 21/12/1945 09/02/1963 St Philips Marsh 17.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 08/1963 17.66
1010 22/01/1946 07/1964 Swindon 18.5 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 18.91
1011 29/01/1946 11/1964 Swindon 18.83 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 03/1965 19.14
1012 05/02/1946 04/1964 Swindon 18.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 18.87
1013 11/02/1946 07/1964 Swindon 18.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 18.85
1014 18/02/1946 04/1964 Swindon 18.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1964 18.84
1015 01/03/1946 13/11/1962 Reading (W.R.) 16.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 05/1964 18.22
1016 12/03/1946 09/1963 Kidderminster 17.5 17.94
1017 18/03/1946 19/12/1962 Kidderminster 16.75 17.76
1018 23/03/1946 09/1962 Reading (W.R.) 16.5 17.66
1019 02/04/1946 16/02/1963 Kidderminster 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1964 17.80
1020 14/12/1946 02/1964 Swindon 17.17 17.60
1021 19/12/1945 11/1963 St Philips Marsh 17.92 18.58
1022 24/12/1946 05/10/1962 Kidderminster 15.83 17.07
1023 01/01/1947 02/03/1963 Kidderminster 16.17 16.63
1024 09/01/1947 04/1964 Swindon 17.25 17.53
1025 20/01/1947 23/02/1963 Kidderminster 16.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1964 17.00
1026 31/01/1947 09/1962 Kidderminster 15.67 16.97
1027 11/03/1947 10/1963 Swindon 16.58 17.28
1028 26/03/1947 12/1963 Swindon 16.75 17.15
1029 10/04/1947 05/12/1962 Swindon 15.67 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 09/1963 16.44