Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 118 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 3486 Week
» 24388 Month
» 24388 Year
» 1245953 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

GWR Hawksworth "County" Class 4-6-0


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
County 1000 04/08/1945 COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX 04/08/1945   31/07/1964 07/1964
County 1001 12/09/1945 COUNTY OF BUCKS 12/09/1945   31/05/1963 27/05/1963
County 1002 27/09/1945 COUNTY OF BERKS 27/09/1945   30/09/1963 09/09/1963
County 1003 02/10/1945 COUNTY OF WILTS 02/10/1945   31/10/1962 22/10/1962
County 1004 15/10/1945 COUNTY OF SOMERSET 15/10/1945   30/09/1962 09/1962
County 1005 06/11/1945 COUNTY OF DEVON 06/11/1945   30/06/1963 17/06/1963
County 1006 15/11/1945 COUNTY OF CORNWALL 15/11/1945   30/09/1963 09/1963
County 1007 05/12/1945 COUNTY OF BRECKNOCK 05/12/1945   31/10/1962 05/10/1962
County 1008 10/12/1945 COUNTY OF CARDIGAN 10/12/1945   31/10/1963 07/10/1963
County 1009 21/12/1945 COUNTY OF CARMARTHEN 21/12/1945   28/02/1963 09/02/1963
County 1010 22/01/1946 COUNTY OF CAERNARVON 22/01/1946   31/07/1964 07/1964
County 1011 29/01/1946 COUNTY OF CHESTER 29/01/1946   30/11/1964 11/1964
County 1012 05/02/1946 COUNTY OF DENBIGH 05/02/1946   30/04/1964 04/1964
County 1013 11/02/1946 COUNTY OF DORSET 11/02/1946   31/07/1964 07/1964
County 1014 18/02/1946 COUNTY OF GLAMORGAN 18/02/1946   30/04/1964 04/1964
County 1015 01/03/1946 COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER 01/03/1946   30/11/1962 13/11/1962
County 1016 12/03/1946 COUNTY OF HANTS 12/03/1946   30/09/1963 09/09/1963
County 1017 18/03/1946 COUNTY OF HEREFORD 18/03/1946   31/12/1962 19/12/1962
County 1018 23/03/1946 COUNTY OF LEICESTER 23/03/1946   30/09/1962 09/1962
County 1019 02/04/1946 COUNTY OF MERIONETH 02/04/1946   28/02/1963 16/02/1963
County 1020 14/12/1946 COUNTY OF MONMOUTH 14/12/1946   29/02/1964 02/1964
County 1021 19/12/1945 COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY 19/12/1945   30/11/1963 12/11/1963
County 1022 24/12/1946 COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON 24/12/1946   31/10/1962 05/10/1962
County 1023 01/01/1947 COUNTY OF OXFORD 01/01/1947   31/03/1963 02/03/1963
County 1024 09/01/1947 COUNTY OF PEMBROKE 09/01/1947   30/04/1964 04/1964
County 1025 20/01/1947 COUNTY OF RADNOR 20/01/1947   28/02/1963 23/02/1963
County 1026 31/01/1947 COUNTY OF SALOP 31/01/1947   30/09/1962 09/1962
County 1027 11/03/1947 COUNTY OF STAFFORD 11/03/1947   31/10/1963 05/11/1963
County 1028 26/03/1947 COUNTY OF WARWICK 26/03/1947   31/12/1963 12/1963
County 1029 10/04/1947 COUNTY OF WORCESTER 10/04/1947   31/12/1962 05/12/1962