Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 906 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6511 Week
» 18058 Month
» 417740 Year
» 494327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Yorkshire Eng Co & BTH Ltd 15 Bo-Bo


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Dept) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D8200   10/11/1957 1D
32A
31B
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
March
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
10/11/1957
07/11/1959
05/12/1959
13/02/1960
18/02/1961
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8201   17/02/1958 1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
34G
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/02/1958
14/11/1959
05/12/1959
18/02/1961
23/06/1962
04/04/1970
01/08/1970
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8202   03/02/1958 1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
03/02/1958
14/11/1959
05/12/1959
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8203 ADB968003 24/02/1958 1D
18A
1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Toton (on loan)
Devons Road (Bow) (returned from loan)
Norwich Thorpe (on loan)
Norwich Thorpe (returned from loan)
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
24/02/1958
03/1958
17/05/1958
12/12/1959
09/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
20/03/1969
20/03/1969
D8204   17/04/1958 1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/04/1958
05/12/1959
09/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8205   28/04/1958 1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
28/04/1958
19/12/1959
09/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8206   19/05/1958 1D
32A
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
19/05/1958
12/12/1959
09/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8207   16/06/1958 1D
32A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Norwich Thorpe
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
16/06/1958
23/01/1960
17/06/1961
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8208   07/07/1958 1D
18A
61A
1D
30A
30A
32B
30A
40B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Toton
Kittybrewster
Devons Road (Bow)
Stratford
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Immingham
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/07/1958
22/11/1958
17/01/1959
07/02/1959
16/01/1960
06/02/1960
10/02/1962
23/06/1962
19/11/1966
26/11/1966
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8209   07/10/1958 1D
30A
32B
30A
W
Devons Road (Bow) (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/10/1958
06/02/1960
10/02/1962
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8210   05/11/1959 30A
34G
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
05/11/1959
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8211   12/11/1959 30A
31B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
March
Stratford
Withdrawn
12/11/1959
26/11/1960
23/06/1962
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8212   27/11/1959 31B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
27/11/1959
23/06/1962
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8213   09/12/1959 31B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
09/12/1959
23/06/1962
22/12/1968
22/12/1968
D8214   09/12/1959 31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
09/12/1959
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
06/12/1970
06/12/1970
D8215   31/12/1959 31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/12/1959
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
06/12/1970
06/12/1970
D8216   31/12/1959 31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
31/12/1959
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8217   19/01/1960 31B
31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
02/01/1960
19/01/1960
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
31/03/1968
31/03/1968
D8218   01/02/1960 31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/02/1960
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8219   29/02/1960 31B
30A
32B
30A
W
March (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
29/02/1960
23/06/1962
22/06/1963
23/04/1966
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8220   10/03/1960 30A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
10/03/1960
26/11/1960
23/04/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8221   21/03/1960 30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/03/1960
26/11/1960
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8222   30/03/1960 30A
32B
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/03/1960
26/11/1960
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8223   08/04/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
08/04/1960
16/09/1961
10/02/1962
11/05/1968
22/12/1968
22/12/1968
D8224   29/04/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
29/04/1960
16/09/1961
15/09/1962
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8225   11/05/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
11/05/1960
16/09/1961
15/09/1962
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8226   03/05/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
03/05/1960
16/09/1961
15/09/1962
10/12/1966
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8227   27/05/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
27/05/1960
16/09/1961
15/09/1962
07/01/1967
11/03/1967
11/05/1968
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8228   14/06/1960 32B
30A
32B
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
14/06/1960
26/11/1960
15/09/1962
10/12/1966
15/04/1967
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8229   29/06/1960 32A
31B
30A
32B
34G
30A
32B
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Stratford
Ipswich
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
29/06/1960
17/09/1960
26/11/1960
15/09/1962
04/05/1963
23/04/1966
15/04/1967
11/05/1968
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8230   07/07/1960 32A
31B
30A
34G
30A
34G
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/07/1960
17/09/1960
26/11/1960
27/04/1963
13/04/1968
21/02/1970
04/04/1970
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8231   18/07/1960 32A
31B
30A
34G
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
March
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
18/07/1960
17/09/1960
26/11/1960
27/04/1963
12/12/1970
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8232   23/08/1960 32A
30A
34G
W
R
30A
W
Norwich Thorpe (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
Reinstated
Stratford
Withdrawn
23/08/1960
17/09/1960
27/04/1963
06/10/1968
13/10/1968
12/12/1970
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8233 ADB968001 31/08/1960 30A
34G
W
Stratford (New)
Finsbury Park
Withdrawn
31/08/1960
27/04/1963
16/02/1969
16/02/1969
D8234   21/09/1960 30A
34G
30A
W
Stratford (New)
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/09/1960
15/04/1967
06/05/1967
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8235   30/09/1960 32B
30A
34G
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
30/09/1960
26/11/1960
27/04/1963
07/10/1967
06/10/1968
06/10/1968
D8236   07/10/1960 32B
30A
34G
30A
32B
30A
W
Ipswich (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
07/10/1960
26/11/1960
27/04/1963
10/12/1966
15/04/1967
11/05/1968
06/10/1968
06/10/1968
D8237 ADB968002 17/11/1960 34G
30A
32B
30A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
17/11/1960
27/04/1963
15/04/1967
11/05/1968
20/03/1969
20/03/1969
D8238   21/12/1960 34G
30A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
21/12/1960
27/04/1963
30/09/1968
30/09/1968
D8239   23/01/1961 34G
30A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
23/01/1961
27/04/1963
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8240   23/01/1961 34G
32B
30A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Ipswich
Stratford
Withdrawn
23/01/1961
04/05/1963
09/10/1965
06/10/1968
06/10/1968
D8241   01/02/1961 41A
30A
W
Sheffield Darnall (New)
Stratford
Withdrawn
01/02/1961
27/04/1963
14/04/1968
14/04/1968
D8242   10/02/1961 34G
30A
40B
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Immingham
Withdrawn
10/02/1961
27/04/1963
26/11/1966
27/03/1971
27/03/1971
D8243 ADB968000 24/02/1961 34G
30A
34G
30A
W
Finsbury Park (New)
Stratford
Finsbury Park
Stratford
Withdrawn
24/02/1961
27/04/1963
06/05/1967
07/10/1967
16/02/1969
16/02/1969