Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 495 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5096 Week
» 16643 Month
» 416325 Year
» 492912 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Yorkshire Eng Co & BTH Ltd 15 Bo-Bo


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sun 26/02/1961 D8210 34G   Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.    
Sat 02/12/1961 D8215 31B   Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962  
Sat 31/03/1962 D8229 30A   Seen working a freight at Abbey Mills signalbox, near Stratford - All over green The Early Years of London Diesels  
Sun 15/07/1962 D8229,
D8236
30A,
30A
  D8229 and D8236 double headed an excursion from Loughton to Brighton and back.
D8229 and D8236 double headed an excursion from Loughton to Brighton and back.
Trains Illustrated 10/62  
Sun 15/06/1969 D8202,
D8213,
D8223,
D8227,
D8235,
D8236,
D8238,
D8240
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
G. Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
RO 9/1969  
Sat 21/06/1969 D8231 34G   Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969  
Sun 29/06/1969 D8231,
D8232,
ADB968001
34G,
34G,
Wdn
  Finsbury Park depot: On shed
Finsbury Park depot: On shed
Finsbury Park depot: On shed
RO 9/1969  
Mon 01/09/1969 D8202,
D8213,
D8223,
D8227
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
At Cohen's scrapyard, Kettering: In scrapyard
RO489 11/69  
Sun 30/01/1972 D8200,
D8201,
D8209,
D8210
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn,
Wdn
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Old scrapyard area (still intact) RO 4/1972