114
BR | BR (Parcels) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50001 | 15/10/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 15/10/1956 | ||
50002 | 02/11/1956 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
02/11/1956 04/10/1987 |
||
50003 | 02/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 02/11/1956 | ||
50004 | 07/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 07/11/1956 | ||
50005 | 07/11/1956 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
07/11/1956 04/10/1987 |
||
50006 | 20/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 20/11/1956 | ||
50007 | 20/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 20/11/1956 | ||
50008 | 16/11/1956 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
16/11/1956 04/10/1987 |
||
50009 | 20/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 20/11/1956 | ||
50010 | 55930 | 04/12/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 04/12/1956 | |
50011 | 27/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 27/11/1956 | ||
50012 | 27/11/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 27/11/1956 | ||
50013 | 04/12/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 04/12/1956 | ||
50014 | 04/12/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 04/12/1956 | ||
50015 | 27/02/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
27/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50016 | 11/12/1956 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 11/12/1956 | ||
50017 | 01/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 01/01/1957 | ||
50018 | 01/01/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
01/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50019 | 01/01/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
01/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50020 | 01/01/1957 | 40A R |
Lincoln (New) Reinstated |
01/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50021 | 01/01/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
01/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50022 | 01/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 01/01/1957 | ||
50023 | 09/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 09/01/1957 | ||
50024 | 09/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 09/01/1957 | ||
50025 | 11/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 11/01/1957 | ||
50026 | 17/01/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
17/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50027 | 17/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 17/01/1957 | ||
50028 | 17/01/1957 | 40A W |
Lincoln (New) Withdrawn |
17/01/1957 25/08/1962 |
25/08/1962 | |
50029 | 24/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 24/01/1957 | ||
50030 | 24/01/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
24/01/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50031 | 24/01/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 24/01/1957 | ||
50032 | 05/02/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 05/02/1957 | ||
50033 | 05/02/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 05/02/1957 | ||
50034 | 05/02/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 05/02/1957 | ||
50035 | 29/03/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 29/03/1957 | ||
50036 | 22/02/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
22/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50037 | 22/02/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
22/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50038 | 22/02/1957 | 40A R |
Lincoln (New) Reinstated |
22/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50039 | 27/02/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
27/02/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50040 | 27/02/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 27/02/1957 | ||
50041 | 08/03/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 08/03/1957 | ||
50042 | 08/03/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 08/03/1957 | ||
50043 | 08/03/1957 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 08/03/1957 | ||
50044 | 22/03/1957 | 40A TS |
Lincoln (New) Tyseley |
22/03/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50045 | 29/03/1957 | 40A |
Lincoln (New) |
29/03/1957 04/08/1987 |
||
50046 | 29/03/1957 | 40A R |
Lincoln (New) Reinstated |
29/03/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50047 | 17/04/1957 | 40A |
Lincoln (New) |
17/04/1957 04/10/1987 |
||
50048 | 09/06/1958 | 40A | Lincoln (New) | 09/06/1958 | ||
50049 | 26/08/1957 | 40A W |
Lincoln (New) Withdrawn |
26/08/1957 23/06/1968 |
23/06/1968 |