Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 36 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6251 Week
» 17956 Month
» 349445 Year
» 426032 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

115


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
51651 26/03/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) 26/03/1960
51652 26/03/1960 9E Trafford Park (LMS) (New) 26/03/1960
51653 26/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 26/03/1960
51654 26/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 26/03/1960
51655
51656
51657
51658
51659
51660
51661
51662
51663
51664
51665
51666
51667
51668
51669
51670
51671
51672
51673
51674
51675
51676
51677
51678
51679
51680
51849 13/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 13/02/1960
51850 13/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 13/02/1960
51851 06/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 06/02/1960
51852 06/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 06/02/1960
51853 06/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 06/02/1960
51854 06/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 06/02/1960
51855 13/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 13/02/1960
51856 13/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 13/02/1960
51857 27/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 27/02/1960
51858 27/02/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 27/02/1960
51859 05/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 05/03/1960
51860 05/03/1960 14A Cricklewood East (New) 05/03/1960
51861
51862
51863
51864
51865
51866
51867
51868
51869
51870
51871
51872
51873
51874
51875
51876
51877
51878
51879
51880
51881
51882
51883
51884
51885
51886
51887
51888
51889
51890
51891
51892
51893
51894
51895 12/11/1960   (New) 12/11/1960
51896 12/11/1960   (New) 12/11/1960
51897 12/11/1960   (New) 12/11/1960
51898 12/11/1960   (New) 12/11/1960
51899 17/12/1960 1E Bletchley (New) 17/12/1960
51900 17/12/1960 1E Bletchley (New) 17/12/1960