Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

115


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
06/02/1960 To Service 51851   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
06/02/1960 To Service 51852   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
06/02/1960 To Service 51853   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
06/02/1960 To Service 51854   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
13/02/1960 To Service 51849   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
13/02/1960 To Service 51850   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
13/02/1960 To Service 51855   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
13/02/1960 To Service 51856   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
27/02/1960 To Service 51857   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
27/02/1960 To Service 51858   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
05/03/1960 To Service 51859   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
05/03/1960 To Service 51860   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
26/03/1960 To Service 51651   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
26/03/1960 To Service 51652   NEW 9E Trafford Park (LMS)
26/03/1960 To Service 51653   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
26/03/1960 To Service 51654   NEW 14A Cricklewood East
17/12/1960 To Service 51899   NEW 1E Bletchley
17/12/1960 To Service 51900   NEW 1E Bletchley