90 Bo-Bo
Class | BR | BR (90/0 (R1)) | BR (90/0 (R2)) | BR (90/1) | BR (90/2) | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
90/0 | 90001 | 04/04/1988 | WN | Willesden | 04/04/1988 | |||||
90/0 | 90002 | 04/04/1988 | WN | Willesden | 04/04/1988 | |||||
90/0 | 90003 | 04/04/1988 | WN | Willesden | 04/04/1988 | |||||
90/0 | 90004 | 04/04/1988 | WN | Willesden | 04/04/1988 | |||||
90/0 | 90005 | 30/04/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90006 | 30/04/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90007 | 30/04/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90008 | 16/05/1988 | WN | Willesden | 16/05/1988 | |||||
90/0 | 90009 | 31/05/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90010 | 30/06/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90011 | 23/09/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90012 | 25/11/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90013 | 23/11/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90014 | 28/10/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90015 | 23/11/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90016 | 08/12/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90017 | 20/12/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90018 | 22/12/1988 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90019 | 05/01/1989 | ||||||||
90/0 | 90020 | 31/01/1989 | ||||||||
90/2 | 90021 | 90021 | 90221 | 31/01/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90022 | 90022 | 90222 | 14/02/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90023 | 90023 | 90223 | 24/02/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90024 | 90024 | 90224 | 10/03/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90025 | 90025 | 90025 | 90125 | 90225 | 17/03/1989 | ||||
90/1 | 90026 | 90026 | 90126 | 20/03/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90027 | 90027 | 90027 | 90127 | 90227 | 1989 | ||||
90/1 | 90028 | 90028 | 90128 | 1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90029 | 90029 | 90129 | 1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90030 | 90030 | 90130 | 1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90031 | 90031 | 90131 | 14/09/1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90032 | 90032 | 90132 | 17/09/1989 | ||||||
90/2 | 90033 | 90033 | 90033 | 90133 | 90233 | 21/09/1989 | ||||
90/1 | 90034 | 90034 | 90134 | 27/09/1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90035 | 90035 | 90135 | 29/09/1989 | ||||||
90/1 | 90036 | 90036 | 90136 | 25/04/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90037 | 90037 | 90137 | 28/04/1990 | ||||||
90/2 | 90038 | 90038 | 90038 | 90138 | 90238 | 30/04/1990 | ||||
90/2 | 90039 | 90039 | 90039 | 90139 | 90239 | 30/04/1990 | ||||
90/1 | 90040 | 90040 | 90140 | 01/05/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90041 | 90041 | 90141 | 04/05/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90042 | 90042 | 90142 | 14/05/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90043 | 90043 | 90143 | 14/05/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90044 | 90044 | 90144 | 30/06/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90045 | 90045 | 90145 | 30/06/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90046 | 90046 | 90146 | 30/06/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90047 | 90047 | 90147 | 27/07/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90048 | 90048 | 90148 | 27/07/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90049 | 90049 | 90149 | 26/10/1990 | ||||||
90/1 | 90050 | 90050 | 90150 | 14/11/1990 |