Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1092 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 2318 Week
» 21963 Month
» 56605 Year
» 1278170 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

116


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
50050 20/04/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 20/04/1957
50051 27/04/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 27/04/1957
50052 11/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 11/05/1957
50053 11/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 11/05/1957
50054 11/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 11/05/1957
50055 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
50056 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
50057 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50058 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50059 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50060 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50061 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50062 29/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 29/06/1957
50063 15/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 15/06/1957
50064 08/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 08/06/1957
50065 08/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 08/06/1957
50066 17/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 17/08/1957
50067 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50068 15/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 15/06/1957
50069 22/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 22/06/1957
50070 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50071 20/07/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 20/07/1957
50072 03/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 03/08/1957
50073 29/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 29/06/1957
50074 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50075 10/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 10/08/1957
50076 10/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 10/08/1957
50077 17/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 17/08/1957
50078 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50079 28/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 28/09/1957
50080 05/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 05/10/1957
50081 05/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 05/10/1957
50082 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50083 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50084 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50085 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50086 07/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 07/09/1957
50087 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50088 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50089 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50090 21/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 21/09/1957
50091 19/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 19/10/1957
50092 20/04/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 20/04/1957
50093 27/04/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 27/04/1957
50094 04/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 04/05/1957
50095 11/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 11/05/1957
50096 11/05/1957 91W
W
To Western Region / GWR (New)
Withdrawn
11/05/1957
07/10/1967
07/10/1967
50097 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
50098 18/05/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 18/05/1957
50099 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50100 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50101 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50102 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50103 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50104 29/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 29/06/1957
50105 15/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 15/06/1957
50106 08/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 08/06/1957
50107 08/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 08/06/1957
50108 17/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 17/08/1957
50109 01/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 01/06/1957
50110 15/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 15/06/1957
50111 22/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 22/06/1957
50112 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50113 20/07/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 20/07/1957
50114 03/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 03/08/1957
50115 29/06/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 29/06/1957
50116 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50117 10/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 10/08/1957
50118 10/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 10/08/1957
50119 17/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 17/08/1957
50120 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50121 28/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 28/09/1957
50122 05/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 05/10/1957
50123 05/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 05/10/1957
50124 24/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 24/08/1957
50125 31/08/1957 91W
W
To Western Region / GWR (New)
Withdrawn
31/08/1957
26/08/1961
31/08/1961
50126 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50127 31/08/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/08/1957
50128 07/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 07/09/1957
50129 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50130 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50131 14/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 14/09/1957
50132 21/09/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 21/09/1957
50133 19/10/1957 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 19/10/1957
50818
50820
50821
50822
50823
50824
50825
50826
50827
50828
50829
50830
50831
50832
50833
50834
50835
50836
50837
50838
50839
50840
50841
50842
50843
50844
50845
50846
50847
50848
50849
50850
50851
50852
50853
50854
50855
50856
50857
50858
50859
50860
50861
50863
50864
50865
50866
50867
50868
50869
50870
50871
50873
50874
50875
50876
50877
50878
50879
50880
50881
50882
50883
50884
50885
50886
50887
50888
50889
50890
50891
50892
50893
50894
50895
50896
50897
50898
50899
50900
50901
50902
50903
50904
50905
50906
50907
50908
50909
50910
50911
50912
50913
50914
50916
50917
50918
50919
50920
50921
50922
50923
51128 31/07/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/07/1958
51129 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51130 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51131 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51132 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51133 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51134 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51135 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51136 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51138 31/10/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/10/1958
51139 31/10/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/10/1958
51140 30/11/1958   (New) 30/11/1958
51141 31/07/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/07/1958
51142 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51143 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51144 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51145 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51146 31/08/1958   (New) 31/08/1958
51147 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51148 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51149 30/09/1958   (New) 30/09/1958
51151 31/10/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/10/1958
51152 31/10/1958 91W To Western Region / GWR (New) 31/10/1958
51153 30/11/1958   (New) 30/11/1958