Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 592 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 6982 Week
» 36480 Month
» 373326 Year
» 1594891 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

116


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
31/07/1958 To Service 51128   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/07/1958 To Service 51141   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/10/1958 To Service 51138   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/10/1958 To Service 51139   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/10/1958 To Service 51151   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/10/1958 To Service 51152   NEW 91W To Western Region / GWR
31/08/1961 Condemned 50125 98W     COND
07/10/1967 Condemned 50096 91W To Western Region / GWR   COND
13/05/1988 Condemned 50077 91W To Western Region / GWR   COND
13/05/1988 Condemned 50120 91W To Western Region / GWR   COND