Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 850 Today
» 1090 Yesterday
» 3165 Week
» 31123 Month
» 65765 Year
» 1287330 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

116


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50050 20/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.90
50051 27/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.88
50052 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.84
50053 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.84
50054 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.84
50055 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50056 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50057 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50058 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50059 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50060 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50061 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50062 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50063 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50064 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50065 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50066 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50067 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50068 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50069 22/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.72
50070 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50071 20/07/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.65
50072 03/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.61
50073 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50074 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50075 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50076 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50077 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50078 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50079 28/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.45
50080 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50081 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50082 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50083 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50084 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50085 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50086 07/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50087 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50088 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50089 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50090 21/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50091 19/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.40
50092 20/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.90
50093 27/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.88
50094 04/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.86
50095 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.84
50096 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 07/10/1967 10.42 62.84
50097 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50098 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50099 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50100 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50101 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50102 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50103 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50104 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50105 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50106 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50107 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50108 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50109 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.78
50110 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50111 22/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.72
50112 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50113 20/07/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.65
50114 03/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.61
50115 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50116 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50117 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50118 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50119 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50120 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50121 28/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.45
50122 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50123 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50124 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50125 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 31/08/1961 4 Cut Locomotive Works (Swindon) 23/09/1961 4.07
50126 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50127 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50128 07/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50129 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50130 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50131 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50132 21/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50133 19/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.40
50818
50820
50821
50822
50823
50824
50825
50826
50827
50828
50829
50830
50831
50832
50833
50834
50835
50836
50837
50838
50839
50840
50841
50842
50843
50844
50845
50846
50847
50848
50849
50850
50851
50852
50853
50854
50855
50856
50857
50858
50859
50860
50861
50863
50864
50865
50866
50867
50868
50869
50870
50871
50873
50874
50875
50876
50877
50878
50879
50880
50881
50882
50883
50884
50885
50886
50887
50888
50889
50890
50891
50892
50893
50894
50895
50896
50897
50898
50899
50900
50901
50902
50903
50904
50905
50906
50907
50908
50909
50910
50911
50912
50913
50914
50916
50917
50918
50919
50920
50921
50922
50923
51128 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.62
51129 31/08/1958 61.53
51130 31/08/1958 61.53
51131 31/08/1958 61.53
51132 31/08/1958 61.53
51133 31/08/1958 61.53
51134 30/09/1958 61.45
51135 30/09/1958 61.45
51136 30/09/1958 61.45
51138 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51139 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51140 30/11/1958 61.28
51141 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.62
51142 31/08/1958 61.53
51143 31/08/1958 61.53
51144 31/08/1958 61.53
51145 31/08/1958 61.53
51146 31/08/1958 61.53
51147 30/09/1958 61.45
51148 30/09/1958 61.45
51149 30/09/1958 61.45
51151 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51152 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.36
51153 30/11/1958 61.28