Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 224 Today
» 1292 Yesterday
» 2742 Week
» 22387 Month
» 57029 Year
» 1278594 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

116


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50050 20/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.88
50051 27/04/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.86
50052 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50053 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50054 11/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.82
50055 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.80
50056 18/05/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.80
50057 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50058 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50059 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50060 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50061 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50062 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.68
50063 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.72
50064 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50065 08/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.74
50066 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50067 01/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.76
50068 15/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.72
50069 22/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.70
50070 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50071 20/07/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.63
50072 03/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.59
50073 29/06/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.68
50074 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50075 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50076 10/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.57
50077 17/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.55
50078 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50079 28/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.44
50080 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.42
50081 05/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.42
50082 24/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.53
50083 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50084 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50085 31/08/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.51
50086 07/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.49
50087 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50088 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50089 14/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.47
50090 21/09/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.45
50091 19/10/1957 To Western Region / GWR 62.38
50818
50820
50821
50822
50823
50824
50825
50826
50827
50828
50829
50830
50831
50832
50833
50834
50835
50836
50837
50838
50839
50840
50841
50842
50843
50844
50845
50846
50847
50848
50849
50850
50851
50852
50853
50854
50855
50856
50857
50858
50859
50860
50861
50863
50864
50865
50866
50867
50868
50869
50870
51128 31/07/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.60
51129 31/08/1958 61.51
51130 31/08/1958 61.51
51131 31/08/1958 61.51
51132 31/08/1958 61.51
51133 31/08/1958 61.51
51134 30/09/1958 61.43
51135 30/09/1958 61.43
51136 30/09/1958 61.43
51138 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.35
51139 31/10/1958 To Western Region / GWR 61.35
51140 30/11/1958 61.26