NB 21 Bo-Bo
BR (Pre Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D6100 | 02/12/1958 | NB | Hornsey | 06/10/1971 | 08/12/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 11/1972 | 13.96 | |
D6101 | 09/12/1958 | NB | Hornsey | 03/08/1971 | 24/12/1965 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.86 | |
D6102 | 23/12/1958 | NB | Hornsey | 06/10/1971 | 11/06/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 13.65 | |
D6103 | 05/05/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 05/10/1971 | 15/10/1965 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 11/1972 | 13.54 | |
D6104 | 26/02/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.83 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 04/1968 | 9.14 | ||
D6105 | 17/03/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 08/06/1968 | Eastfield | 9.25 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 08/1968 | 9.42 | ||
D6106 | 24/03/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 18/07/1971 | 22/10/1965 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1972 | 13.32 | |
D6107 | 24/03/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 05/10/1971 | 05/06/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.57 | |
D6108 | 14/04/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 01/05/1969 | 20/10/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 10.08 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1971 | 12.18 | |
D6109 | 07/04/1959 | NB | Hornsey | 06/04/1968 | Eastfield | 9 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 01/1969 | 9.78 | ||
D6110 | 20/05/1959 | NB | Stratford | 14/04/1968 | Eastfield | 8.92 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 01/1969 | 9.67 | ||
D6111 | 12/05/1959 | NB | Stratford | 16/08/1968 | Eastfield | 9.25 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 09/1969 | 10.35 | ||
D6112 | 20/05/1959 | NB | Stratford | 31/12/1971 | 10/09/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.58 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 06/1972 | 13.08 | |
D6113 | 27/05/1959 | NB | Stratford | 06/10/1971 | 23/12/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 01/1972 | 12.65 | |
D6114 | 27/05/1959 | NB | Stratford | 05/10/1971 | 25/02/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.42 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 13.32 | |
D6115 | 02/06/1959 | NB | Stratford | 08/06/1968 | Eastfield | 9 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 08/1968 | 9.21 | ||
D6116 | 09/06/1959 | NB | Stratford | 31/12/1971 | 14/07/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 05/1972 | 12.94 | |
D6117 | 16/06/1959 | NB | Stratford | 16/08/1968 | Eastfield | 9.17 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 11/1968 | 9.42 | ||
D6118 | 24/06/1959 | NB | Stratford | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.5 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.90 | ||
D6119 | 30/06/1959 | NB | Stratford | 31/12/1971 | 28/12/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 13.14 | |
D6120 | 07/07/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.42 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 08/1968 | 9.12 | ||
D6121 | 18/08/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | 26/02/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 13.09 | |
D6122 | 15/09/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.25 | Cut | Woodham Brothers (Barry, South Glamorgan) | 06/1980 | 20.76 | ||
D6123 | 22/09/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 21/09/1971 | 05/1963 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 13.07 | |
D6124 | 29/09/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | 08/12/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 12.97 | |
D6125 | 29/09/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.25 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 04/1968 | 8.55 | ||
D6126 | 06/10/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 06/04/1968 | Eastfield | 8.5 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 02/1969 | 9.37 | ||
D6127 | 06/10/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.17 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 04/1968 | 8.53 | ||
D6128 | 13/10/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.17 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.59 | ||
D6129 | 27/10/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | 31/10/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 06/1972 | 12.64 | |
D6130 | 27/10/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 05/10/1971 | 09/04/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 10/1972 | 12.98 | |
D6131 | 03/11/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8.08 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.62 | ||
D6132 | 17/11/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 06/10/1971 | 02/12/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 11.92 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 09/1972 | 12.84 | |
D6133 | 24/11/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 31/12/1971 | 15/05/1966 to 29 |
Eastfield | 12.08 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 07/1972 | 12.65 | |
D6134 | 01/12/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 06/1968 | 8.55 | ||
D6135 | 08/12/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.44 | ||
D6136 | 17/12/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 8 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 04/1968 | 8.33 | ||
D6137 | 22/12/1959 | NB | Ipswich | 24/04/1971 | 07/11/1967 to 29 |
Eastfield | 11.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (St Rollox, Glasgow) | 08/1972 | 12.66 | |
D6138 | 02/02/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.83 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.29 | ||
D6139 | 16/02/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.83 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.33 | ||
D6140 | 24/02/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Eastfield | 7.83 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.23 | ||
D6141 | 15/03/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.75 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 08/1968 | 8.42 | ||
D6142 | 22/03/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.75 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.24 | ||
D6143 | 30/03/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.75 | Cut | Barnes and Bell (Coatbridge) | 06/1968 | 8.22 | ||
D6144 | 05/04/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.67 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 8.12 | ||
D6145 | 15/04/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.67 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.17 | ||
D6146 | 29/04/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.67 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Inverurie) | 09/1968 | 8.39 | ||
D6147 | 05/05/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.58 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.12 | ||
D6148 | 15/05/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.58 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.09 | ||
D6149 | 30/05/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.58 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 7.96 | ||
D6150 | 06/06/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.5 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 8.03 | ||
D6151 | 13/06/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.5 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 7.93 | ||
D6152 | 24/06/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 16/08/1968 | Eastfield | 8.17 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 02/1969 | 8.65 | ||
D6153 | 06/07/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.42 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 7.86 | ||
D6154 | 14/07/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.42 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 7.84 | ||
D6155 | 16/08/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.33 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 7.84 | ||
D6156 | 15/09/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7.25 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 05/1968 | 7.67 | ||
D6157 | 07/12/1960 | NB | Kittybrewster | 30/12/1967 | Aberdeen Ferryhill | 7 | Cut | J McWilliams (Shettleston) | 06/1968 | 7.53 |