02 0-4-0
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (Tops) | Date To Service | Bld | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D2850 | 06/10/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 20/06/1970 | 9.67 | Cut | Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) | 06/1971 | 10.70 | |||
D2851 | 02001 | 03/10/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 01/06/1975 | 14.67 | Cut | Arnott Young (Dudley Hill) | 12/1975 | 15.21 | ||
D2852 | 02002 | 14/10/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 14/10/1973 | Allerton | 13 | Cut | Avon Transmissions (at Allerton MPD) | 03/1976 | 15.43 | |
D2853 | 02003 | 25/10/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 01/06/1975 | Allerton | 14.67 | Prs | Preserved | 63.21 | ||
D2854 | 04/11/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 28/02/1970 | 9.25 | Prs | Preserved | 63.19 | ||||
D2855 | 21/11/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 04/10/1970 | 9.92 | Cut | Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) | 06/1971 | 10.57 | |||
D2856 | 02004 | 02/12/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 01/06/1975 | 14.5 | Cut | Redland (Mountsorrel) | 10/1978 | 17.88 | ||
D2857 | 04/12/1960 | YE | Bank Hall | 18/04/1971 | 10.33 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 06/1992 | 31.55 | |||
D2858 | 21/12/1960 | YE | Newton Heath | 28/02/1970 | 9.17 | Prs | Preserved | 63.06 | ||||
D2859 | 30/12/1960 | YE | Burton | 15/03/1970 | 9.25 | Cut | Birds (Long Marston) | 04/1971 | 10.30 | |||
D2860 | 13/09/1961 | YE | Fleetwood | 13/12/1970 | 9.25 | Prs | Preserved | 62.33 | ||||
D2861 | 03/10/1961 | YE | Fleetwood | 31/12/1969 | 8.17 | Cut | C F Booth (Rotherham) | 05/1971 | 9.62 | |||
D2862 | 14/10/1961 | YE | Fleetwood | 31/12/1969 | 8.17 | Cut | National Coal Board (Norton Colliery) | 04/1979 | 17.51 | |||
D2863 | 18/10/1961 | YE | Fleetwood | 31/12/1969 | 8.17 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 08/1971 | 9.83 | |||
D2864 | 25/10/1961 | YE | Warrington Dallam | 28/02/1970 | 8.33 | Cut | Hesslewoods (Attercliffe) | 04/1971 | 9.48 | |||
D2865 | 01/11/1961 | YE | Warrington Dallam | 15/03/1970 | 8.33 | Cut | Vic Berry (Leicester) | 05/1985 | 23.55 | |||
D2866 | 10/11/1961 | YE | Bank Hall | 28/02/1970 | 8.25 | Prs | Preserved | 62.17 | ||||
D2867 | 17/11/1961 | YE | Bank Hall | 12/09/1970 | 8.83 | Prs | Preserved | 62.15 | ||||
D2868 | 27/11/1961 | YE | Bank Hall | 31/12/1969 | 8.08 | Prs | Preserved | 62.12 | ||||
D2869 | 04/12/1961 | YE | Bank Hall | 31/12/1969 | 8 | Cut | T W Ward (Beighton) | 08/1971 | 9.70 |